Melendez-Monserrate v. Physician Correctional et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Melendez-Monserrate
Defendant: Clementina Devarie-Diaz, Raul Villalobos, Physician Correctional and Chey Chang Kumming
Case Number: 3:2021cv01162
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Status Report due by 7/1/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/8/2021. (mrr)
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 1, 2021 to file Status Report filed by Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Edwin Melendez-Monserrate Responses due by 6/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Hilda)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Edwin Melendez-Monserrate (Quinones-Rivera, Hilda)
June 7, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear MOTION for Extension of Time until July 1, 2021 to file Status Report. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** (rim)
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for Extension of Time until July 1, 2021 to file Status Report filed by Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Edwin Melendez-Monserrate Responses due by 6/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Hilda) Modified on 6/7/2021 (rim).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. By law this Court must conduct its proceedings in English. Plaintiff's concern about the language barrier has been addressed by the Court's appointment of pro-bono counsel to assist him at no cost. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/20/2021. (nat)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents (Spanish Language) filed by Edwin Melendez-Monserrate, pro se. Responses due by 5/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rim)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel by Edwin Melendez-Monserrate, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope) (rim)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Clementina Devarie-Diaz served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (rim)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel of Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera to represent Edwin Melendez-Monserrate re 6 Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appointment (Spanish Language)) (rim)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff failed to comply with the Order at Docket No. 4 requiring him to notify the Court whether he will represent himself or whether he wishes that the Court appoint pro-bono counsel at no cost to him by May 5, 2021. The Clerk of the Court shall appoint pro-bono counsel to represent plaintiff at no cost to him. Pro-bono counsel shall file a status report by June 11, 2021. Pursuant to Local Rule 83L(m) proceedings are stayed until then. Status Report due by 6/11/2021.Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/6/2021. (mrr)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Physician Correctional served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; Raul Villalobos served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; Chey Chang Kumming served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed) (rim)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Clementina Devarie-Diaz, Chey Chang Kumming, Physician Correctional, Raul Villalobos through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (ad)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. On or before May 5, 2021, Plaintiff shall notify the Court whether he will represent himself or whether he wishes that the Court appoint pro-bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at no cost to him. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 4/15/2021. (mrr)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Clementina Devarie-Diaz, Chey Chang Kumming, Physician Correctional, Raul Villalobos, filed by Edwin Melendez-Monserrate, Pro Se. Service due by 7/12/2021, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2021: #3 NPV PSLC Transmittal Memo) (rim).
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING: The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account.Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 5/4/2021. (ad)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edwin Melendez-Monserrate, Pro Se. Responses due by 4/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/15/2021) (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez-Monserrate v. Physician Correctional et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clementina Devarie-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Correctional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chey Chang Kumming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Melendez-Monserrate
Represented By: Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?