Silva-Melendez et al v. Luar Collective, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Omar Silva Melendez, Boris Bilbraut Cora, Wilberto Rodriguez Torres, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez Bermudez, Andres Bayrex Jimenez Torres, Omar Silva-Melendez, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez, Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres, Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres and Boris Bilbraut-Cora
Defendant: Jane Doe, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe, John Doe, Yarimar Coss Badillo, Roxanna Badillo Rodriguez, Mariana Crecioni Badillo, Luar Collective, Inc., Raul Lopez Badillo, Conjugal Partnership Badillo-Doe, Raul Lopez-Badillo, Mariana Crecioni-Badillo, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Badillo, Roxanna Badillo-Rodriguez and Yarimar Coss-Badillo
Case Number: 3:2021cv01176
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Luar Collective, Inc. served on 6/8/2019, answer due 6/29/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Doe-Badillo served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon John Doe served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Roxanna Badillo-Rodriguez served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Raul Lopez-Badillo served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Amended Complaint filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance Attorney Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean) Modified docket text and event on 5/20/2021 (rim).
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Omar Silva-Melendez, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut-Cora, Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres, Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Roxanna Badillo Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Badillo, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe, Yarimar Coss Badillo, Mariana Crecioni Badillo, Jane Doe, John Doe, Raul Lopez Badillo, Luar Collective, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7270226.), filed by Eliut Abisai Gonzalez Bermudez, Wilberto Rodriguez Torres, Boris Bilbraut Cora, Omar Silva Melendez, Andres Bayrex Jimenez Torres. Service due by 7/19/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva-Melendez et al v. Luar Collective, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarimar Coss Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanna Badillo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariana Crecioni Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luar Collective, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Lopez Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Badillo-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Lopez-Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariana Crecioni-Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanna Badillo-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarimar Coss-Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Silva Melendez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Bilbraut Cora
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilberto Rodriguez Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliut Abisai Gonzalez Bermudez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Bayrex Jimenez Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Silva-Melendez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Bilbraut-Cora
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?