Budde v. Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carol Budde
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 and Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01177
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting #19 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/5/2022. (ebb)
April 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting #17 "Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/21/2022. (ebb)
January 21, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz filed by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Noting #15 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/2/2021. (ebb)
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Noting #13 "Joint Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 12." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/2/2021. (ebb)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 Joint Motion In Compliance on Discovery Status as to #12 Scheduling Order/Case Management Order, Set Deadlines, filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. and Carol Budde. Responses due by 8/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 8/3/2021 to add filer (mcm).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: See attached. Deadline for Rule 26 disclosures: June 30, 2021. Deadline to amend the pleadings and to add parties: July 12, 2021. Motion(s) to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings: July 19, 2021. Conclusion of all discovery (including third party, factual and expert): December 16, 2021. Every 60 days, beginning on August 2, 2021, the parties shall file a Joint Motion informing the court of the status of discovery. Deadline to file motion(s) for summary judgment: January 17, 2022. Opposition(s) thereto: February 17, 2022. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). See Instructions pertaining to documents not in the English Language and courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/16/2021. (ebb)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noting #10 "Joint Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 9." Case Management Order will follow. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/16/2021. (ebb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Motion In Compliance submitting a Joint Proposed Schedule as to #9 Order filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. and Carol Budde. Responses due by 6/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 6/17/2021 to add filer (mcm).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/10/2021. (ebb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc..(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement byWal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.'s Request for Extension of Time to Plead, Answer or Otherwise Move." Defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead not later than 6/16/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/29/2021. (ebb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Appear re: #1 Complaint filed by Carol Budde filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 5/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Budde upon Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7271420.), filed by Carol Budde. Service due by 7/20/2021, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Budde v. Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Budde
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?