Cayago Tec GMBH et al v. iAqua PR LLC
Plaintiff: Cayago Americas, Inc and Cayago Tec GMBH
Defendant: iAqua PR LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01212
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff will respond to defendant's motion to dismiss no later than July 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/02/2021. (brc)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against iAqua PR LLC, filed by Cayago Tec GMBH, Cayago Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - US9774019 Patent, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - US7963814 Patent, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - USRE48329 Patent)(Friedman, Jennifer)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion to allow Lorri Lomnitzer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7361924) filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of iAqua PR LLC Responses due by 7/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Standing filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of iAqua PR LLC Responses due by 7/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/30/2021. (brc)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding counsel's unavailability from August 2 to August 9, 2021 filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of iAqua PR LLC Responses due by 7/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline is extended until July 1, 2021. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/02/2021. (brc)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement byiAqua PR LLC. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 1, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or Dispositive Motion filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of iAqua PR LLC Responses due by 6/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of iAqua PR LLC (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCayago Americas, Inc, Cayago Tec GMBH. (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Cayago Tec GMBH, Cayago Americas, Inc.(Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The admission of Jennifer L. Friedman to appear pro hac vice is approved. The clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/11/2021. (brc)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Iaqua LLC ( Gustavo Perez Perez) by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to appear pro hac vice by Jennifer L. Friedman, Esq. (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian) Modified on 5/11/2021 to correct title and event (ab).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to iAqua PR LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 Motion to allow Jennifer Friedman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7293083). ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel informed by telephone. Document will be re-filed*** (ab)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR. Missing signature. Counsel informed by telephone*** Motion to allow Jennifer Friedman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7293083) filed by Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian) Modified on 5/10/2021 (ab).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7292918.), filed by Cayago Tec GMBH, Cayago Americas, Inc. Service due by 8/5/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit Exh. A Patent, #5 Exhibit Exh B Patent, #6 Exhibit Exh C Patent)(Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cayago Tec GMBH et al v. iAqua PR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayago Americas, Inc
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Represented By: Jennifer L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayago Tec GMBH
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Represented By: Jennifer L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iAqua PR LLC
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?