Figueroa- Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rolando Figueroa- Santiago
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv01227
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security through the USMS, with copy of the order, complaint and USM-285. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM-285) (vdm)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rolando Figueroa-Santiago. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 6/18/2021. (hgp)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler for all proceedings, including the entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 21-1227 (GLS). Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/16/2021. (ft)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Pursuant to Plaintiff's Consent at ECF No. #5 , this case is hereby referred to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/16/2021.(wm)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vdm)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rolando Figueroa- Santiago. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Rolando Figueroa- Santiago (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Rolando Figueroa- Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Rolando Figueroa- Santiago Responses due by 6/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Rolando Figueroa- Santiago. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa- Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Figueroa- Santiago
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?