V. Suarez & Co., Inc. v. Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC et al
Plaintiff: V. Suarez & Co., Inc.
Defendant: Pablo Perez-Santiago, Camioneros Unidos de PR, LLC, Carlos J. Schettini, Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Trucking Company 1, Trucking Company 2, Carrier Doe and Carrier Roe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01271
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Referring Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/17/2022.(cmd)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER re #116 Joint MOTION / Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation for Entry of Judgment, ECF No. 116, the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE "all other causes of actions and claims of any sort from any party in the present case without the imposition of costs or attorney's fees." Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/16/2022.(wm)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Joint MOTION / Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 3/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re #113 Motion to Continue: Granted as requested. Parties will have until 2/15/22 to inform whether a settlement agreement has been reached. In suggested dates for rescheduling, the undersigned will be on trial in Crim. 21-030 (March) and Civil 16-1099 (April). Evidentiary Hearing is reset for 5/9/2022, 5/12/2022 & 5/13/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/3/2022. (cmd)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Re: #113 MOTION to Continue filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc.. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Continue filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 2/15/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Certificate 1-31-22)(Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon: Case set for Evidentiary hearing but aTelephone Conference was held instead on 12/15/2021. Present on behalf of plaintiff Luis Sanchez-Betances, Adrian Sanchez-Pagan. On behalf of defendant Enrique A. Baez-Godinez, Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza. The matters informed in #110 Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing we discussed. The Court granted the same and reset the hearing. Evidentiary Hearing is reset for 2/7/2022 at 9:00 AM, 2/8/2022 @ 10:00 AM and 2/11/2022 at 9:00 AM. To be held in Courtroom 1 before Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Hearing set for 11:00 AM.Hearing held at 11:05 AM.Hearing ended at 11:23 AM. (cmd)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Continue: GRANTED. Evidentiary Hearing is reset for 2/7/2022 at 9:00 AM, 2/8/2022 @ 10:00 AM and 2/11/2022 at 9:00 AM. To be held in Courtroom 1 before Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/15/2021. (cmd)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing and Conference Call filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 12/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE to Motion Regarding Opinion and Order, ECF No. 107 filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Re: #107 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Opinion and Order issued in Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucin de Alimentos, Inc., v. Domingo Emanuelli-Hernndez, et al., Civil No. 21-1156, by the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico sust filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc.. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Defendants' legal counsels availability during December 2021, and January, 2022, and Scheduling Request filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 12/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique). Added MOTION requesting Order on 12/10/2021 (idg).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Opinion and Order issued in Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucin de Alimentos, Inc., v. Domingo Emanuelli-Hernndez, et al., Civil No. 21-1156, by the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico sustaining the validity of the NTSP's freight tariffs filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 12/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. The informative motions at ECF Nos. 103, 105 are NOTED. The motion for extension of time at ECF No. 104, is thus MOOT. Given the motions and filings submitted by the parties, the Court hereby sets the hearing to take place on December 15 and 16, 2021. Evidentiary Hearing is set for 12/15/2021 and 12/16/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/8/2021.(wm)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION in Compliance with Court Order at ECF. No. #102 , RESPONSE in Opposition to #103 Informative Motion in Compliance with Order at ECF No. 102 filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique) Modified event and docket text on 12/6/2021 (idg).
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for extension of time until December 3, 2021 to Comply with Court Order at ECF No. 102. filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 12/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding in Compliance with Order at ECF No. 102 filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 12/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. The "Motion for reconsideration of order reopening preliminary injunction hearing and opposition to motion in compliance with order" at ECF No. 99 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff is granted 10 days to file an informative motion indicating the names of the witnesses it intends to call to testify and provide a short but fact-specific summary of their intended testimony. Defendants are granted 10 days thereafter to inform if they intend to call any witnesses at all. Defendants shall also provide a short but fact-specific summary of the testimony of the witnesses they intend to call, if any, for the Court to examine and deliberate upon the necessity of such testimony. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/9/2021.(wm)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Re: #99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #97 Order,,, MOTION in Opposition to Motion in Compliance with Order DD 97 re #98 Motion In Compliance as to #97 Order,,, filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc.. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re #98 Motion In Compliance. Noted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/18/2021. (wm)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #97 Order,,,, MOTION in Opposition to Motion in Compliance with Order DD 97 re #98 Motion In Compliance as to #97 Order,,, filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #97 #98 ) (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Motion In Compliance as to #97 Order,,, filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 10/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. The Court grants plaintiff's request for a hearing "to present the evidence it has to meet the new 'rule of reason' standard." ECF No. 87 at 5. Plaintiff is granted 5 working days from the issuance of this order to inform the number of witnesses it intends to call and the time it estimates it will take to present such evidence. The motions for extension of time to file certified translations at ECF No. 88, 93 are MOOT in light of the motions submitting certified translations at ECF No. 90, 95 which are hereby NOTED. The motions for leave to file documents in excess of page limit at ECF No. 89, 91 are GRANTED. The Court expects subsequent filings to strictly comply with L. Civ. R. 7. Failure to comply will prompt the motion to be stricken from the record. The motion submitting missing pages filed by defendants at ECF No. 94 is NOTED and GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/28/2021.(wm)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Objection to R&R filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 10/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Reply 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Reply 2)(Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations of Docket Documents # 92-1 and 92-2 re: #92 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 9/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation Regulation 9156 (Partial) (DD #92-1), #2 Exhibit Certified English Translation Judgment issued in Camara de Comercio v NTSP (Partial) (DD #92-2))(Related document(s) #92 ) (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Supplemental Motion Supplementing Missing Page of Exhibit 2 of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Docket # 92-2) re: #92 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini. Responses due by 9/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment issued in Camara de Comercio v NTSP (partial))(Related document(s) #92 ) (Baez-Godinez, Enrique) Modified caps on 9/16/2021 (idg).
September 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
September 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #87 Objection re #83 Report and Recommendation filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Regulation 9156 (partial), #2 Exhibit Judgment issued in Camara de Comercio v NTSP (partial), #3 Exhibit Transcript Testimony of Vicente Suarez (partial), #4 Exhibit Transcript Testimony LaFuente June 30 2021 (partial))(Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael) Modified title and added relationship on 9/13/2021 (idg).
September 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Document , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION Submitting Exhibits Certified English Translations filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 9/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Denied, #2 Exhibit Decision Texaco PR v. C.S.P.)(Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Page Limit filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 9/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 9/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Re: #83 Report and Recommendation,, filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resolution Supreme Court PR, #2 Exhibit Judgement Court of Appeals, #3 Exhibit Judgment Court of Appeals, #4 Exhibit Transcript Mr. LaFuente, #5 Exhibit Transcript Mr. Suarez, #6 Exhibit Transcript Mr. Prez, #7 Exhibit Transcript Mr. Garcia)(Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST testimony of Pablo Perez-Santiago by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini for proceedings held on 6/28/2021 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan.. (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Transcript of preliminary injunction/show cause hearing held on 06-28-21, before Judge MJ Marshal D. Morgan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Evilys E. Carrion, Telephone number 787-772-3377. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 9/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2021. (eec)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Pablo Perez Santiago by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. for proceedings held on 6/28/2021 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan.. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for the issuance of a preliminary injunction. See Docket No. #10 Order Referring Case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. The parties have fourteen days to file any objections to this Report and Recommendation. Failure to file the same within the specified time waives the right to appeal this Report and Recommendation. See Henley Drilling Co. v. McGee, 36 F.3d 143, 150-51 (1st Cir. 1994); United States v. Valencia Copete, 792 F.2d 4 (1st Cir.1986). Objections to the Report and Recommendation are due by 9/9/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing Excerpt - Alexis Garcia held on July 9, 2021, before Honorable United States Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amy Walker, Telephone number prcsr123@gmail.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 8/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2021. (aw)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing Excerpt - Testimony of Leonardo Delgado held on June 25, 2021, before Honorable United States Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amy Walker, Telephone number prcsr123@gmail.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 8/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2021. (aw)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing Excerpt - Testimony of Pablo Perez held on June 25, 2021, before Honorable United States Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amy Walker, Telephone number prcsr123@gmail.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 8/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2021. (aw)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER noted and granted #78 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan (Morgan, Marshal).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #73 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Pages under Local Rule 147(e) filed by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 8/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #73 ) (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan (Morgan, Marshal).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan (Morgan, Marshal).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess pages filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 8/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiff's Post Hearing Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #3 Appendix Adendum A, #4 Appendix Addendum B, #5 Appendix Addendum C, #6 Appendix Addendum D, #7 Appendix Addendum E, #8 Appendix Addendum F)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 BRIEF Defendants Post-Hearing Brief on Plaintiffs Request for a Preliminary Injunction/i> by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pages from Transcript Testimony Suarez June 29, #2 Exhibit Pages from Transcript Testimony Lafuente June 29, #3 Exhibit Pages from Transcript Testimony Lafuente June 30) (Baez-Godinez, Enrique) Modified caps on 7/21/2021 (idg).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Pages under Local Rule 147(e) filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 8/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Pablo Perez Santiago by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini for proceedings held on 6/25/21 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan.. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Leonardo Delgado Navarro by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini for proceedings held on 06/25/21 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan.. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Alexis Garcia Fonseca by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini for proceedings held on 7/9/2021 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan.. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Transcript of Proceedings held on June 29, 2021 - Prelim. Inj. and Show Cause Hearing - Excerpt - Testimony of V. Suarez, before Judge Hon. Marshal D. Morgan - MJ. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rachelle Robinson-Ware, Telephone number 787-772-3476. Tape Number: NA. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 8/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2021. (rms)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Vicente Suarez by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini for proceedings held on 6/29/2021 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan.. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Vicente Suarez by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. for proceedings held on 6/29/2021 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan.. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Defendant's Exhibit List re: Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I) (mig)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Plaintiff's Exhibit List re: Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 22) (mig)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing reconvened on 7/12/2021. Present: Attorneys Luis Sanchez-Betances and Adrian Sanchez-Pagan for Plaintiff, Rafael Ortiz-Mendoza and Enrique Baez-Godinez for Defendant. Testimony of Lt. Elvis Zeno Santiago was heard. Defendants' Exhibit I was presented and admitted into evidence pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 902(1). The parties are ordered to file simultaneous written briefs no later than Tuesday, July 20, 2021, at 5:00 PM. The exhibits along with the written briefs, once filed, will be taken under advisement. A Report and Recommendation will be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter Amy Walker.) (mig)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing reconvened on 7/9/2021. Present: Attorneys Luis Sanchez-Betances and Adrian Sanchez-Pagan for Plaintiff, Rafael Ortiz-Mendoza and Enrique Baez-Godinez for Defendant. Testimony of Alexis Garcia-Fonseca and Pablo Perez-Santiago was heard. The court recessed at 11:22 AM. Due to unavailability of the defense's witness, the Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing will reconvene on Monday, July 12, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (Court Reporter Amy Walker.) (mig)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re #61 Motion to Extent the TRO. The motion for extension of the TRO, which makes reference to abundant and relevant legal authority is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/7/2021. (wm)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION Extend the TRO filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 7/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Transcript of Proceedings held on June 30, 2021 Prelim. Inj. and Rule to Show Cause Hearing, before Judge Hon. Magistrate Judge Marcos Lopez. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rachelle Robinson-Ware, Telephone number 787-772-3476. Tape Number: NA. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 7/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021. (rms)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Transcript of Proceedings held on June 29, 2021 - Prelim. Inj. and Show Cause Hearing, before Judge Hon. Marshal D. Morgan - MJ. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rachelle Robinson-Ware, Telephone number 787-772-3476. Tape Number: NA. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 7/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021. (rms)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing reconvened on 06/30/2021. Present: Attorneys Luis Sanchez-Betances and Adrian Sanchez-Pagan for Plaintiff, Rafael Ortiz-Mendoza and Enrique Baez-Godinez for Defendant. Testimony of Jaime Antonio La Fuente-Gonzalez was heard. Defendants Exhibits F and G were presented and admitted into evidence. The court recessed at 6:00pm. ThePreliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing will reconvene on Friday, July 9, 2021 at 9:00AM in Courtroom 1 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (Court Reporter Rachelle M. Robinson-Ware.) (mig)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Noted #49 Informative motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Noted #48 Informative motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (DAILY COPIES) by Atty. Rafael A. Ortiz Mendoza forthe testimony of Jaime Antonio La Fuente held on 6/29/2021 and 6/30/21 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (be)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (DAILY COPIES) by Atty. Adrian Sanchez for the testimony of Jaime Antonio La Fuente held on 6/29/2021 and 6/30/21 before Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (be)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing reconvened on 06/29/2021. Present: Attorneys Luis Sanchez-Betances and Adrian Sanchez-Pagan for Plaintiff, Rafael Ortiz-Mendoza and Enrique Baez-Godinez for Defendant. Testimony of Vicente Suarez-Matienzo and Jaime Antonio La Fuente-Gonzalez was heard. Plaintiff's Exhibits 14 and 15 were presented and admitted into evidence. The court recessed at 6:14pm. The Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing will reconvene on 06/30/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (Court Reporter Rachelle M. Robinson-Ware.) (mig)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing reconvened on 06/28/2021. Present: Attorneys Luis Sanchez-Betances and Adrian Sanchez-Pagan for Plaintiff, Rafael Ortiz-Mendoza and Enrique Baez-Godinez for Defendant. Testimony of Pablo Perez-Santiago and Wallace Santos was heard. Defendants Exhibits A, B, D and H were presented and admitted into evidence. The court recessed at 6:30 PM. The Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing will reconvene on 06/29/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (Court Reporter Evilys Carrion-Esquilin.) (mig)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. Given the fact that the presentation of evidence related to the Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing continues on Monday, the Court finds good cause to extend the TRO until the conclusion of the Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 06/25/2021. (mig)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing held on 06/25/2021. Present: Attorneys Luis Sanchez-Betances and Adrian Sanchez-Pagan for Plaintiff, Rafael Ortiz-Mendoza and Enrique Baez-Godinez for Defendant. Testimony of Leonardo Delgado Navarro and Pablo Perez-Santiago was heard. Plaintiff's Exhibits 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 16, 18 and 19 were admitted into evidence. The court recessed at 6:20pm due to unavailability of the interpreter. The Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing will reconvene on 06/28/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (Court Reporter Amy Walker.) (mig) Modified to correct attorney's name on 6/28/2021 (idg).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Evidence Defendants Intend to Present during the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for June 25, 2021 filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List)(Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding updated list of document filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Documents)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Granted #46 Motion requesting Order. Mr. Diego Suarez-Matienzo, Chairman and Chief Executive Officer of Plaintiff V. Suarez & Co, Inc., is ORDERED to appear for the in-person PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING to be held on June 25, 2021, at 9:00AM. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Emergency MOTION requesting Order REGARDING APPEARANCE OF DIEGO SUREZ-MATIENZO filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Noted #44 Informative motion. The Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing will proceed as scheduled on Friday, June 25, 2021 at 9:00AM. Parties, their representatives, and the witnesses each side expects to call during the hearing shall be available and present. The parties are reminded that they and their witnesses are expected to strictly abide by the Court's COVID-19 policies for all in-person hearings. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Plaintiff's position as to settlement filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 7/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Granted #42 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Restrict Document Motion to Inform filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 7/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** SEALED Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. The Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing has been continued to Friday, June 25, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (mig) Modified on 6/22/2021 to edit docket text and docket Minute Entry as PDF (gr).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. The Court DENIES IN PART defendants' motion to dissolve the temporary restraining order at ECF No. 22-1. Accordingly, the parties shall proceed to prepare and attend the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled by United States Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. The motion for an extension of time to file certified translations at ECF No. 2 is MOOT in light of plaintiff's motion submitting certified translations at ECF No. 27, which is hereby NOTED. The informative motions regarding corporate disclosures at ECF No. 3, 23 are NOTED. The informative motion "regarding certification of notification" at ECF No. 5 is NOTED. The motion submitting bond filed by plaintiff at ECF No. 13 is NOTED and GRANTED. Because plaintiff addressed several requests by defendants in one consolidated document, plaintiff's motion for leave to file in excess of the applicable page limit at ECF No. 32 is GRANTED. However, the Court expects the parties to subsequently comply with page limits. The motion for leave to file document in support of defendants' motion to dissolve the temporary restraining order at ECF No. 31 is NOTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/21/2021.(wm)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. Considering the fact that a preliminary injunction hearing is set to commence on June 22, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan, and in view of the motion to "dissolve" the temporary restraining order filed on June 14, 2021 and the response thereto filed on June 18, 2021 along with additional filings by the parties, the Court informs the parties that an Opinion and Order denying defendants' motion to quash the temporary restraining order at ECF No. 22 will be issued shortly, by the Court. Therefore, the parties shall prepare and attend the preliminary injunction hearing and continue with all subsequent proceedings. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/21/2021.(wm)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Granted #36 Motion requesting Order. Defendant Carlos J. Schettini, defendant Pablo Perez Santiago and a representative of defendant Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC are ORDERED to appear for the in-person PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING on June 22, 2021 at 9:00AM. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Noted #35 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION requesting Order Regarding Appearance of Defendants filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Joint Motion In Compliance as to 14 Order,,,, filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 BRIEF DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini. (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Defendants Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A ATVC - Letter from CUPR to VSC, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B ATVC - NTSP Certification and Fine)(Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Pages filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 7/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Document IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISSOLVE THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ISSUED BY THIS COURT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 7/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - SMM, Certificacion boleto V suarez Inc, 6.18.21, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certification and fine V suarez Inc (Spanish))(Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granted #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time until Midnight June 18th, 2021 to file Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint and a Memorandum of Law filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 7/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. Plaintiff is granted two (2) days from the issuance of this order to file a response to defendants' motion at ECF No. 22. No replies will be allowed. Unless this Court determines otherwise in a subsequent Order, the parties shall proceed to prepare and attend the preliminary injunction hearing to be held by the United States Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan, on June 22, 2021. Plaintiff's response due by 6/18/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/16/2021.(wm)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations of Exhibits filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 6/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Facebook post, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granted #21 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granted #20 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Noted #19 Informative motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Disclosure under Local R. 7.1 filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 6/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Opposition to Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Set Aside Temporary Restraining Order re: #10 ORDER re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order at ECF No. 4. Because the undersigned will hold a jury selection tomorrow, June 11, 2021 and preside over the criminal proceedings ensuing in United States v. Luis J. Vazquez-Alvarez, 19-715 (ADC), which are scheduled to take place from June 14 through June 25, 2021, the case is hereby referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for a preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/10/2021.(wm), #1 COMPLAINT against Camioneros Unidos de PR, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7333211.), filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc.. Service due by 9/7/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Facebook post, # 2 Exhibit Letter, # 3 Exhibit Picture, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Category Sheet)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis) filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certified translation of Exhibit 2 of Verified Complaint)(Related document(s) #10 , #1 ) (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael) Modified relationship on 6/15/2021 (idg).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Enrique A. Baez-Godinez on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baez-Godinez, Enrique)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza on behalf of Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Mendoza, Rafael)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Scheduling Order filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Clerk's office shall issue forthwith the appropriate notice of Order No. 14 to the Defendants. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pablo Perez Santiago by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. upon Pablo Perez Santiago served on 6/11/2021 (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified to add service date on 6/14/2021 (idg).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Carlos J. Schettini by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. upon Carlos J. Schettini on 6/11/2021 (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified to add service date on 6/14/2021 (idg).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Camioneros Unidos de PR, LLC by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. upon V. Suarez & Co., Inc. served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING is hereby set for June 22, 2021 at 9:00AM in Courtroom No. 1 before USMJ Marshal D. Morgan. Plaintiff shall come that day prepared to argue substantively why a preliminary injunction is warranted and under what terms. Defendants shall also come prepared to argue why a preliminary injunction should not be granted. Defendants are further ORDERED to file an Answer to the Complaint and a Memorandum of Law stating their position by COB Friday, June 18, 2021. The parties are also ORDERED to file a JOINT MOTION by noon, on June 21, 2021, setting forth: (1) the number of witnesses each side expects to call during the hearing; (2) a list of the exhibits each side intends to introduce during the hearing; and, (3) any factual stipulations that have been agreed to by the parties. The parties are on notice that they and their witnesses are expected to strictly abide by the Court's COVID-19 policies for all in-person hearings. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM) Modified on 6/14/2021 to edit dates as per Chamber's request (mg).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION Submitting Bond filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 6/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 TRO Bond)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 10), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for the holding of a preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2021. (ft) Modified on 6/11/2021 to correct typo (mcm).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order at ECF No. 4. Because the undersigned will hold a jury selection tomorrow, June 11, 2021 and preside over the criminal proceedings ensuing in United States v. Luis J. Vazquez-Alvarez, 19-715 (ADC), which are scheduled to take place from June 14 through June 25, 2021, the case is hereby referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for a preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/10/2021.(wm)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Camioneros Unidos de PR, LLC, #2 Summons Carlos J. Schettini, #3 Summons Pablo Perez Santiago) (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Memorandum of Law in Support Motion for TRO (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Certification of Notification filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 6/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 6/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 6/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of V. Suarez & Co., Inc. Responses due by 6/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Camioneros Unidos de PR, LLC, Pablo Perez-Santiago, Carlos J. Schettini ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7333211.), filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc.. Service due by 9/7/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Facebook post, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Picture, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V. Suarez & Co., Inc. v. Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Perez-Santiago
Represented By: Enrique A. Baez-Godinez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camioneros Unidos de PR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos J. Schettini
Represented By: Enrique A. Baez-Godinez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camioneros Unidos de Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Enrique A. Baez-Godinez
Represented By: Rafael A. Ortiz-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trucking Company 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trucking Company 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. Suarez & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Represented By: Adrian Sanchez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?