UBS Financial Services Inc. et al v. Fidalgo-Gutierrez et al
Plaintiff: UBS Financial Services Incorporated of Puerto Rico and UBS Financial Services Inc.
Defendant: Eugenia Fidalgo-Gutierrez, Mercedes Fidalgo-Gutierrez and Fidalgo Gutierrez Holding Corp.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01277
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8-16-2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,,, filed by UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Financial Services Incorporated of Puerto Rico filed by Bamily Lopez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 7/13/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time until 8-09-2021 to file Responsive Pleading filed by Bamily Lopez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear PHV. The Clerk of Court shall deposit the admission fee to the account of Non-Appropriated Funds of this Court. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/24/2021. (MRB)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear PHV. The Clerk of Court shall deposit the admission fee to the account of Non-Appropriated Funds of this Court. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/24/2021. (MRB)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to allow Richard J. Davis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100077434) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Financial Services Incorporated of Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to allow Peter Fruin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100077360) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Fidalgo Gutierrez Holding Corp., Eugenia Fidalgo-Gutierrez, Mercedes Fidalgo-Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. (vdm)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) against Fidalgo Gutierrez Holding Corp., Eugenia Fidalgo-Gutierrez, Mercedes Fidalgo-Gutierrez ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7336347.), filed by UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Financial Services Incorporated of Puerto Rico. Service due by 9/9/2021, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M1 to M3, #15 Exhibit N1 to N3, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q1 to Q5, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #25 Summons Eugenia Fidalgo, #26 Summons Mercedes Fidalgo, #27 Summons Fidalgo-Gutierrez Holding Corp.)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UBS Financial Services Inc. et al v. Fidalgo-Gutierrez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenia Fidalgo-Gutierrez
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Fidalgo-Gutierrez
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidalgo Gutierrez Holding Corp.
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UBS Financial Services Incorporated of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Peter S. Fruin
Represented By: Richard J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Peter S. Fruin
Represented By: Richard J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?