Rodriguez-Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angel Rodriguez-Rivera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv01283
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (ad)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 9), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce M. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 21-1283 (BJM). Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/22/2021. (ft)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to U.S. Magistrate Judge: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Given Plaintiff's consent (Docket No. #5 ), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/21/2021. (mrr)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/21/2021. (mrr)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angel Rodriguez-Rivera (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Angel Rodriguez-Rivera. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Angel Rodriguez-Rivera (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Angel Rodriguez-Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice Appeals Council, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Angel Rodriguez-Rivera Responses due by 6/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Angel Rodriguez-Rivera. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Rodriguez-Rivera
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?