R.J. Alan Company, Inc. v Mayaguez Economic Development Inc.
Plaintiff: R.J. Alan Company, Inc.
Defendant: Mayaguez Economic Development Inc.
Intervenor: Municipality of Mayaguez
Case Number: 3:2021cv01314
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Berenice B. Bellotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellotti, Berenice) Modified on 9/1/2021 to modify event, document is not a motion (gav).
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto Rodriguez-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rodriguez-Ramos, Alberto)
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Municipality of Mayaguez Re: #17 Objection to filed by R.J. Alan Company, Inc. filed by Municipality of Mayaguez. (Aldarondo-Lopez, Eliezer)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 OBJECTION filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #13 MOTION to Intervene filed by Municipality of Mayaguez, #14 Notice of Filing Exhibits filed by Municipality of Mayaguez filed by All Plaintiffs. (Perez-Caldera, Carla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Carla S. Perez-Caldera on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Caldera, Carla) Modified on 8/31/2021 to edit event title (mcm).
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. filed by Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso on behalf of Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cordova-Ayuso, Lucas) Modified on 8/30/2021 to remove italics (gav).
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #13 MOTION to Intervene filed by Municipality of Mayaguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7) (Aldarondo-Lopez, Eliezer)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene filed by Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez on behalf of Municipality of Mayaguez Responses due by 8/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND RESPONSIVE PLEADING, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Aldarondo-Lopez, Eliezer)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 08/17/2021. (lir)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct re: #6 Response in Opposition to Motion. Amended Response due by 8/20/2021. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/16/2021. (MQ)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mayaguez Economic Development, Inc. by R.J. Alan Company, Inc. upon Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 8/10/2021 to remove italics (gav).
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sergio Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of R.J. Alan Company, Inc. (Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by R.J. Alan Company, Inc. filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of R.J. Alan Company, Inc. Responses due by 8/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Reply to Opposition to Enlargement of Time filed by Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso on behalf of Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. Responses due by 8/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cordova-Ayuso, Lucas) Modified on 8/3/2021 to remove italics (gav).
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by R.J. Alan Company, Inc. Re: #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead pursuant to L. Civ. R. 6 filed by Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. filed by R.J. Alan Company, Inc.. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 7/29/2021 to remove italics (gav).
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead pursuant to L. Civ. R. 6 filed by Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso on behalf of Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. Responses due by 8/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cordova-Ayuso, Lucas)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R.J. Alan Company, Inc. upon Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (gav).
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Collection of Money, Mortgage Foreclosure against Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7364329.), filed by R.J. Alan Company, Inc.. Service due by 10/4/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Mortgage Note, #2 Exhibit Deed No. 10, #3 Exhibit Forbearance Agreement, #4 Exhibit Collateral Assignment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet, #7 Summons)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.J. Alan Company, Inc. v Mayaguez Economic Development Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Alan Company, Inc.
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Represented By: Sergio Sanchez-Pagan
Represented By: Alberto Rodriguez-Ramos
Represented By: Berenice B. Bellotti
Represented By: Carla S. Perez-Caldera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayaguez Economic Development Inc.
Represented By: Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Municipality of Mayaguez
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?