R&D Master Enterprises, Inc. et al v. The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: R&D MASTER ENTERPRISES, INC., PRO PAVE CORP., MATRIX TRANSPORT INC., Jose A. Rovira-Gonzalez, Maria Magdalena Diaz-Vila, The conjugal legal partnership comprised by Rovira & Diaz and Conjugal partnership Rovira-Diaz
Defendant: THE FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD FOR PUERTO RICO, Natalie Jaresko, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico and Natalie Jaresko
Case Number: 3:2021cv01317
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) as to Conjugal partnership Rovira-Diaz, Maria Magdalena Diaz-Vila, Matrix Transport Inc., Pro Pave Corp., R&D Master Enterprises, Inc., Jose A. Rovira-Gonzalez filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Natalie Jaresko Responses due by 9/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1)(Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
August 17, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer filed by Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Re: #8 MOTION to transfer case filed by Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants shall file the reply on the record forthwith. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 8/17/2021. (mrr)
August 13, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply in Support of their Motion to Transfer filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply)(Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis) Modified docket text title and italics on 8/16/2021 (rim).
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #8 MOTION to transfer case filed by Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guzman-Rodriguez, Humberto)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall plead or otherwise defend by September 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/28/2021. (mrr)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER holding in abeyance #8 Motion to transfer case. Plaintiff shall respond to this motion by August 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/28/2021. (mrr)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear PHV. Attorney Timoth W. Mungovan is admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/28/2021. (mrr)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear PHV. Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock is admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/28/2021. (mrr)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear PHV. Attorney Guy Brenner is admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/28/2021. (mrr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by R&D Master Enterprises, Inc. filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to transfer case filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to allow Timothy Mungovan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7389688) filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to allow Martin Bienenstock to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7389687) filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to allow Guy Brenner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7389686) filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Natalie Jaresko, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by R&D Master Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vdm) (Main Document and Attachment 1 replaced on 7/9/2021) (rim).
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7367852.), filed by R&D MASTER ENTERPRISES, INC.. Service due by 10/6/2021, (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons FOMBPR, #5 Summons N. Jaresko)(Guzman-Rodriguez, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&D Master Enterprises, Inc. et al v. The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&D MASTER ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Humberto Guzman-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRO PAVE CORP.
Represented By: Humberto Guzman-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATRIX TRANSPORT INC.
Represented By: Humberto Guzman-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Rovira-Gonzalez
Represented By: Humberto Guzman-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Magdalena Diaz-Vila
Represented By: Humberto Guzman-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The conjugal legal partnership comprised by Rovira & Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal partnership Rovira-Diaz
Represented By: Humberto Guzman-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD FOR PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Martin J. Bienestock
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Jaresko, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Jaresko
Represented By: Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?