Dr. Victor Arroyo v. Playa Papaya
Plaintiff: Dr. Victor Arroyo, Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo and Victor Arroyo
Defendant: Playa Papaya
Case Number: 3:2021cv01348
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Noting #13 "Motion Informing Defendant's Failure to Comply with Court Order on Submittal of Certified English Translations of Exhibits Included in Notice of Removal." See Docket No. 16. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/24/2021. (ebb)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Noting #27 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/24/2021. (ebb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariangeli Mercado-Torres on behalf of All Defendants (Mercado-Torres, Mariangeli)
September 20, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Remand filed by Playa Papaya Re: 23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 10 Order, #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo filed by Playa Papaya. (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting #24 "Motion Requesting Enlargement of Time to File Response to Counterclaim." Response due by September 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/17/2021. (ebb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2021 to File Answer to Counterclaim re: #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Claim, Counterclaim filed by Playa Papaya filed by Ivan R. Fernandez-Vallejo on behalf of Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo Responses due by 10/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Fernandez-Vallejo, Ivan)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting #22 "Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Docket No. 9." Response due September 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/10/2021. (ebb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for extension of time until September 20, 2021 to To Respond To Motion To Remand (Docket No. 9) filed by Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado on behalf of Playa Papaya Responses due by 9/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: See attached. Deadline for Rule 26 disclosures: September 24, 2021. Deadline to amend the pleadings and to add parties: October 4, 2021. Motion(s) to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings: October 11, 2021. Conclusion of all discovery (including third party, factual and expert): March 22, 2022. Every 60 days, beginning on October 25, 2021, the parties shall file a Joint Motion informing the court of the status of discovery. Deadline to file motion(s) for summary judgment: April 22, 2022. Opposition(s) thereto: May 23, 2022. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). See Instructions pertaining to documents not in the English Language and courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/10/2021. (ebb)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting #19 "Joint Proposed Schedule in Compliance with Order." Case Management Order will follow. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/10/2021. (ebb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 19 Joint Motion In Compliance with Court Order - Docket No. 12 (Joint Proposed Schedule) filed by Ivan R. Fernandez-Vallejo on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 9/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Vallejo, Ivan) Modified to add filers on 9/13/2021 (mcm).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Finding as moot #15 "Motion Submitting Certified Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/7/2021. (ebb)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Noting #16 "Amended Motion Submitting Certified Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/7/2021. (ebb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 Amended MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #15 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: 14 Order, #13 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo filed by Playa Papaya, 14 Order, filed by Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado on behalf of Playa Papaya Responses due by 9/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Certified Translations), #2 Exhibit 2 (Certified Translations), #3 Exhibit 3 (Certified Translations), #4 Exhibit 4 (Certified Translations))(Related document(s) #15 , 14 ) (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: 14 Order, #13 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo filed by Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado on behalf of Playa Papaya Responses due by 9/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 EXHIBIT 4)(Related document(s) 14 , #13 ) (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: #13 "Motion Informing Defendant's Failure to Comply With Court Order on Submittal of Certified English Translations of Exhibits Included in Notice of Removal." Defendant shall respond by September 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/2/2021. (ebb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Ivan R. Fernandez-Vallejo on behalf of Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo Responses due by 9/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Vallejo, Ivan)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by September 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/31/2021. (ebb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CLAIM Breach Of Contract And Damages By Illegal Actions, COUNTERCLAIM against Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo by Playa Papaya. (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #9 "Motion to Remand." Opposition due September 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/27/2021. (ebb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Ivan R. Fernandez-Vallejo on behalf of Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Vallejo, Ivan)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #4 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Certified Translations." Certified translations due August 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/30/2021. (ebb)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #3 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Otherwise Plead." The appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by August 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/30/2021. (ebb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPlaya Papaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time until August 30, 2021 to File Certified English Translations filed by Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado on behalf of Playa Papaya Responses due by 8/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 30, 2021 to File Answer To The Complaint Or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Playa Papaya filed by Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado on behalf of Playa Papaya Responses due by 8/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil & Category Sheets re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Playa Papaya (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Category Sheet), #2 Exhibit 2 (Civil Cover Sheet)) (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court Of First Intance, Carolina Section, case number CA2021CV01530. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7394619), filed by Playa Papaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Minutes of Proceedings), #3 Exhibit 3 (Complaint Exhibits))(Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Victor Arroyo v. Playa Papaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Victor Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor M. Arroyo-Arroyo
Represented By: Ivan R. Fernandez-Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Arroyo
Represented By: Ivan R. Fernandez-Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playa Papaya
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Mariangeli Mercado-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?