Cortes-Ramos v. Martin-Morales et al
Plaintiff: Luis Adrian Cortes-Ramos
Defendant: Enrique Martin-Morales and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01374
Filed: August 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Enrique Martin-Morales (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
October 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons to be Issued re #1 Complaint filed by Luis Adrian Cortes-Ramos (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (arg)
August 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet, Category Sheet, US Copyright Office - Certificate of Registration PA-2-193-702 re #1 Complaint filed by Luis Adrian Cortes-Ramos (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit US Copyright Office - Certificate of Registration PA 1-193-702) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
August 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7413898.), filed by Luis Adrian Cortes-Ramos. Service due by 11/15/2021,(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes-Ramos v. Martin-Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Adrian Cortes-Ramos
Represented By: Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Martin-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?