Gonzalez v. Albors-Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ and Ada Albors-Gonzalez
Defendant: JUAN ALBERTO ALBORS HERNANDEZ, SUCESSION TO JUAN ALBERTO ALBORS HERNANDEZ, ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ, NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS LAW FIRM, JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW, NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS, Juan Alberto Albors-Hernandez, Succession to Juan Alberto Albors-Hernandez and Ada Monserrate Albors-Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2021cv01375
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel of Carymar Perez-Cintron to represent Ada Albors-Gonzalez re #79 Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appointment (Spanish Language))(rim)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall appoint pro-bono counsel to represent Plaintiff Ada Albors-Gonzalez at no cost to her. Proceedings are stayed until 11/30/2021. Amended Complaint is due by 11/30/2021.Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 9/9/2021. (mrr)
August 20, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE to Counsel re #77 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (rim)
August 16, 2021 Filing 77 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00286. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The report and recommendation, ECF No. #74 , is accepted and adopted as this Courts opinion. The United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico is the proper venue for this case. Accordingly, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico. The Clerk shall take all steps necessary to effect the transfer. Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint does not overcome the finding that the proper venue is in Puerto Rico. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint, ECF No. #75 , is DENIED. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 08/10/2021. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 75 PETITIONER/MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND COMPLAINT by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
July 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #74 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - No objections filed. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 74 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #72 Eighth Amended Complaint. For the reasons set forth above, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS: This case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico. The clerk of the court close this file. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/4/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/7/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #72 Amended Complaint. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 72 EIGHTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #70 Notice of Filing. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE OF FILING by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 3, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #68 Amended Complaint. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 68 SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REFERRAL AND ORDER striking #65 SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. On or before May 31, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal or file a proposed eighth amended complaint that complies with this court's order of April 30, 2021. (Doc. #64 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/7/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #65 Amended Complaint. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 65 ***STRICKEN PER #67 ORDER*** SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ, JUAN ALBERTO ALBORS HERNANDEZ, NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS, JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW, filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (rcb) Modified on 5/10/2021 (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying without prejudice #33 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #36 Motion to Dismiss; denying #57 Motion to Amend; striking #58 Fifth Amended Complaint. On or before May 31, 2021, Plaintiff shall: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i); or b. file a proposed seventh amended complaint in compliance with this order which shall be typed or clearly written and marked as Plaintiffs "seventh amended complaint." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 4/30/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
April 6, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #63 NOTICE TO WITHDRAW THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE TO WITHDRAW THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ re #61 Amended Complaint (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
April 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #61 Amended Complaint, #62 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 61 PROPOSED SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) Modified on 4/28/2021 to add "SIXTH" (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
February 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #60 Answer. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 60 ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MOTION DATED JANUARY 21, 2021 by JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
January 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #57 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND COMPLAINT, #59 Affidavit of Service, #58 Amended Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 59 SWORN STATEMENT re #9 Summons Issued as to NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS, filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 58 ***STRICKEN PER #64 ORDER*** PROPOSED FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT/PETITION AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) Modified on 4/28/2021 to label complaint as FIFTH rather than FOURTH amended complaint(jcw). Modified on 5/3/2021 (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 57 PETITION/MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND COMPLAINT by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
December 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #56 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 56 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND OR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S JUAN H. SOTO SOLA LAW MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 636/MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #52 MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C.A. 636 filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #51 Third Amended Complaint. The clerk of the court shall strike Plaintiff's third amended complaint (Doc. #51 ) from the electronic docket. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #46 MOTION SUBMITTING DOCUMENTS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #27 Motion FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
December 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #52 MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C.A. 636. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C.A. 636 by JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 19, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #47 Response in Opposition to Motion, #48 Response in Opposition to Motion, #51 Amended Complaint, #50 Response in Opposition to Motion, #49 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 51 ***STRICKEN PER #55 ORDER*** FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT) (jcw) Modified on 12/10/2020 (jcw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2021: #1 Affidavit in Support) (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 SECOND MOTION REQUESTING DISMISSAL filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Stay filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION Leave to File Spanish-Language Documents filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #46 MOTION Submitting Documents. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 46 DEFENDANT ADA ALBORS HERNNDEZ MOTION SUBMITTING DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (SCHELL, RICHARD) Modified to edit title on 11/18/2020 (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #44 Response in Opposition to Motion, #45 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 SECOND MOTION REQUESTING DISMISSAL filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) ( [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File. On or before November 17, 2020, Defendant shall file a certified translation of (Doc. #33 -4). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/29/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings - Certified translation due by 11/17/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #42 MOTION SUBMITTING DOCUMENTS AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REMAINING TRANSLATION. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION SUBMITTING DOCUMENTS AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REMAINING TRANSLATION by ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (SCHELL, RICHARD) Modified on 10/29/2020 to amend title (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File. On or before 11/23/2020, Plaintiff shall file responses to each of Defendants' respective motions to dismiss (Docs. #33 , #36 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/27/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss, #36 MOTION TO DISMISS. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss, #36 MOTION TO DISMISS by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING UNDER RULE 15 by JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #39 SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING UNDER RULE 15. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER entered on #33 , #36 Motions to Dismiss. If Plaintiff opposes Defendants' motions to dismiss, on or before November 2, 2020, Plaintiff must file a separate response to each motion. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/16/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to File Spanish-Language Documents and Certified Translations. On or before 10/28/2020, Defendant shall file certified translations of the foreign language documents attached as exhibits to her motion to dismiss. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/16/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #36 SECOND MOTION REQUESTING DISMISSAL. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 36 SECOND MOTION REQUESTING DISMISSAL by JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #34 MOTION to Stay , #35 MOTION Leave to File Spanish-Language Documents re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION Leave to File Spanish-Language Documents re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (SCHELL, RICHARD) Modified on 10/19/2020 (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay by ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (SCHELL, RICHARD) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/21/2020).), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (SCHELL, RICHARD) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE - Richard J. Schell moves for leave to appear pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, Ada Monserrate Albors Hernandez. ECF No. #30 . He has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for appearing pro hac vice. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/2/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE - Miguel Simonet-Sierra moves for leave to appear pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, Ada Monserrate Albors Hernndez. ECF No. #29 . He has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for appearing pro hac vice. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/2/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard J. Schell.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5685158.) by ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SCHELL, RICHARD) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Miguel Simonet-Sierra.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5685090.) by ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SIMONET-SIERRA, MIGUEL) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge re #27 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
October 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #28 Third Amended Complaint, #27 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND COMPLAINT. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 28 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND COMPLAINT by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying without prejudice #24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/28/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Ada Monserrate Albors Hernandez shall respond to Plaintiff's second amended complaint (Doc. #16 ) on or before October 7, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/28/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to JACOB L. BOEHNER re ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 24, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #24 ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT MOTION REQUESTING DISMISSAL. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 24, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint . Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT MOTION REQUESTING DISMISSAL by JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint by ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ. (SILVERSTEIN, MURRAY) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MURRAY BRUCE SILVERSTEIN on behalf of ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ (SILVERSTEIN, MURRAY) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXECUTE SERVICE OF PROCESS AND MOTION FOR ASSISTANCE TO APPOINT FEDERAL MARSHAL. The clerk of the court shall issue a summons for Defendant Noriega Rodriguez Y Noriega Costas and send the summons to Plaintiff. The clerk shall also send Plaintiff a copy of the waiver of service forms (an AO-398 form and an AO-399 form) for her use (it is Plaintiff's responsibility to determine the number of forms she needs and make the appropriate number of photocopies). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/23/2020. (jcw)(Forms sent as ordered.) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's time to file her second amended complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to September 9, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/22/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020; JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; SUCESSION TO JUAN ALBERTO ALBORS HERNANDEZ served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ, JUAN ALBERTO ALBORS HERNANDEZ, JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW, NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS, filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) Modified on 9/22/2020 (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File re #13 Order by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. Per MJF chambers, address updated to 4258 Raleigh Way, Tallahassee, FL 32311. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
September 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File re #13 Order, #16 Amended Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #7 Amended Complaint. On or before 9/8/2020, Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint pursuant with the instructions set forth above. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/25/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REFERRAL AND ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On June 16, 2020, Plaintiff paid the $400.00 fee (Doc. 4 ). This payment of the filing fee also indicates that Plaintiff is not so indigent as to be unable to pay the filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/25/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
July 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXECUTE SERVICE OF PROCESS AND MOTION FOR ASSISTANCE TO APPOINT FEDERAL MARSHAL OR ANOTHER PERSON TO EXECUTE SERVICE OF PROCESS. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXECUTE SERVICE OF PROCESS AND MOTION FOR ASSISTANCE TO APPOINT FEDERAL MARSHAL OR ANOTHER PERSON TO EXECUTE SERVICE OF PROCESS by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REFERRAL AND ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On June 16, 2020, Plaintiff paid the $400.00 fee (Doc. 4 ). This payment of the filing fee also indicates that Plaintiff is not so indigent as to be unable to pay the filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/17/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (3 service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #7 Amended Complaint. 3 service copies filed. (jcw) Modified on 6/16/2020 (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN4-39365. Fee status updated to paid. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Amended Complaint. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 5 3 service copies filed, 4 Filing Fee Received. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
June 3, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 8/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Albors-Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA ALBORS GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Albors-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carymar Perez-Cintron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN ALBERTO ALBORS HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUCESSION TO JUAN ALBERTO ALBORS HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA MONSERRATE ALBORS HERNANDEZ
Represented By: MIGUEL SIMONET-SIERRA, SR
Represented By: MURRAY BRUCE SILVERSTEIN
Represented By: RICHARD J SCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN H SOTO SOLA LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORIEGA RODRIGUEZ Y NORIEGA COSTAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Alberto Albors-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Succession to Juan Alberto Albors-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada Monserrate Albors-Hernandez
Represented By: MURRAY BRUCE SILVERSTEIN
Represented By: RICHARD J SCHELL
Represented By: Miguel Simonet-Sierra, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?