Suarez-Diaz et al v. MCS Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carlos Suarez-Diaz, Brenda Colon-Lugo, Community Property Partnership Suarez-Colon, Karelis Suarez-Colon and Karla Suarez-Colon
Defendant: MCS Life Insurance Company, ICAHN Automotive Group LLC and Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01376
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Giovanna P. Moreno-Lopez on behalf of MCS Life Insurance Company Responses due by 10/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Moreno-Lopez, Giovanna)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw , MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Rosangela Torres-Torres filed by Rosangela Torres-Torres on behalf of Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Torres, Rosangela)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Antonio L. Garcia on behalf of Defendant Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc..(Garcia, Antonio)
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until October 6, 2021 to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Giovanna P. Moreno-Lopez on behalf of MCS Life Insurance Company Responses due by 10/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Moreno-Lopez, Giovanna)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations filed by Antonio L. Garcia on behalf of Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Garcia, Antonio)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of MCS Life Insurance Company (Dapena, Ramon)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 22, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Giovanna P. Moreno-Lopez on behalf of MCS Life Insurance Company Responses due by 9/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Moreno-Lopez, Giovanna)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Antonio L. Garcia on behalf of Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia, Antonio)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 22, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Antonio L. Garcia on behalf of Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Garcia, Antonio)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Rosangela Torres-Torres on behalf of Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Torres-Torres, Rosangela)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Antonio L. Garcia on behalf of Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia, Antonio)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Garcia, Antonio)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Guayama First Instance Court, case number GM2021CV00290. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7417051), filed by Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit Exhibit III, #4 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suarez-Diaz et al v. MCS Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Suarez-Diaz
Represented By: Diego Ledee-Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Colon-Lugo
Represented By: Diego Ledee-Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Property Partnership Suarez-Colon
Represented By: Diego Ledee-Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karelis Suarez-Colon
Represented By: Diego Ledee-Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Suarez-Colon
Represented By: Diego Ledee-Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Giovanna P. Moreno-Lopez
Represented By: Ramon E. Dapena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICAHN Automotive Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Antonio L. Garcia
Represented By: Rosangela Torres-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?