Sonera-Cruz v. United States Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Alice Betzaida Sonera and Alice B. Sonera-Cruz
Defendant: United States Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv01398
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: See attached. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/22/2021. The Clerk shall notify Ms. Sonera-Cruz with copy of this Order and with the appropriate form to Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/12/2021.(LMR)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet) (arg)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Second NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 8/30/2021 (mcm).
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 ***FILLD IN ERROR*** First NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 8/30/2021 (mcm).
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR**F irst NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 8/30/2021 (mcm).
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR**** SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Alice Betzaida Sonera-Cruz against All Defendants, filed by Alice Betzaida Sonera.(Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 8/30/2021 (mcm).
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/27/2021. (arg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Exhibits Summons by Susan Marie Cordero-Ladner on behalf of Alice Betzaida Sonera.(Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified to correct event on 8/30/2021 (mcm).
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Alice Betzaida Sonera-Cruz against United States Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7426921.), filed by Alice Betzaida Sonera. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Cordero-Ladner, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonera-Cruz v. United States Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Betzaida Sonera
Represented By: Susan Marie Cordero-Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice B. Sonera-Cruz
Represented By: Susan Marie Cordero-Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?