Oriental Financial Services, LLC v. Esparza et al
Petitioner: Oriental Financial Services, LLC
Respondent: Jose Luis Esparza, Egdaliz Blanco de Esparza, JL Esparza, INC. and Lizmarie Esparza
Case Number: 3:2021cv01471
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 27 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Granting #23 "Motion for Extension of Time." The appearing party shall respond not later than December 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/22/2021. (ebb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for extension of time filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Financial Services, LLC Responses due by 12/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
November 18, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Luis E. Minana on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Minana, Luis) Modified on 11/22/2021 to edit event's title (mcm).
November 18, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Luis E. Minana on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Minana, Luis)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: See attached. Deadline for Rule 26 disclosures: November 1, 2021. Deadline to amend the pleadings and to add parties: November 11, 2021. Motion(s) to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings: November 18, 2021. Conclusion of all discovery (including third party, factual and expert): February 1, 2022. Every 60 days, beginning on December 2, 2021, the parties shall file a Joint Motion informing the court of the status of discovery. Deadline to file motion(s) for summary judgment: February 16, 2022. Opposition(s) thereto: March 9, 2022. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). See Instructions pertaining to documents not in the English Language and courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/18/2021. (ebb)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Noting #16 "Joint Initial Scheduling Conference Report." Case Management Order will follow. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/18/2021. (ebb)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting #17 "Motion for Extension of Time." The appearing party shall respond not later than November 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/18/2021. (ebb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time until November 18, 2021 to submit responses to filings at Docket Nos. 6 and 7 filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Financial Services, LLC Responses due by 10/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by Egdaliz Blanco de Esparza, Jose Luis Esparza, Lizmarie Esparza, JL Esparza, INC., Oriental Financial Services, LLC. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting #14 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/12/2021. (LM)
October 11, 2021 Filing 14 Motion to allow W. Scott Greco to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7486501) filed by Luis E. Minana on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Minana, Luis)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noting #12 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2021. (ebb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Teresa De Felice-Alejandro on behalf of Oriental Financial Services, LLC (De Felice-Alejandro, Paula)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noting #10 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2021. (ebb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Financial Services, LLC (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #7 "Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award." Oriental Financial Services, LLC, shall respond not later than October 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/5/2021. (LM)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by October 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/5/2021. (ebb)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION requesting Order to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Luis E. Minana on behalf of Egdaliz Blanco de Esparza, Jose Luis Esparza, Lizmarie Esparza, JL Esparza, INC. Responses due by 10/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A OFS' Submission Agreement (1), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Award)(Minana, Luis)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint Petition to Vacate filed by Luis E. Minana on behalf of Respondents Egdaliz Blanco de Esparza, Jose Luis Esparza, Lizmarie Esparza, JL Esparza, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Panel's Inquiry Regarding Zoom Hearings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Email Zoom hearings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C OFS' Submission Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Response to Motion to Dismiss (1)_Redacted, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E 15-01424, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E 16-02549)(Minana, Luis)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Egdaliz Blanco de Esparza, Jose Luis Esparza, Lizmarie Esparza, JL Esparza, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit) (Minana, Luis)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) and Category sheet not included electronically, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/30/2021. (ad)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Minana, Luis E. re: non-payment of filing fees. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/30/2021. (ad)
September 29, 2021 Filing Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt number PRX100079303 (arg)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SAN JUAN SUPERIOR COURT, case number SJ2021CV1471. (), filed by JL Esparza, INC., Egdaliz Blanco de Esparza, Jose Luis Esparza, Lizmarie Esparza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-AWARD, #2 Exhibit B-Petition in State Court in Spanish, #3 Exhibit B-ANEJOS, #4 Exhibit C-TRANSLATION OF VACATUR IN TPI)(Minana, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oriental Financial Services, LLC v. Esparza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oriental Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Represented By: Paula Teresa De Felice-Alejandro
Represented By: Pedro Hernandez-Freire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose Luis Esparza
Represented By: Luis E. Minana
Represented By: William Scott Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Egdaliz Blanco de Esparza
Represented By: Luis E. Minana
Represented By: William Scott Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JL Esparza, INC.
Represented By: Luis E. Minana
Represented By: William Scott Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lizmarie Esparza
Represented By: Luis E. Minana
Represented By: William Scott Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?