Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. v. Ingraham Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant: Ingraham Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01485
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Defendant Ingraham Group, LLC.(Peirats, Jorge)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 Amended Motion to allow Edward Klein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7511054) filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Ingraham Group, LLC Responses due by 11/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Peirats, Jorge)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 Amended Motion to allow Efrem Fischer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7511061) filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Ingraham Group, LLC Responses due by 11/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Peirats, Jorge)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #7 Motion to allow Edward Klein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7511054). ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking PHV's proper signature. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #8 Motion to allow Efrem Fischer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7511061). ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking PHV's proper signature. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking PHV's proper signature. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** Motion to allow Efrem Fischer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7511061) filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Ingraham Group, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Peirats, Jorge) Modified to file in error on 11/1/2021 (idg).
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking PHV's proper signature. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** Motion to allow Edward Klein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7511054) filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Ingraham Group, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Peirats, Jorge) Modified to file in error on 11/1/2021 (idg).
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Ingraham Group, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Peirats, Jorge)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Submitting Evidence of Service of Summons re: #3 Summons Issued filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Responses due by 10/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service of Summons)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ingraham Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ingraham Group, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7481100.), filed by Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Service due by 1/3/2022, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons)(Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. v. Ingraham Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liptis Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez
Represented By: Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingraham Group, LLC
Represented By: Jorge I. Peirats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?