James-Febo v. Negociado Del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: DANNY JAMES-FEBO
Defendant: Negociado Del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico, Departamento de Seguridad Publica, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Secretary of Justice of Puerto Rico, Celia Feijoo-Nieves, Tania Medina-Figueroa, Francisco Peterson-Montijo, Ariel Colon-Rodriguez, Sandra Toledo-Perez and Alberto Cruz-Albarran
Case Number: 3:2021cv01595
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for extension of time. Defendants shall plead or otherwise defend by March 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/2/2022. (mrr)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time filed by Elisabet Garcia-Torres on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Negociado del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico Responses due by 2/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Torres, Elisabet)
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabet Garcia-Torres on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Negociado del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico (Garcia-Torres, Elisabet)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Negociado del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (Ramos-Pagan, David)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (Ramos-Pagan, David)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Negociado del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Danny James-Febo. (Attachments: #1 Summons For Commonwealth, #2 Summons For Fire Department)(Ramos-Pagan, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits: Category Sheet re: #1 Complaint, filed by David Ramos-Pagan on behalf of Danny James-Febo. (Ramos-Pagan, David) Modified docket text and event on 12/13/2021 (rim).
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits: Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint filed by David Ramos-Pagan on behalf of Danny James-Febo. (Ramos-Pagan, David) Modified docket text and event on 12/13/2021 (rim).
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7561826.), filed by DANNY JAMES-FEBO. Service due by 3/9/2022,(Ramos-Pagan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James-Febo v. Negociado Del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY JAMES-FEBO
Represented By: David Ramos-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Negociado Del Cuerpo de Bomberos de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Elisabet Garcia-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento de Seguridad Publica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Elisabet Garcia-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Justice of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celia Feijoo-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tania Medina-Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Peterson-Montijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Colon-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Toledo-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Cruz-Albarran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?