Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc. et al v. Ocean Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund II for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund III for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund IV For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund V For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc. and Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc.
Defendant: Ocean Capital LLC, William Heath Hawk, Jos R. Izquierdo II, Brent D. Rosenthal, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Ethan Danial, PRCE Management LLC, Benjamin T. Eilier, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Francisco Gonzalez, Gustavo Nevarez Torres, Alejandro Acosta Rivera, Honne II, LLP, Meir Hurwitz, Mario J. Montalvo, Jos M. Prez-Gutirrez, Sanzam Investments LLC, Juan E. Soto Alvarado, Sandra Caldern, The Estate of Jos Hidalgo, Avraham Zeines, Jose R. Izquierdo II and Jose M. Perez-Gutierrez
Debtor: RAD Investments LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01101
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Joinder Re: #42 MOTION to dismiss and Request for Hearing; Memorandum of Law in Support as to Jose R. Izquierdo II, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, Ocean Capital LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Ethan Danial, PRCE Management LLC, William H MOTION for Hearing filed by Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Ethan Danial, William Heath Hawk, Benjamin T. Eilier, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Brent D. Rosenthal filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of Francisco Gonzalez, Honne II, LLP, Mario J. Montalvo Responses due by 5/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #42 ) (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Matthew Garsson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Garsson, Robert)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte K. Newell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newell, Charlotte)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex J Kaplan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kaplan, Alex)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Stern on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stern, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #42 MOTION to dismiss and Request for Hearing; Memorandum of Law in Support as to Jose R. Izquierdo II, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, Ocean Capital LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Ethan Danial, PRCE Management LLC, William H filed by Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Ethan Danial, William Heath Hawk, Benjamin T. Eilier, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Brent D. Rosenthal (Charlson, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to dismiss and Request for Hearing; Memorandum of Law in Support as to Jose R. Izquierdo II, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, Ocean Capital LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Ethan Danial, PRCE Management LLC, William Heath Hawk filed by Jose R. Izquierdo II, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, Ocean Capital LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Ethan Danial, PRCE Management LLC, William Heath Hawk Responses due by 5/9/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Charlson, Michael). Added MOTION for Hearing on 4/26/2022 (idg).
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lloyd Charlson on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris (Charlson, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of Ethan Danial (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or a pre-answer motion re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund V For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund IV For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund II for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund III for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc. filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of Francisco Gonzalez, Honne II, LLP, Mario J. Montalvo Responses due by 5/6/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of Francisco Gonzalez, Honne II, LLP, Mario J. Montalvo (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Alex J. Kaplan, Andrew J. Stern, Charlotte K. Newell, Robert M. Garsson, Michael Charlson, Marisa Antonelli, Meghan Natenson re: 36 Order on Motion to Appear PHV: The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (idg)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. Co-defendants Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, William Heath Hawk, Benjamin T. Eiler, Vasileiros A. Sfyris, Jos R. Izquierdo II, Brent D. Rosenthal and Roxana Cruz-Riveras second motion for extension of time to file an answer to the complaint at ECF No. 34 is GRANTED. No further extensions shall be granted absent exigent circumstances. The motion for extension of time at ECF No. 32 is MOOT. Answer due by May 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/21/22. (wm)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. The Pro Hac Vice applications at ECF Nos. 17, 18, 19, 20, 22, 23, 24 are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall update the case caption accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/21/2022. (wm)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Alejandro Acosta Rivera served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 2, 2022 to File Answer filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris Responses due by 4/28/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Consent MOTION for extension of time until 4/14/22 to to answer, move or otherwise respond or plead filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris Responses due by 4/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Vasileios A. Sfyris served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon PRCE Management LLC served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Mario J. Montalvo served on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Francisco Gonzalez served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Honne II, LLP served on 3/26/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Benjamin T. Eilier served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon William Heath Hawk served on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motion to allow Meghan Natenson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7696798) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris Responses due by 4/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Motion to allow Marisa Antonelli to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7696782) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris Responses due by 4/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Motion to allow Michael Charlson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7696770) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris Responses due by 4/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Ocean Capital LLC, PRCE Management LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Vasileios A. Sfyris (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to allow Robert M. Garsson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7669004) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Motion to allow Charlotte K. Newell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668996) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to allow Andrew J. Stern to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668982) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion to allow Alex J. Kaplan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668974) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued as to Alejandro Acosta Rivera, Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Ethan Danial, Benjamin T. Eilier, Francisco Gonzalez, William Heath Hawk, Honne II, LLP, Jose R. Izquierdo II, Gustavo Nevarez Torres, PRCE Management LLC, Jose M. Perez-Gutierrez, RAD Investments LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Sanzam Investments LLC, Vasileios A. Sfyris, Juan E. Soto Alvarado, The Estate of Jose Hidalgo and Avraham Zeines. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Sandra Calderon, Meir Hurwitz, Mario J. Montalvo (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #12 Motion to allow Andrew W. Stern to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668982), #13 Motion to allow Charlotte K. Newell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668996), #11 Motion to allow Alex J. Kaplan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668974), #14 Motion to allow Robert M. Garsson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7669004). ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect signature format for Applicant Counsel-PHV. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect signature format for Applicant Counsel-PHV. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** Motion to allow Robert M. Garsson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7669004) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia) Modified to file in error on 3/11/2022 (idg).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect signature format for Applicant Counsel-PHV. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** Motion to allow Charlotte K. Newell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668996) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia) Modified to file in error on 3/11/2022 (idg).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect signature format for Applicant Counsel-PHV. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** Motion to allow Andrew W. Stern to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668982) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia) Modified to file in error on 3/11/2022 (idg).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect signature format for Applicant Counsel-PHV. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** Motion to allow Alex J. Kaplan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7668974) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia) Modified to file in error on 3/11/2022 (idg).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Ocean Capital LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits - Summons filed by Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo) Modified title on 3/11/2022 (idg).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons as to Sandra Caldern, Meir Hurwitz, Mario J. Montalvo filed by Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo) Modified title on 3/10/2022 (idg).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons as to Avraham Zeines filed by Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo) Modified title on 3/10/2022 (idg).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Exhibits Summons as to Alejandro Acosta Rivera, Ethan Danial, Francisco Gonzalez, Honne II, LLP, Gustavo Nevarez Torres, Jose M. Perez-Gutierrez, Juan E. Soto Alvarado, The Estate of Jos Hidalgo filed by Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Viviani-Melendez, Gustavo) Modified title on 3/10/2022 (idg).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits as to Roxana Cruz-Rivera, Benjamin T. Eilier, William Heath Hawk, Jose R. Izquierdo II, PRCE Management LLC, RAD Investments LLC, Brent D. Rosenthal, Sanzam Investments LLC, Vasileios A. Sfyris filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/21/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons PRCE Management LLC, #2 Summons Summons RAD Investments, #3 Summons Summons SANZAM Investments, #4 Summons Summons V Sfyris, #5 Summons Summons B Eiler, #6 Summons Summons B Rosenthal, #7 Summons Summons J Izquierdo, #8 Summons Summons R. Cruz Rivera, #9 Summons Summons W Hawk)(Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia) Modified title on 3/10/2022 (idg).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ocean Capital LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons as to Ocean Capital LLC filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Ocean Capital LLC)(Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia) Modified title on 3/3/2022 (idg).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7656412.), filed by Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund II for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund III for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund IV For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc., Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund V For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc.. Service due by 5/31/2022, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc. et al v. Ocean Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund II for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund III for Puerto Rico Residents, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund IV For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tax-Free Fixed Income Fund V For Puerto Rico Residents, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puerto Rico Residents Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Gustavo J. Viviani-Melendez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Charlotte K. Newell
Represented By: Robert Matthew Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Capital LLC
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Heath Hawk
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos R. Izquierdo II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent D. Rosenthal
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxana Cruz-Rivera
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Danial
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRCE Management LLC
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin T. Eilier
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasileios A. Sfyris
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Nevarez Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Acosta Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honne II, LLP
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meir Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario J. Montalvo
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos M. Prez-Gutirrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanzam Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan E. Soto Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Caldern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Jos Hidalgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avraham Zeines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose R. Izquierdo II
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose M. Perez-Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: RAD Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?