Eisenberg v. Numeris Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Avraham Eisenberg
Defendant: Numeris Ltd., Sasha Ivanov and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2022cv01325
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7 U.S.C. ยง 25 Fraud - Commodities Leverage Contracts
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION Requesting Issuance of Subpoenas filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 9/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to GitBook Inc. and GitHub, Inc., #2 Subpoena to Medium Corporation, #3 Subpoena to Twitter, Inc.)(Putbrese, Cortland)
September 1, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Samuel Johnson, James Creedon, Christian Cowart re: 13 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, 12 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, 14 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (idg)
August 31, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Sasha Ivanov (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: #8 Motion for Hearing. DENIED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/31/2022. (ao)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: #7 Motion to Restrict. GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/31/2022. (ao)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: #6 Motion to Appear PHV. GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/31/2022. (ao)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: #5 Motion to Appear PHV. GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/31/2022. (ao)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: #4 Motion to Appear PHV. GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/31/2022. (ao)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/31/2022. (wm)
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Sasha Ivanov filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 9/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Putbrese, Cortland)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Eisenberg's motion at ECF No. 2 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The requests for a TRO and request to serve summons via alternate means are DENIED. However, Eisenberg's request to expedite discovery is GRANTED but only within the parameters afore set forth by the Court. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/10/2022. (wm)
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing as to Ex-Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order & Other Relief [ECF No. 2] re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief and Memorandum in Support filed by Avraham Eisenberg filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 8/5/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Putbrese, Cortland)
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 7/28/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Putbrese, Cortland) Modified to to remove restriction inadvertently placed by counsel on 7/15/2022 (rim).
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to allow Christian Cowart to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7828791) filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 7/26/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Putbrese, Cortland)
July 8, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to allow James Creedon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7827112) filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 7/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Putbrese, Cortland)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to allow Samuel Johnson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7827104) filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 7/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Putbrese, Cortland)
July 8, 2022 NOTICE to Counsel by Deputy Clerk re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief and Memorandum in Support. Attorney Putbrese is notified of the requisite to file a Motion to Restrict in compliance with the Standing Order No. 9 filed in Misc. 03-149(ADC). Motion to Restrict to be filed. (idg)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief and Memorandum in Support filed by Cortland C. Putbrese on behalf of Avraham Eisenberg Responses due by 7/20/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Samuel H. Johnson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Avraham Eisenberg, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, Sasha Ivanov, Numeris Ltd. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7822820.), filed by Avraham Eisenberg. Service due by 10/4/2022, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Putbrese, Cortland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisenberg v. Numeris Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avraham Eisenberg
Represented By: Cortland C. Putbrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Numeris Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasha Ivanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?