Sanchez-Sifonte et al v. Fonseca et al
Plaintiff: Elias Sanchez-Sifonte and Valerie Rodriguez-Erazo
Defendant: Josue Fonseca, Telemundo Internacional LLC, Jay Fonseca, Telemundo International Studios LLC, Telemundo de Puerto Rico, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC doing business as Telemundo Station Group, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, TM Television Inc., TM Entertainment, Inc., Does 1-10, Antonio G Mojena, Jose Cancela, Manuel Martinez, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC, NBC Universal Media LLC doing business as Telemundo Station Group and Antonio G. Mojena
Case Number: 3:2022cv01444
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G. Mojena, NBC Universal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC, filed by Valerie Rodriguez-Erazo, Elias Sanchez-Sifonte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Second Amended Complaint)(Navarro, Luis)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER noted #128 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/31/2022. (mrr)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION to Amend/Correct Minute of Proceedings Re: 127 Status Conference,,, filed by Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria on behalf of Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G. Mojena, NBC Universal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 11/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 127 ) (Morales-Echeverria, Natalia)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach: Status Conference held on 10/26/2022 via VTC. Present on behalf of the plaintiffs was attorney Luis Navarro and on behalf of defendants were attorneys Ricardo Casellas, Alfredo Fernandez, Carlos Baralt, Deanna Shullman, and Roberto Sueiro. The parties informed that no discovery has been exchanged. The Court set the following deadlines: amended complaint, if any, due by 11/9/2022, answers to the amended complaint due by 11/23/2022. The Court inquired as to prospects for settlement. Plaintiff shall make a settlement demand by 11/9/2022 and defendants shall respond by 11/23/2022. If needed, the parties shall move for the setting of a settlement conference before a US Magistrate Judge. (Court Reporter Robin Dispenzieri.) (nat)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorenzo J Palomares on behalf of Valerie Rodriguez-Erazo, Elias Sanchez-Sifonte (Palomares, Lorenzo)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Frank Navarro on behalf of Valerie Rodriguez-Erazo, Elias Sanchez-Sifonte (Navarro, Luis)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Lorenzo J. Palomares re: 123 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (rim)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Appear PHV. Attorney Lorenzo J. Palomares admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/12/2022. (mrr)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Luis F. Navarro re: 121 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (rim)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #118 Motion to Appear PHV. Attorney Luis F. Navarro admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/12/2022. (mrr)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Motion to allow Luis Navarro to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7943286) filed by Raymond L. Sanchez-Maceira on behalf of Valerie Rodriguez-Erazo, Elias Sanchez-Sifonte Responses due by 10/21/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Maceira, Raymond)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Motion to allow Lorenzo Palomares to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7943279) filed by Raymond L. Sanchez-Maceira on behalf of Valerie Rodriguez-Erazo, Elias Sanchez-Sifonte Responses due by 10/21/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix)(Sanchez-Maceira, Raymond)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle on behalf of Antonio G. Mojena, TM Television Inc. (Sueiro-Del-Valle, Roberto) Modified to correct docket text title and remove response deadline on 9/27/2022 (rim).
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. Status Conference set for 10/26/2022 at 10:45 AM in VTC Bridge RAM before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Hearing access credentials are available in the following URL link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/video-teleconference-vtc-hearing-links. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 9/26/2022. (nat)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria on behalf of NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC (Morales-Echeverria, Natalia)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo F. Casellas on behalf of NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC (Casellas, Ricardo)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #112 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR Illegible PDF, Counsel shall re-file.*** (rim)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ***FILED IN ERROR Illegible PDF, Counsel shall re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo F. Casellas on behalf of NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC (Casellas, Ricardo) Modified on 9/23/2022 (rim).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #110 Case Transferred In - District Transfer from Southern District of Florida. (rim)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-20543. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Clerk's Notice Administratively Closing Case. Per DE#108 .(nan) Modified Text on 9/8/2022 (nan). [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #73 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TM Television Inc., #74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC, Josue Fonseca, Antonio G Mojena, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Jagual Media LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC, #105 Report and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part #73 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part #74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Adopting #105 Report and Recommendations on #73 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TM Television Inc., #74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC, Josue Fonseca, Antonio G Mojena, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Jagual Media LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC, #105 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:21-cv-20543 electronically transferred out to Puerto Rico. (nan) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Vacate #97 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. Responses due by 9/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC re #105 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by TM Television Inc., #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FO of Non-Objection and Request for Adoption (Joint) (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue filed by TM Television Inc. and #74 MOTION TO DISMISS and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC, Josue Fonseca, Antonio G Mojena, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Jagual Media LLC, and Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. Recommending that the Motions #73 and #74 be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and that this action be TRANSFERRED to the District of Puerto Rico for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 8/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (oco) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian: Zoom Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2022 re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, and #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer. Report and Recommendation to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) :35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Deanna Kendall Shullman, Giselle M. Girones, Luis Frank Navarro, and Lorenzo J Palomares. Court Reporter: Sharon Velazco, 305-523-5636 / Sharon_PellVelazco@flsd.uscourts.gov. (Digital MD_ZOOM_08_10_2022/DAR_14:08:42) (jbs) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, (of Filing Materials in Support of Motion to Transfer [D.E. 73]) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Composite 3) (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions. Please take notice that the Court will hold a Zoom Motion Hearing on 8/10/2022 at 2:00 PM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on #73 Defendant TM Television, Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or To Transfer and #74 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 8/4/2022. (oco) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY HEARING on #95 Defendants' Discovery Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 7/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (mfo) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PAPERLESS ORDER terminating #90 Motion for Discovery; terminating #90 Motion to Compel. The document was improperly uploaded as a motion. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian: ZOOM Discovery Hearing held on 7/12/2022. Order to follow. Total time in court: 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Deanna Kendall Shullman, Giselle M. Girones, and Luis Frank Navarro. (Digital MD_ZOOM_07_12_2022/DAR_14:05:58) (jbs) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE to Discovery Memorandum seeking to compel Plaintiffs' to Provide Rule 26 Disclosure by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: ZOOM Discovery Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. (jbs) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ZOOM Discovery Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 02:00 PM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on #95 Defendant's Discovery Memorandum. Motion Hearing terminated. (jbs) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2023 in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 3/22/2023 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2022. Discovery, including Expert Discovery due by 10/21/2022. Mediation Deadline 10/31/2022. All pre-trial and Daubert Motions due by 12/2/2022. Joint Pretrial Stipulation and In Limine Motions due by 1/19/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting ZOOM Discovery Hearing. Please take notice that the Court will hold a hearing on 7/12/2022 at 02:00 PM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on #95 Defendant's Discovery Memorandum. The Court will provide ZOOM information to all parties upon entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 6/30/2022. (mfo) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM of Law Seeking to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with Joint Stipulation and Provide Rule 26 Disclosures by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION re #90 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery HearingDefendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Rule 26 Disclosures that Comply with Rule 26 (Joint) by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re #90 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery HearingDefendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Rule 26 Disclosures that Comply with Rule 26 filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Replies due by 6/13/2022. (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting ZOOM Discovery Hearing. Please take notice that the Court will hold a ZOOM hearing on 6/7/2022 at 02:00 PM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on #90 Defendant's Discovery Memorandum. The Court will provide ZOOM information to all parties upon entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 5/31/2022. (mfo) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit to Discovery Memorandum by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC re #90 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery HearingDefendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Rule 26 Disclosures that Comply with Rule 26 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery Hearing, Defendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Rule 26 Disclosures that Comply with Rule 26 by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. Responses due by 6/3/2022 (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring case to to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for appropriate resolution of all non-dispositive pretrial matters, as well as motions for attorneys fees and costs and motions for sanctions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ENDORSED ORDER ORDER REFERRING TO JUDGE MELISSA DAMIAN, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by TM Television Inc., #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC, Josue Fonseca, Antonio G Mojena, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Jagual Media LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/26/2022. (btn) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JOINT NOTICE Regarding Withdrawal of Election to Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Amended REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by TM Television Inc.. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer filed by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by TM Television Inc.. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian: ZOOM Status Conference re: Consent held on 1/19/2022. Total time in court: 6 minutes. In attendance were Plaintiffs' counsel Luis Frank Navarro, Esq. and Defendants' counsel Deanna Kendall Shullman, Esq. and Giselle M. Girones, Esq. Parties are instructed to file a Joint Stipulation re: Status of Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction by Wednesday, January 26, 2022. (Digital 15:31:48) (yha) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting ZOOM Status Conference re Consent: ZOOM Status Conference set for 1/19/2022 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. The Court will provide ZOOM information to all parties upon entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 1/13/2022. (mfo) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment back to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jmd) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT signed by: ANTONIO MOJENA re #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT signed by: VANESSA POMBO re #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Sonia Melendez re #74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION TO DISMISS #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television's Motion to Transfer by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. Attorney Deanna Kendall Shullman added to party Antonio G Mojena(pty:dft), Attorney Deanna Kendall Shullman added to party Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by TM Television Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Establish Briefing Schedule re Amended Complaint. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 12/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (mms) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Establish Briefing Schedule re #69 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Response Due Deadline per DE #72 Order: Defendants' Responses due by 12/17/2021. (kpe) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (tro) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, Antonio G Mojena, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC, filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-QQ)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time file Amended Complaint by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Dismiss ( Amended Complaint due by 11/22/2021); granting in part and denying in part #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/22/2021); granting in part and denying in part #37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/22/2021); denying as moot #40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting in part and denying in part #48 Motion to Dismiss (Amended Complaint due by 11/22/2021). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (mms) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying as moot #61 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in support of the plaintiffs' Motion for Default included in the plaintiffs' #51 Response. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (mms) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan over all further proceedings in this matter, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned as presider judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying #17 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (btn) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Clerks Notice to Filer re #62 Reply to Response to Motion,. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (kpe) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY to #57 Response to Motion for Entry of Default Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion for Default filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. (Navarro, Luis) Modified document link on 6/10/2021 (kpe). [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer in Support of Motion for Default by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Filing Copies of Unpublished Opinions by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31], #57 Reply to Response to Motion, #58 Reply to Response to Motion, of Filing Copies of Unpublished Opinions Cited in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Shullman, Deanna) Modified text on 5/27/2021 (kpe). [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31] filed by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 Amended MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, re #51 Motion for Entry of Default and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss D.E. 33 AND Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default [D.E. 51] filed by Telemundo Network Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shullman, Deanna) Modified on 5/27/2021 to add document link (kpe). [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer filed by TM Television Inc.. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER granting #54 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies in support of their Motions to Dismiss. Defendants shall file their replies on before May 26, 2021. No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/5/2021. (btn) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Replies in Support of Defendants Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs Elias Sanchez Sifonte and Valerie Rodriguez Erazos Complaint by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Replies due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Replies due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Replies due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31] filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Replies due by 5/11/2021. (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Mildred Yapor signed by: Mildred Yapor by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Amended MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss D.E. 33 by Telemundo Network Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Attachment A - Pretrial Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date, #3 Attachment C - Election to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate for Final Disposition of Motions, #4 Attachment D - Election to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge for Trial)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss on or before May 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/16/2021. (btn) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. filed by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Clerks Notice to Filer re #43 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Med. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33], #40 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33], #31 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer, #33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31] by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. Responses due by 4/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Navarro, Luis) Modified Relief on 4/16/2021 (ls). [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Thumb Drive re #33 Motion to Dismiss, by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC (kpe) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Vanessa Pombo re #40 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] by Telemundo Network Group, LLC (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] by Telemundo Network Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2021 (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Mariano Schwed re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] by NBCUniversal Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Sheetal Madadi re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] by NBCUniversal Media LLC (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Josue Fonseca and Jagual Media LLC's Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 33] by NBCUniversal Media LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2021 (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Josue Fonseca re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31] by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Sonia I. Melendez De Leon re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31] by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Giselle M. Girones re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31] by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit 24, #20 Exhibit A, #21 Exhibit B, #22 Exhibit C)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in TM Television, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue [D.E. 31] by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2021 (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Antonio Mojena re #31 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer by TM Television Inc. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer by TM Television Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2021 (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Conventionally File Audiovisual Exhibits in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/29/2021. (btn) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Audiovisual Exhibits Conventionally in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna)[Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Jose Cancela, Manuel Martinez, Antonio G Mojena, Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Telemundo of Puerto Rico, LLC, #2 Summon(s) Jose Cancela, #3 Summon(s) Antonio G. Mojena, #4 Summon(s) Manuel Martinez) (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC. (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Television Inc., Telemundo Network Group, LLC. Replies due by 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 20 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Antonio G Mojena, Jose Cancela and Manuel Martinez. (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Telemundo International Studios, LLC, Telemundo Internacional, LLC and TM Entertainment, Inc. ONLY by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Jose Cancela, #2 Summon(s) Antonio G. Mojena, #3 Summon(s) Manuel Martinez) (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. (Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Valerie Rodriguez Erazo, Elias Sanchez Sifonte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ)(Navarro, Luis) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Telemundo Network Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Comcast DW Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent SNL Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Snap Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent E! Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast SportsNet NE Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Telemundo Network Group, LLC (Girones, Giselle) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Telemundo International Studios LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Comcast DW Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent SNL Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Snap Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent E! Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast SportsNet NE Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Telemundo International Studios LLC (Girones, Giselle) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Telemundo Internacional LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Comcast DW Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent SNL Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Snap Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent E! Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast SportsNet NE Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Telemundo Internacional LLC (Girones, Giselle) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NBCUniversal Media LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Comcast DW Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent SNL Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Snap Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent E! Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast SportsNet NE Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBCUniversal Media LLC (Girones, Giselle) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jagual Media LLC (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by TM Entertainment, Inc. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by TM Television Inc. (Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Defendants Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Entertainment, Inc., TM Television Inc., Telemundo Internacional LLC, Telemundo International Studios LLC, and Telemundo Network Group, LLC shall file their responses to the Complaint on or before April 2, 2021. No further extensions of time shall be granted. Moreover, counsel is advised not to call Chambers to inquire about the status of filed motions. Such phone calls are distracting, unnecessary, and inappropriate. The Court is keenly aware of all motions pending before it and does not need reminders from counsel. In the future, such phone calls may result in the denial of the underlying request for extension of time. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/13/2021. (btn) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Entertainment, Inc., TM Television Inc., Telemundo Internacional LLC, Telemundo International Studios LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Giselle M. Girones on behalf of Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Entertainment, Inc., TM Television Inc., Telemundo Internacional LLC, Telemundo International Studios LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC. Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party Josue Fonseca(pty:dft), Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party Jagual Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party NBCUniversal Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party TM Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party TM Television Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party Telemundo Internacional LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party Telemundo International Studios LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Giselle M. Girones added to party Telemundo Network Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Girones, Giselle) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Elise Fugate on behalf of Josue Fonseca, Jagual Media LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Entertainment, Inc., TM Television Inc., Telemundo Internacional LLC, Telemundo International Studios LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC. Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Josue Fonseca(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Jagual Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party NBCUniversal Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party TM Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party TM Television Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Telemundo Internacional LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Telemundo International Studios LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Telemundo Network Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Eric Ruben Huertas Morales, mailing date February 10, 2021, (pt) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14359693, filed by Telemundo Internacional LLC, TM Television Inc., Josue Fonseca, NBCUniversal Media LLC, TM Entertainment, Inc., Jagual Media LLC, Telemundo Network Group, LLC, Telemundo International Studios LLC. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Shullman, Deanna) [Transferred from flsd on 9/13/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Sifonte et al v. Fonseca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josue Fonseca
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo Internacional LLC
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Fonseca
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo International Studios LLC
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagual Media LLC
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media LLC doing business as Telemundo Station Group
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo Network Group, LLC
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TM Television Inc.
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TM Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio G Mojena
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Cancela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal Media LLC doing business as Telemundo Station Group
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Represented By: Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio G. Mojena
Represented By: Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Sanchez-Sifonte
Represented By: Eric Ruben Huertas Morales
Represented By: Luis Frank Navarro
Represented By: Lorenzo J Palomares
Represented By: Raymond L. Sanchez-Maceira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Rodriguez-Erazo
Represented By: Lorenzo J Palomares
Represented By: Luis Frank Navarro
Represented By: Eric Ruben Huertas Morales
Represented By: Raymond L. Sanchez-Maceira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?