Rodriguez v. Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alma Leticia Rodriguez
Defendant: Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc., Palmas del Mar Properties Inc., Multinational Insurance Co., MAPFRE - PRAICO Insurance Company, Municipality of Humacao and ABC Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2022cv01502
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting and granting #15 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than January 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/8/2022. (AEM)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Noting and granting in part #14 "Notice of Appearance as Counsel of Record and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than January 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/8/2022. (AEM)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Noting and granting #13 "Notice of Appearance and Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than January 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/8/2022. (AEM)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Noting and granting in part #12 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than January 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/8/2022. (AEM)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Noting and granting #5 "Notice of Appearance and Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than December 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/8/2022. (AEM)
December 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION Requesting for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Jaime Mayol-Bianchi on behalf of Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc. Responses due by 12/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mayol-Bianchi, Jaime) Modified on 12/8/2022 to correct title event (mcm).
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for extension of time until January 5th, 2023 to Answer Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Maria Eugenia Calderon-Martinez on behalf of Multinational Insurance Co. Responses due by 12/19/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Calderon-Martinez, Maria) Modified on 12/5/2022to edit title event (mcm).
December 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION Requesting Extension of Time to Plead by Andres Gonzalez-Berdecia on behalf of MAPFRE - PRAICO Insurance Company (Gonzalez-Berdecia, Andres) Modified on 12/5/2022 to add motion event (mcm).
December 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION Requesting Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Jessica Hernandez-Sierra on behalf of Palmas del Mar Properties Inc. (Hernandez-Sierra, Jessica) Modified on 12/2/2022 to add motion's event (mcm).
December 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alma Leticia Rodriguez upon Palmas del Mar Properties Inc. served on 11/11/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
December 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc. served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
December 1, 2022 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR - Missing Clerk's signature. Counsel to re-file correct document.*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Multinational Insurance Co. served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo) Modified on 12/2/2022 (mcm).
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon MAPFRE - PRAICO Insurance Company served on 11/11/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Municipality of Humacao served on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance as additional counsel by Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION Requesting Extension of Time to Plead by Andres Gonzalez-Berdecia on behalf of Municipality of Humacao (Gonzalez-Berdecia, Andres) Modified on 11/28/2022 to add Motion event (mcm).
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to MAPFRE - PRAICO Insurance Company, Multinational Insurance Co., Municipality of Humacao, Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc., Palmas del Mar Properties Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR - Missing electronic signature. Summons will be re-filed.*** SUMMONS Issued as to MAPFRE - PRAICO Insurance Company, Multinational Insurance Co., Municipality of Humacao, Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc., Palmas del Mar Properties Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) Modified on 10/19/2022 (mcm).
October 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7954072.), filed by Alma Leticia Rodriguez. Service due by 1/17/2023, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Leticia Rodriguez
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmas del Mar Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Mayol-Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmas del Mar Properties Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Hernandez-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multinational Insurance Co.
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Calderon-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPFRE - PRAICO Insurance Company
Represented By: Andres Gonzalez-Berdecia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Humacao
Represented By: Andres Gonzalez-Berdecia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?