Perez-Arritola et al v. Garcia-Muniz et al
Plaintiff: David J. Perez-Arritola and Puerto Rico Housing Financing Authority
Defendant: Carlos L. Garca-Muniz, Carmen A. Sola-Morales, Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garca Muiz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan, Garca-Sola Muniz Conjugal Property Partnership, MAC Development Corp., Miguel A. Ramos-Lozada, Maria M. Hernandez-Solivan, Ramos-Hernndez Conjugal Partnership, De Diego Village LLC, De Diego Village Holding Inc., Plaza De Diego, S.E., United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, John Doe, Richard Doe, ABC Company, ABC Insurance Company, Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz, Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan and Garcia -Sola Conjugal Property Partnership
Case Number: 3:2022cv01507
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint filed by Leticia Maria Casalduc-Rabell on behalf of Garcia -Sola Conjugal Property Partnership, Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz, Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan, Carmen A. Sola-Morales Responses due by 1/3/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casalduc-Rabell, Leticia)
December 17, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint on Jurisdictional Grounds filed by Juan A. Moldes-Rodriguez on behalf of Plaza De Diego, S.E. Responses due by 1/3/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Moldes-Rodriguez, Juan)
December 16, 2022 Filing 23 First MOTION to Strike 2nd Amended Complaint Re: #18 Amended Complaint,, filed by David J. Perez-Arritola filed by Jorge A. Cartaya-Brao on behalf of MAC Development Corp. Responses due by 12/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Cartaya-Brao, Jorge)
December 16, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Document -Second Amended Complant filed by Luis M. Ferrer-Medina on behalf of David J. Perez-Arritola Responses due by 12/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2nd Amended Complaint)(Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
December 16, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation into the English language of Plaintiffs Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss in Favor of the Puerto Rico Housing Finance Authority filed at the State Court re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to David J. Perez-Arritola filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development filed by Enrique Silva-Aviles on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development Responses due by 12/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certified Translation into the English language of Plaintiffs Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss in Favor of the Puerto Rico Housing Finance Authority filed at the State Court)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Silva-Aviles, Enrique)
December 9, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION requesting Order Denying as Moot the Motion to Dismiss [D.E. # 7] filed by Luis M. Ferrer-Medina on behalf of David J. Perez-Arritola Responses due by 12/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
December 9, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta on behalf of De Diego Village Holding Inc., Puerto Rico Housing Financing Authority (Alcover-Acosta, Cesar)
December 8, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Company, ABC Insurance Company, De Diego Village Holding Inc., De Diego Village LLC, John Doe, Richard Doe, Garcia -Sola Conjugal Property Partnership, Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz, Maria M. Hernandez-Solivan, Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan, MAC Development Corp., Plaza De Diego, S.E., Puerto Rico Housing Financing Authority, Ramos-Hernndez Conjugal Partnership, Miguel A. Ramos-Lozada, Carmen A. Sola-Morales, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, filed by David J. Perez-Arritola.(Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
December 8, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria on behalf of De Diego Village Holding Inc., Puerto Rico Housing Financing Authority (Morales-Echeverria, Natalia)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff David J. Perez-Arritola's response to the motions at Docket Nos. #7 and #8 is due by 12/21/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 12/5/2022. (MRB)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant HUD shall file its response to the motions at Docket Nos. #5 and #8 by 12/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 12/5/2022. (MRB)
December 2, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 21, 2022 to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to David J. Perez-Arritola filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, #8 MOTION to Bifurcate State Law Claims, Request for the Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction and Remand State Law Claims to State Court, in the alternative MOTION to Remand to State Courtfor Defect in Notice of Removal for Filing Over the 30-day Term to Remove and for other reasons, in the alternativeEndorsed MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as filed by HUD filed by De Diego Village LLC filed by Luis M. Ferrer-Medina on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #7 , #8 ) (Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
November 30, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until December 23, 2022 as to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaza De Diego, S.E., Garcia -Sola Conjugal Property Partnership, Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz, Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan, MAC Development Corp., Carmen A. Sola-Morales, #8 MOTION to Bifurcate State Law Claims, Request for the Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction and Remand State Law Claims to State Court, in the alternative MOTION to Remand to State Courtfor Defect in Notice of Removal for Filing Over the 30-day Term to Remove and for other reasons, in the alternativeEndorsed MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as filed by HUD filed by De Diego Village LLC filed by Enrique Silva-Aviles on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development Responses due by 12/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #5 , #8 ) (Silva-Aviles, Enrique)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff David J. Perez-Arritola's Response to the Motion to Remand at Docket No. #5 is due by 12/21/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/30/2022. (MRB)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan A. Moldes-Rodriguez on behalf of Plaza De Diego, S.E. (Moldes-Rodriguez, Juan)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20 to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaza De Diego, S.E., Garcia -Sola Conjugal Property Partnership, Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz, Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan, MAC Development Corp., Carmen A. Sola-Morales filed by Luis M. Ferrer-Medina on behalf of David J. Perez-Arritola Responses due by 12/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Osvaldo H. Puig-Hernandez on behalf of De Diego Village LLC (Puig-Hernandez, Osvaldo)
November 19, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Bifurcate State Law Claims, Request for the Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction and Remand State Law Claims to State Court, in the alternative, MOTION to Remand to State Courtfor Defect in Notice of Removal for Filing Over the 30-day Term to Remove and for other reasons, in the alternative, Endorsed MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as filed by HUD filed by Roberto Santana-Aparicio on behalf of De Diego Village LLC Responses due by 12/5/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santana-Aparicio, Roberto)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to David J. Perez-Arritola filed by Enrique Silva-Aviles on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development Responses due by 12/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Silva-Aviles, Enrique)
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jorge A. Cartaya-Brao on behalf of MAC Development Corp. Responses due by 12/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cartaya-Brao, Jorge) Modified on 11/18/2022 to correct filing event (ecc).
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand filed by Leticia Maria Casalduc-Rabell on behalf of Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz, Garcia-Sola Muniz Conjugal Property Partnership, Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garcia Muniz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan, MAC Development Corp., Plaza De Diego, S.E., Carmen A. Sola-Morales. Responses due by 11/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casalduc-Rabell, Leticia) Modified on 11/17/2022 to correct typographical errors(ecc).
October 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis M. Ferrer-Medina on behalf of David J. Perez-Arritola (Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (arg)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet) (Silva-Aviles, Enrique)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Instance Court of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Superior Court of San Juan, case number SJ2020CV05757. (), filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Amended Complaint filed in State Court (in Spanish language), #2 Exhibit 2. Certified Translation of Amended Complaint filed in State Court)(Silva-Aviles, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Arritola et al v. Garcia-Muniz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Perez-Arritola
Represented By: Adrian Sanchez-Pagan
Represented By: Luis M. Ferrer-Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puerto Rico Housing Financing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos L. Garca-Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen A. Sola-Morales
Represented By: Leticia Maria Casalduc-Rabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garca Muiz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garca-Sola Muniz Conjugal Property Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAC Development Corp.
Represented By: Jorge A. Cartaya-Brao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel A. Ramos-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria M. Hernandez-Solivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos-Hernndez Conjugal Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Diego Village LLC
Represented By: Osvaldo H. Puig-Hernandez
Represented By: Roberto Santana-Aparicio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Diego Village Holding Inc.
Represented By: Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta
Represented By: Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza De Diego, S.E.
Represented By: Juan A. Moldes-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Enrique Silva-Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz
Represented By: Leticia Maria Casalduc-Rabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Account for Mr. Carlos L. Garcia-Muniz in the Trust Fund at the Horizontes Development S.E. Retirement Plan
Represented By: Leticia Maria Casalduc-Rabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia -Sola Conjugal Property Partnership
Represented By: Leticia Maria Casalduc-Rabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?