Homevestors of America, Inc. v. Balossi et al
Plaintiff: HOMEVESTORS OF AMERICA, INC.
Defendant: JOHN BALOSSI, PMI PUERTO RICO INC., PUERTO RICO HOME LLC, CRNPR LLC, PMI Puerto Rico, Inc. and Puerto Rico Home, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01611
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina McKenney on behalf of Homevestors of America, Inc. (McKenney, Dina)
January 11, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION by Homevestors of America, Inc. re #7 Waiver of Service Executed (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
January 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Justin S. Cohen re: 14 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (gav)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Dina McKenney re 11 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (gav)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for extension of time to Answer Complaint filed by PMI Puerto Rico, Inc. Answer deadline due by 2/9/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/10/2023. (su)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Justin S. Cohen to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/10/2023. (su)
January 9, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time until 02-09-2023 to to answer complaint filed by Alejandro J. Cacho on behalf of PMI Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 1/23/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cacho, Alejandro)
January 9, 2023 Filing 12 Motion to allow Justin S. Cohen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8047426) filed by Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala on behalf of Homevestors of America, Inc. Responses due by 1/23/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Dina McKenney to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/9/2023. (su)
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed on PMI Puerto Rico Inc. by Homevestors of America, Inc. upon PMI Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homevestors of America, Inc.. John Balossi waiver sent on 12/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homevestors of America, Inc.. CRNPR LLC waiver sent on 12/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homevestors of America, Inc.. Puerto Rico Home, LLC waiver sent on 12/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) Modified on 1/12/2023 as to date of service and answer due date (gav).
January 5, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to allow Dina McKenney to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8045357) filed by Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala on behalf of Homevestors of America, Inc. Responses due by 1/19/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement byHomevestors of America, Inc.. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to John Balossi, CRNPR LLC, PMI Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico Home, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons to be issued (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
December 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8017071.), filed by HOMEVESTORS OF AMERICA, INC.. Service due by 3/7/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Category Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homevestors of America, Inc. v. Balossi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOMEVESTORS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala
Represented By: Dina McKenney
Represented By: Justin S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BALOSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMI PUERTO RICO INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO HOME LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRNPR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMI Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Home, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?