Silva-Melendez et al v. Crescioni-Badillo et al
Plaintiff: Omar Silva Melendez, Wilberto Rodriguez Torres, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut Cora, Andres Bayrex Jimenez Torres, Omar Silva-Melendez, Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut-Cora and Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres
Defendant: Mariana Crescioni Badillo, raul Lopez Badillo, Jane Doe, Conjugal Partnership Lopez Doe, Yarimar Coss Badillo, John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Coss-Doe, Roxana Badillo Rodriguez, Conjugal partnership Badillo Doe, Luar Collective, Inc., Mariana Crescioni-Badillo, Raul Lopez-Badillo, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe, Yarimar Coss-Badillo, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Coss, Roxana Badillo-Rodriguez and Conjugal Partnership Doe-Badillo
Case Number: 3:2022cv01657
Filed: December 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion requesting Order. RICO Statement pursuant to 12-mc-547 due by 3/15/2023. Answer due by 4/14/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/28/2023. (MQ)
February 28, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION requesting Order ON RICO STATEMENT AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of Raul Lopez-Badillo, Luar Collective, Inc. Responses due by 3/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dapena, Ramon)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 2/28/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/23/2023. (MQ)
February 23, 2023 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2023 to File Answer to the Complaint re: #13 Amended Complaint filed by Omar Silva-Melendez, Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut-Cora, Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of Raul Lopez-Badillo, Luar Collective, Inc. Responses due by 3/9/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Certificate)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Dapena, Ramon)
February 17, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS by Publication issued as to Roxana Badillo-Rodriguez, Yarimar Coss-Badillo, Mariana Crescioni-Badillo. (Attachments: #1 Summons By Publication) (vdm)
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits summonses for publication (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
February 16, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres, Omar Silva-Melendez, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut-Cora, Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres.(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/14/2023. (MQ)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Roxana Badillo-Rodriguez, Yarimar Coss-Badillo, Mariana Crescioni-Badillo filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/24/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Statement Under Penalty of Perjury)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Raul Lopez-Badillo, Luar Collective, Inc. Answer deadline due by 2/23/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/6/2023. (su)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 23, 2023 to File Answer to the Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Omar Silva-Melendez, Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut-Cora, Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of Raul Lopez-Badillo, Luar Collective, Inc. Responses due by 2/17/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Dapena, Ramon)
January 31, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Luar Collective, Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
January 31, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Raul Lopez-Badillo served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER noted #3 Motion submitting Related documenting Category sheet re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Omar Silva-Melendez, Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut-Cora, Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/9/2023. (su)
January 4, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Roxana Badillo Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Badillo, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Coss, Yarimar Coss Badillo, Mariana Crescioni Badillo, John Doe, Raul Lopez-Badillo, Luar Collective, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Category sheet re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/17/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 1/4/2023. (arg)
December 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8041542.), filed by Wilberto Rodriguez Torres, Omar Silva Melendez, Eliut Abisai Gonzalez Bermudez, Boris Bilbraut Cora, Andres Bayrex Jimenez Torres. Service due by 3/31/2023, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva-Melendez et al v. Crescioni-Badillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Silva Melendez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilberto Rodriguez Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliut Abisai Gonzalez Bermudez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Bilbraut Cora
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Bayrex Jimenez Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Silva-Melendez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilberto Rodriguez-Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliut Abisai Gonzalez-Bermudez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Bilbraut-Cora
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Bayrex Jimenez-Torres
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariana Crescioni Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: raul Lopez Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Lopez Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarimar Coss Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Coss-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxana Badillo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal partnership Badillo Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luar Collective, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon E. Dapena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariana Crescioni-Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Lopez-Badillo
Represented By: Ramon E. Dapena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarimar Coss-Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Coss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxana Badillo-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Badillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?