Hynes et al v. Forde & O'Meara LLP et al
Plaintiff: Brian F Hynes, Vendor Assitance Program, LLC, Blue Stone Finance, LLC, Greysand Finance, LLC, Greysand Capital, LLC and Vendor Assistance Program LLC
Defendant: Forde & O'Meara LLP, Michael K. Forde, Leonard Trial Lawyers LLC and Michael I. Leonard
Case Number: 3:2023cv01140
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greysand Capital, LLC. (Rivera-Font, Juan) Modified on 5/8/2023 to edit typographical error (ecc).
May 5, 2023 Filing 18 First NOTICE of Appearance by Juan R. Rivera-Font on behalf of Greysand Capital, LLC (Rivera-Font, Juan)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Noted #14 Motion for Disclosure; noted #15 Motion for Disclosure; and noted #16 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 05/03/2023. (MRB)
April 28, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff Vendor Assistance Program, LLC filed by Juan Gaddiel Alvarez-Valentin on behalf of Vendor Assistance Program LLC Responses due by 5/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarez-Valentin, Juan)
April 28, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff Greysand Finance, LLC. filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Greysand Finance, LLC Responses due by 5/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
April 28, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff Blue Stone Finance, LLC. filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Blue Stone Finance, LLC Responses due by 5/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Gaddiel Alvarez-Valentin on behalf of Vendor Assistance Program LLC (Alvarez-Valentin, Juan)
March 30, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Michael K. Forde, Forde & O'Meara LLP, Michael I. Leonard, Leonard Trial Lawyers LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
March 29, 2023 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR Corrected Summons to be Refiled.*** SUMMONS Issued as to Michael K. Forde, Forde & O'Meara LLP, Michael I. Leonard, Leonard Trial Lawyers LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm) Modified on 3/30/2023 to enter FIE(ecc).
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #9 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 03/29/2023. (MRB)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/11/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Exhibit IV)(Hernandez-Gonzalez, Arturo)
March 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel on behalf of Brian F Hynes (Ramos-Pruetzel, Oreste)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Greysand Finance, LLC (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Blue Stone Finance, LLC (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of Greysand Finance, LLC (Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of Blue Stone Finance, LLC (Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
March 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry O. Freese-Souffront on behalf of Vendor Assistance Program LLC (Freese-Souffront, Henry)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. (arg)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael K. Forde, Forde & O'Meara LLP, Michael I. Leonard, Leonard Trial Lawyers LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8149762.), filed by Blue Stone Finance, LLC, Vendor Assitance Program, LLC, Greysand Finance, LLC, Brian F Hynes, Greysand Capital, LLC. Service due by 6/22/2023, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Hernandez-Gonzalez, Arturo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hynes et al v. Forde & O'Meara LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian F Hynes
Represented By: Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vendor Assitance Program, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Stone Finance, LLC
Represented By: Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
Represented By: Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greysand Finance, LLC
Represented By: Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
Represented By: Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano
Represented By: Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greysand Capital, LLC
Represented By: Juan R. Rivera-Font
Represented By: Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vendor Assistance Program LLC
Represented By: Henry O. Freese-Souffront
Represented By: Juan Gaddiel Alvarez-Valentin
Represented By: Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forde & O'Meara LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Trial Lawyers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael I. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?