MedPharm Services LLC v. SAI Systems International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MedPharm Services LLC
Defendant: SAI Systems International, Inc. and SAI Systems Digital LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01258
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to dismiss "Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404" as to SAI Systems Digital LLC, SAI Systems International, Inc. filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of SAI Systems Digital LLC, SAI Systems International, Inc. Responses due by 7/26/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Manoj Wadhwani)(Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
July 6, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of William E. Bradley by Wililam E Bradley on behalf of SAI Systems Digital LLC, SAI Systems International, Inc. (Bradley, Wililam)
June 28, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE William E. Bradley re: 20 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (mcm)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting #18 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fees in the court's account of non-appropriated funds. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 23-1258. (AEM)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Noting and granting #17 "Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint." Response to complaint due July 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/27/2023. (AEM)
June 12, 2023 Filing 18 Motion to allow William Bradley to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8256523) filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of SAI Systems Digital LLC, SAI Systems International, Inc. Responses due by 6/26/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
June 12, 2023 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION re #2 Complaint " to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint" by All Parties. (Ramirez-Coll, Jose) Modified on 6/13/2023 to edit title and filer (mcm).
May 26, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Hossein Khan Tehrani on behalf of MedPharm Services LLC (Tehrani, Ali)
May 26, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Gearing on behalf of MedPharm Services LLC (Gearing, Brian)
May 25, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by MedPharm Services LLC upon SAI Systems Digital LLC served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (Vidal-Font, Jean)
May 25, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by MedPharm Services LLC upon SAI Systems International, Inc. served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (Vidal-Font, Jean)
May 24, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Ali H.K. Tehrani and Brian Paul Gearing re: 11 Order,, Terminate Motions, : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (mcm)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #9 "Application of Ali H.K. Tehrani for Admission Pro Hac Vice" and #10 "Application of Brian Paul Gearing for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fees in the court's account of non-appropriated funds. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/23/2023. (AEM)
May 23, 2023 Filing 10 Motion to allow Brian Gearing to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8224055) filed by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of MedPharm Services LLC Responses due by 6/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vidal-Font, Jean)
May 23, 2023 Filing 9 Motion to allow Ali Tehrani to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8224053) filed by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of MedPharm Services LLC Responses due by 6/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vidal-Font, Jean)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to SAI Systems Digital LLC, SAI Systems International, Inc.. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
May 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Payment of Electronic Filing Fee (Filing fee $402 receipt number BPRDC-8223967.) (vdm)
May 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet re #2 Complaint,, filed by MedPharm Services LLC (Vidal-Font, Jean)
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR - PHV Applicant's signature missing. Application to be re-file with PHV's handwritten signature.*** Motion to allow Brian Gearing to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8224055) filed by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of MedPharm Services LLC Responses due by 6/2/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vidal-Font, Jean) Modified on 5/22/2023 (mcm).
May 19, 2023 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR - PHV Applicant's signature missing. Application to be re-file with PHV's handwritten signature.*** Motion to allow Ali Tehrani to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8224053) filed by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of MedPharm Services LLC Responses due by 6/2/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vidal-Font, Jean) Modified on 5/22/2023 (mcm).
May 19, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement byMedPharm Services LLC. (Vidal-Font, Jean)
May 19, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MedPharm Services LLC. Service due by 8/17/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Civil Cover Sheet, #28 Category Sheet, #29 Summons SAI Systems International, Inc., #30 Summons SAI Systems Digital LLC)(Vidal-Font, Jean)
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by MedPharm Services LLC.(Vidal-Font, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedPharm Services LLC v. SAI Systems International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedPharm Services LLC
Represented By: Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font
Represented By: Ali Hossein Khan Tehrani
Represented By: Brian Gearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI Systems International, Inc.
Represented By: William E Bradley
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI Systems Digital LLC
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Represented By: William E Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?