Rivera v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rivera
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv01321
Filed: June 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corporation. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILINGS by Ricardo Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (vrg).
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgardo-Hernandez. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number (23-cv-1321-PAD). All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice, Standing Order No. 10 - Consent by Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing in Civil Cases and Consent Form sent to Pro Se by mail.) (mcm)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Ricardo Rivera, Pro Se. Service due by 9/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (mcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?