Morales-Rodriguez et al v. Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez, Mr. Gilberto Gutierrez-Pea and Mr. Gilberto Gutierrez-Pena
Defendant: Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC, International Hospitality Services, Inc., Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, ABC Corp., XYZ, LLC, ACME Insurance Company and Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC doing business as Hotel La Concha, A Reinaissance Resort
Case Number: 3:2023cv01341
Filed: June 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2023 Filing 28 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC.(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 2, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC.(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting: #24 "Motion Requesting Court to Set Aside Entry of Default." Answer to the Complaint due by 8/18/2023. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 08/02/2023. (ao)
August 1, 2023 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC and Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC as per D.E. 20 Order. (vrg)
August 1, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Set Aside Default Motion Requesting Court to Set Aside Entry of Default as to Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC Responses due by 8/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying: #22 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to The Complaint." See entry of default at docket 20 . Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 08/01/2023. (ao)
August 1, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 20, 2023 to File Answer to The Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC Responses due by 8/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 1, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting: #19 "Motion for Entry of Default." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 08/01/2023. (ao)
August 1, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Entry as to Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC filed by Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Amundaray-Rodriguez, Francisco)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER noting: #17 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 07/31/2023. (ao)
July 31, 2023 Filing 17 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding In Compliance with Rule 7.1 of the FRCP filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, International Hospitality Services, Inc. Responses due by 8/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
July 14, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico.(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
July 14, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant International Hospitality Services, Inc..(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting: #13 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint." Answer due by 8/10/2023. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 07/11/2023. (ao)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 10, 2023 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Gilberto Gutierrez-Pena, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/24/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
July 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting: #10 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint." Answer due by 8/7/2023. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 07/06/2023. (ao)
July 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 7, 2023 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Gilberto Gutierrez-Pena, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Services, Inc. Responses due by 7/20/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
July 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Services, Inc. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER noting: #7 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 07/06/2023. (ao)
July 5, 2023 Filing 7 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Service of Process filed by Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/19/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment 1, #2 Affidavit Attachment 2, #3 Affidavit Attachment 3, #4 Affidavit Attachment 4)(Amundaray-Rodriguez, Francisco)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gilberto Gutierrez-Pena, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez.(Amundaray-Rodriguez, Francisco)
June 28, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, International Hospitality Services, Inc., Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
June 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Filing fee received $402, receipt number 106430. (vdm)
June 27, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Gilberto Gutierrez-Pea, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Event. Counse to re-file using correct event "Amended Complaint".*** (mcm)
June 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Category Sheet by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Gilberto Gutierrez-Pea, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez (Amundaray-Rodriguez, Francisco)
June 27, 2023 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Event*** MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Gilberto Gutierrez-Pea, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez filed by Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez on behalf of Gilberto Gutierrez-Pea, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez Responses due by 7/11/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Amundaray-Rodriguez, Francisco) Modified on 6/28/2023 (mcm).
June 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corp., ACME Insurance Company, Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, International Hospitality Services, Inc., Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC, filed by Gilberto Gutierrez-Pea, Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez. Service due by 9/25/2023, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons)(Amundaray-Rodriguez, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales-Rodriguez et al v. Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Karisa N. Morales-Rodriguez
Represented By: Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Gilberto Gutierrez-Pea
Represented By: Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Gilberto Gutierrez-Pena
Represented By: Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACME Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC doing business as Hotel La Concha, A Reinaissance Resort
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?