Alexander et al v. International Hospitality Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michele Alexander, Steven Alexander, Alexander Conjugal Society and Conjugal Partnership Alexander
Defendant: International Hospitality Services, Inc., International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc., Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, International Hospitality Services, Inc. doing business as Condado Vanderbilt Hotel and International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Condado Vanderbilt Hotel
Case Number: 3:2023cv01374
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant International Hospitality Services, Inc..(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
September 5, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc..(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting: #13 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint." Answer due by 9/29/2023. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 08/29/2023. (ao)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 29, 2023 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Alexander, Michele Alexander, Steven Alexander filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Services, Inc. Responses due by 9/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Services, Inc. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting: #10 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint" filed by International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. Answer due by 9/18/2023. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 08/18/2023. (ao)
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 18, 2023 to File Answer of Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 8/31/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico.(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting: #6 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint." Answer due by 9/18/2023. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 08/09/2023. (ao)
August 9, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 18, 2023 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Alexander, Michele Alexander, Steven Alexander filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/23/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance as additional counsel by Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
July 20, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc., International Hospitality Services, Inc.. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
July 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (vdm)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8301936.), filed by Alexander Conjugal Society, Michele Alexander, Steven Alexander. Service due by 10/17/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons International Hospitality Enterprise, #5 Summons International Hospitality Services, #6 Summons Chubb Insurance)(Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. International Hospitality Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Alexander
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Alexander
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Conjugal Society
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Alexander
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Services, Inc. doing business as Condado Vanderbilt Hotel
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Condado Vanderbilt Hotel
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?