Ozturk et al v. Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cem Ozturk and Colleen Fogarty
Defendant: Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, International Hospitality Services, Inc., Chubb Insurance Company, ABC Corporations, John and Jane, Insurance Companies ABC, Jane Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2023cv01391
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant International Hospitality Services, Inc..(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 28, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant Chubb Insurance Company.(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 28, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Defendant Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC.(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 18, 2023 Filing 13 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Disclosure Statement filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company, Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, International Hospitality Services, Inc. Responses due by 9/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 16, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #12 Motion In Compliance with Order. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong event. To be re-filed.*** (idg)
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong event. To be re-filed.*** Motion In Compliance with Order filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company, Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, International Hospitality Services, Inc. Responses due by 8/30/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis) Modified to file in error on 8/17/2023 (idg).
August 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2023 to File Answer of The Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC Responses due by 8/29/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2023 to File Answer of The Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Services, Inc. Responses due by 8/29/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2023 to File Answer of The Complaint filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company Responses due by 8/29/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of International Hospitality Services, Inc. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 14, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Chubb Insurance Company served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023; Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023; International Hospitality Services, Inc. served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
August 9, 2023 Filing 4 STATEMENT in Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 filed by Colleen Fogarty, Cem Ozturk. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Chubb Insurance Company, Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC, International Hospitality Services, Inc.. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vdm)
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8317473.), filed by Colleen Fogarty, Cem Ozturk. Service due by 10/31/2023, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ozturk et al v. Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cem Ozturk
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Fogarty
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condado Duo La Concha SPV, LLC
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?