USA v. 2018 Bugatti Chiron (VIN#: VF9SP3V34JM795083)
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2018 Bugatti Chiron (VIN#: VF9SP3V34JM795083)
Claimant: Kevin Thobias and Golden Exotics LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01392
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William Ian Talbot on behalf of Golden Exotics LLC, Kevin Thobias (Talbot, William)
September 15, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE William Talbot, Esq. re: 16 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ecc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Jonathan Edderai, Esq. re: 15 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ecc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Berwin Cohen, Esq. re: 14 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ecc)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Atty. William Talbot. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 09/15/2023. (MRB)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Atty. Jonathan Edderai. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 09/15/2023. (MRB)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Atty. Berwin Cohen. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 09/15/2023. (MRB)
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to allow William Talbot to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 107388) filed by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of Golden Exotics LLC, Kevin Thobias Responses due by 9/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
September 14, 2023 Filing 12 Motion to allow Jonathan Edderai to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 107388) filed by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of Golden Exotics LLC, Kevin Thobias Responses due by 9/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
September 14, 2023 Filing 11 Motion to allow Berwin Cohen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 107388) filed by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of Golden Exotics LLC, Kevin Thobias Responses due by 9/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
September 14, 2023 Filing 10 CLAIM for the defendant property by Golden Exotics LLC. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 CLAIM for the defendant property by Kevin Thobias. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
August 22, 2023 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued to arrest/release property as to 2018 Bugatti Chiron (VIN#: VF9SP3V34JM795083). (ad)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/22/2023. (MRB)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #2 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/22/2023. (MRB)
August 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. (vdm)
August 2, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Seizure filed by Myriam Y. Fernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/16/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION to Restrict Document (Unsworn Declaration) by USA. (Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)
August 2, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict Document (Unsworn Declaration) filed by Myriam Y. Fernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/16/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against 2018 Bugatti Chiron (VIN#: VF9SP3V34JM795083), filed by USA. Service due by 10/31/2023, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2018 Bugatti Chiron (VIN#: VF9SP3V34JM795083)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Myriam Y. Fernandez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 Bugatti Chiron (VIN#: VF9SP3V34JM795083)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kevin Thobias
Represented By: Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez
Represented By: William Ian Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Golden Exotics LLC
Represented By: Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez
Represented By: William Ian Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?