Ghaffar v. Paulson et al
Plaintiff: Fahad Ghaffar
Defendant: John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, Paulson 2009 Family Trust and J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware
Case Number: 3:2023cv01455
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for extension of time. Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Counsel due on 12/1/2023. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 11/1/2023. (CVR)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for extension of time until December 1, 2023 filed by Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 11/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Andreu-Fuentes, Jose)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmanuel Brown on behalf of J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware (Brown, Emmanuel)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Branower on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Branower, Daniel)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Oderah C. Nwaeze on behalf of J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware (Nwaeze, Oderah)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss (Docket No. 28) due on November 9, 2023 and the Paulson Defendants' reply to said opposition due on December 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/25/2023. (CVR)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION for extension of time until 12/9/23 to Oppose Motion to Dismiss filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar, John Paulson and Paulson PRV Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/8/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold) Modified on 10/26/2023 to add filers (ab).
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Oderah C. Nwaeze re: 47 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ab)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Emmanuel Brown re: 44 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ab)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion to allow Oderah Nwaeze to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/23/2023. (ari)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou on behalf of J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware (Cabrera-Bou, Carolina)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Motion to allow Oderah Nwaeze to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8418723) filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware Responses due by 11/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion to allow Emmanuel Brown to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/23/2023. (ari)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer "Consented Request for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead" re: #14 Amended Complaint filed by Fahad Ghaffar filed by J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware. Answer to Amended Complaint due by 12/1/2023. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/23/2023. (ari)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Motion to allow Emmanuel Brown to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8418566) filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware Responses due by 11/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer "Consented Request for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead" re: #14 Amended Complaint filed by Fahad Ghaffar filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware Responses due by 11/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: GRANTING Docket No. #37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages; GRANTING Docket No. #36 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Certified translations due on or before November 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on October 18, 2023. (ASE)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: NOTING Docket No. #35 Motion submitting Confidential Exhibits. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on October 18, 2023. (ASE)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: granting Docket No. #34 Motion to Restrict Document. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on October 18, 2023. (ASE)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Motion at Docket No. 33 filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 11/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/17/2023 to file Certified Translations filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 11/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION Submitting Confidential Exhibits re: #33 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Due to Conflict of Interest filed by Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson, #34 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 11/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #33 , #34 ) (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 11/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Due to Conflict of Interest filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 11/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I)(Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Urgenson, Andrew)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC (Dominguez-Victoriano, Maria)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Javier Micheo-Marcial on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Javier Micheo-Marcial on behalf of All Defendants (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew J. Urgenson on behalf of Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson Responses due by 10/26/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew J. Urgenson, #2 Exhibit A - June 13 Email, #3 Exhibit B - April 1 Email, #4 Exhibit C - June 9 Email)(Urgenson, Andrew)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 First NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Lenihan on behalf of Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson (Lenihan, Glen)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Urgenson on behalf of Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson (Urgenson, Andrew)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Oved on behalf of Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson (Oved, Darren)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 First NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence A. Oved on behalf of Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, John Paulson (Oved, Terrence)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Terrence A. Oved, Darren Oved, Glen Lenihan and Andrew J. Urgenson re: 22 Order on Motion to Appear PHV: The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ab)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #18 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #19 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #20 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/11/2023. (CVR)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC (Llach-Zuniga, Luis)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to allow Andrew J. Urgenson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 108397) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 10/25/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Motion to allow Glen Lenihan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 108397) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 10/25/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to allow Darren Oved to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 108397) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 10/25/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion to allow Terrence A. Oved to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 108397) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC Responses due by 10/25/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of John Paulson, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, John Paulson, Paulson 2009 Family Trust, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fahad Ghaffar. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Vicente-Colon, Harold)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo M Umpierre-Soler on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar (Umpierre-Soler, Alfredo)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Daniel Branower, Martin Russo and Robert Sidorsky re: 11 Order on Motion to Appear PHV. The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ab)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to allow Daniel Branower to appear pro hac vice; #9 Motion to allow Martin Russo to appear pro hac vice; #10 Motion to allow Robert Sidorsky to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 9/7/2023. (ari)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to allow Robert Sidorsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8361967) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 9/21/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to allow Martin Russo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8361946) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 9/21/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to allow Daniel Branower to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8361933) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 9/21/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Paulson, Paulson 2009 Family Trust, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (arg)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. (arg)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against John Paulson, Paulson 2009 Family Trust, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, filed by Fahad Ghaffar. Service due by 12/5/2023, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vicente-Colon, Harold)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar (Andreu-Fuentes, Jose)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Vicente-Colon, Harold) Modified on 9/7/2023 to edit docket text (ab).
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR - As per Counsel's request. Document will be re-filed.*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8359867.), filed by Fahad Ghaffar. Service due by 12/5/2023, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vicente-Colon, Harold) Modified on 9/6/2023 (mcm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghaffar v. Paulson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fahad Ghaffar
Represented By: Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Alfredo M Umpierre-Soler
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel Branower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paulson
Represented By: Andrew J. Urgenson
Represented By: Darren Oved
Represented By: Glen Lenihan
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Terrence A. Oved
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulson PRV Holdings LLC
Represented By: Darren Oved
Represented By: Glen Lenihan
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Terrence A. Oved
Represented By: Andrew J. Urgenson
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulson 2009 Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware
Represented By: Emmanuel Brown
Represented By: Oderah C. Nwaeze
Represented By: Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?