Ortiz-Sanchez v. Gonzalez-Seda
Plaintiff: Atty. Maritza Ortiz and Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez
Defendant: Crisanta Gonzalez-Seda, Raul Lopez-Menendez, Dor Mari Arroyo-Carrero and MD Cynthia Casanova-Pelosi
Case Number: 3:2023cv01463
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 USCA Case Number 23-1915 for #24 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez. (mcm)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #24 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal [Docket Entries 22 & 24] (mcm)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER noting: #39 "Motion for Joinder." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/20/2023. (ao)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Joinder Codefendant Dr. Mari Arroyo -Carrero's Motion to Dismiss Re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dor Mari Arroyo-Carrero filed by Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez on behalf of Cynthia Casanova-Pelosi Responses due by 11/2/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Lopez-Lopez, Jorge)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER noting and denying: #36 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/17/2023. (ao)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ***EX-PARTE*** INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez on behalf of Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez Responses due by 10/31/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Partial Waiver Ltr 1, #2 Appendix Partial Waiver Ltr 2)(Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel of Attorney Jaime Scarano to represent Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez re 33 Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notification in the Spanish Language)(arg)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting: #34 "Motion Requesting Permission to Join Co-Defendant's Dor Marie Arroyo-Carrero's Legal Representation." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/16/2023. (ao)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION requesting Order to Permission to Join Co-defendant Dor Marie Arroyo Carrero Legal Representation filed by Jose O. Ramos-Gonzalez, Sr on behalf of Dor Mari Arroyo-Carrero Responses due by 10/30/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Gonzalez, Jose)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting: #31 "Motion to Withdraw as Attorney." Attorney Eric Perez-Ochoa terminated. The Clerk of Court shall appoint new counsel from the Pro Bono Panel. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/16/2023. (ao)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Carlo Giuseppe Agrelot-Aponte on behalf of Dor Mari Arroyo-Carrero Responses due by 10/30/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Agrelot-Aponte, Carlo)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw (as Pro Bono Counsel) Attorney as to Eric Perez-Ochoa filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez Responses due by 10/30/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting: #29 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint." filed by Cynthia Casanova-Pelosi. Answer due by 11/18/2023. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/12/2023. (ao)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint and NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez on behalf of Cynthia Casanova-Pelosi Responses due by 10/26/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Lopez, Jorge) Modified on 10/13/2023 to add Notice. (arg)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez upon Raul Lopez-Menendez served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (nmm)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez upon Dor Mari Arroyo-Carrero served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (nmm)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez upon Cynthia Casanova-Pelosi served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (nmm)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez as to Raul Lopez-Menendez. (nmm)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #24 Notice of Appeal. ***FILED IN ERROR SEE D.E. 21 ORDER, all future filings should be made through counsel of record.*** (arg)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ***SEE IMAGE ON DKT #24 *** NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #22 Order on Motion for TRO by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez, pro se. (mcm)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF Interlocutory APPEAL by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/21/2023 (arg). Modified on 11/1/2023 to correct filing and event title (mcm).
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 *RESTRICTED* Subpoenas Issued (ad)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER denying: #1 "Motion for TRO." See Opinion and Order attached. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/18/2023. (ao) Modified on 9/19/2023 edit text title. (arg)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting: #20 "Motion to Appoint Process Server." Plaintiff is reminded that on 9/15/2023 Eric Perez-Ochoa was appointed to represent her. Therefore, all future filings should be made through counsel of record. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/18/2023. (ao)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Process Server filed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez on behalf of Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez Responses due by 10/2/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Dor Mari Arroyo-Carrero, Cynthia Casanova-Pelosi, Crisanta Gonzalez-Seda, Raul Lopez-Menendez through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (ad)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel Eric Perez-Ochoa to represent Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez, Re: 16 Order. Signed by Clerk on 09/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appointment in Spanish Language)(arg)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting: #13 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/14/2023. (ao)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting: #5 "Motion to Appoint Counsel." The Clerk of Court shall appoint counsel from the Pro Bono Panel. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/14/2023. (ao)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting: #4 "Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/14/2023. (ao)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting: #2 "Motion to Restrict." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/14/2023. (ao)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez on behalf of Maritza Ortiz Responses due by 9/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order SUBPOENA PEARSON, #2 Text of Proposed Order SUBPOENA RAUL)(Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits summons RAUL (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits summons Dor (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons Casanova (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits summons crisanta (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR INCORRECT EVENT*** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maritza Ortiz as to Crisanta Gonzalez-Seda. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Crisanta 2nd pg) (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/14/2023 (arg).
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsels request. Document was re-filed in D.E. #13 *** *RESTRICTED* Subpoena Issued (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/14/2023 (arg).
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (vdm)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez on behalf of Maritza Ortiz Responses due by 9/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/14/2023 to correct restrictions. (arg)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez on behalf of Maritza Ortiz Responses due by 9/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pauperis Affidavit)(Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/14/2023 to correct restriction. (arg)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** COMPLAINT against Crisanta Gonzalez-Seda, filed by Maritza Ortiz. Service due by 12/12/2023, (Attachments: #1 Appendix TRO, #2 Category Sheet Cat Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/14/2023 to correct restriction. (arg)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict filed by Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez on behalf of Maritza Ortiz Responses due by 9/25/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) ***MODIFIED on 09/14/2023 to remove restriction. Standing Order No. 9 states that the Motion to Restrict... "shall be open to public inspection..."*** (arg).
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against Crisanta Gonzalez Seda, filed by Maritza Ortiz. Service due by 12/11/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protected Conduct, #2 Appendix Fishing Expedition1, #3 Appendix Fishing Expedition2, #4 Appendix Ethical Report) Responses due by 9/25/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/14/2023 (arg). Modified on 9/18/2023 correct event edit text title. (arg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz-Sanchez v. Gonzalez-Seda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atty. Maritza Ortiz
Represented By: Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Jaime C. Scarano-Colon
Represented By: Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crisanta Gonzalez-Seda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Lopez-Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dor Mari Arroyo-Carrero
Represented By: Carlo Giuseppe Agrelot-Aponte
Represented By: Jose O. Ramos-Gonzalez, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Cynthia Casanova-Pelosi
Represented By: Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?