Acevedo-Rodriguez v. Rivera-Pagan
Plaintiff: Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez
Defendant: Roberto Rivera-Pagan and Ariana Gonzalez-Rodriguez
Case Number: 3:2023cv01467
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER noting: #15 "Informative Motion." Plaintiff is reminded that the Court appointed attorney Michelle Reyes as counsel of record. Therefore, all filings should be done through counsel. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/24/2023. (ao)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR - Missing plaintiff's signature*** MOTION for Return of Property filed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/7/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vrg) Modified on 10/25/2023. (arg)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Order on Motion for leave to file in Spanish Language D.E. #9 filed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/7/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vrg) Modified on 10/24/2023 to correct re D.E. number (vrg).
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez upon Ariana Gonzalez-Rodriguez served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (nmm)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez upon Roberto Rivera-Pagan served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (nmm)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel of Attorney Michelle Reyes to represent Javier J. Acevedo-Rodriguez re 11 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel.Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notification in the Spanish Language)(arg)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting: #7 "Motion to Appoint Counsel." The Clerk of Court shall appoint counsel from the Pro Bono Panel. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/13/2023. (ao)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting: #9 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/28/2023. (ao)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/10/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arg)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Plaintiff is in violation of 48 U.S.C. 864 and Local Rule 5(c) for submitting documents in a foreign language without accompanying certified translations. (ECF No. #3 ). This Court previously advised Plaintiff that the "official language of this Court is English" in another matter in which Plaintiff was involved. See Acevedo-Rodriguez v. Cuevas-Natal, 3:23-cv-01407 (RAM) (D.P.R. Aug. 16, 2023). Plaintiff is ADMONISHED for failing to adhere to this requirement despite being put on notice in Acevedo-Rodriguez v. Cuevas-Natal. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff correct his filings by October 23, 2023, and submit English language submissions or certified English translations thereof. FAILURE to comply with this Order may result in the DISMISSAL of Plaintiff's case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/25/2023. (ao)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/5/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(arg)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ariana Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Roberto Rivera-Pagan through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (ad)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number (23-cv-1467 MAJ). All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice, Standing Order No. 10 and Copy of Order 4 sent to Pro Se via regular mail) (arg)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting: #1 "Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 09/14/2023. (ao)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Roberto Rivera-Pagan, filed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Service due by 12/12/2023, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2023: #2 PSLC Memo) (arg).
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez, Pro Se. (ad)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevedo-Rodriguez v. Rivera-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier J Acevedo-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michelle M. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Rivera-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariana Gonzalez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?