Guzman-Kaslow v. Learis KN Life Sciences, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mayra Guzmn-Kaslow and Mayra Guzman-Kaslow
Defendant: LEARIS KN LIFE SCIENCES LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Learis KN Life Sciences, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01474
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 15 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT is entered DISMISSING this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Co-defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/3/2023. (mrr)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/3/2023.(mrr)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Learis KN Life Science LLC will plead or otherwise defend by November 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/2/2023. (mrr)
November 1, 2023 Filing 12 Joint Partial NOTICE of Dismissal of Direct Action Against Insurer by Mayra Guzman-Kaslow and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Colon-Rivera, Frances) Modified docket text title and add filer on 11/1/2023 (rim).
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 17, 2023 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Claribel Ortiz-Rodriguez on behalf of Learis KN Life Sciences, LLC Responses due by 11/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Rodriguez, Claribel)
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Claribel Ortiz-Rodriguez on behalf of Learis KN Life Sciences, LLC (Ortiz-Rodriguez, Claribel)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerardo M. Ortiz-Torres on behalf of Mayra Guzman-Kaslow (Ortiz-Torres, Gerardo)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time. Codefendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company shall plead or otherwise defend by November 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/18/2023. (mrr)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Learis KN Life Sciences LLC shall plead or otherwise defend by November 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/17/2023. (mrr)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for extension of time until 11/16/2023 to Answer Complaint filed by Frances R. Colon-Rivera on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Responses due by 10/30/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Rivera, Frances) Modified docket text title on 11/1/2023 (rim).
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 1, 2023 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Angel Munoz-Noya on behalf of Learis KN Life Sciences, LLC Responses due by 10/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Noya, Angel)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayra Guzman-Kaslow upon LEARIS KN LIFE SCIENCES LLC served on 9/27/2023, answer due 10/18/2023; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to LEARIS KN LIFE SCIENCES LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEARIS KN LIFE SCIENCES LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8375754.), filed by Mayra Guzmn-Kaslow. Service due by 12/18/2023, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman-Kaslow v. Learis KN Life Sciences, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Guzmn-Kaslow
Represented By: Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Guzman-Kaslow
Represented By: Gerardo M. Ortiz-Torres
Represented By: Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEARIS KN LIFE SCIENCES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Frances R. Colon-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Learis KN Life Sciences, LLC
Represented By: Angel Munoz-Noya
Represented By: Claribel Ortiz-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?