LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C. et al v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C., Integrity Medical Group, Corp., Instituto Medico Familiar Inc., Instituto Medico Familiar del Este Inc., Salud 2011, Inc., MENR Medical Services Corp., NRMD Health Provider LLC, Centro Medico Salinas, Inc., Best Health Group, LLC, East Best Health, LLC, G.M.D.C. Inc. and Grupo Medico de Cayey LLC
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, LLC, Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C., Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly Export S.A., Novo Nordisk Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis Puerto Rico, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. and OPTUMRX Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01515
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY to Motion filed by Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, LLC Re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply In Support of Cross-Motion to Stay Pending Related Proceedings filed by CaremarkPCS Health, LLC, Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C. filed by Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, LLC. (Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendants Caremark Puerto Rico, LLC and Caremark PCS Health, LLC are to file the tendered reply at ECF No. 26-1 as a separate docket entry by no later 12/8/2023. Plaintiff shall have until December 12, 2023, to seek leave to file a surreply with the proposed brief tendered as an exhibit. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/7/2023. (wm)
December 4, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply In Support of Cross-Motion to Stay Pending Related Proceedings filed by Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach on behalf of Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, LLC Responses due by 12/18/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply Brief)(Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate entry as to docket no. 23 .*** ORDER re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Grupo Medico de Cayey LLC, NRMD Health Provider LLC, Centro Medico Salinas, Inc., G.M.D.C. Inc., East Best Health, LLC, Instituto Medico Familiar Inc., Instituto Medico Familiar del Este Inc., Salud 2011, Inc., MENR Medical Services Corp., Best Health Group, LLC, LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C., Integrity Medical Group, Corp.: GRANTED. Plaintiffs are to file the tendered reply at ECF No. 21-1 as a separate docket entry by no later than November 30, 2023 . Defendants shall have until December 4, 2023 to seek leave to file a surreply with the proposed brief tendered as an exhibit. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/29/2023. (glr) Modified to file in error on 11/29/2023 (idg).
November 29, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: 25 Order. ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate entry as to docket no. 23.*** (idg)
November 28, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Grupo Medico de Cayey LLC, NRMD Health Provider LLC, Centro Medico Salinas, Inc., G.M.D.C. Inc., East Best Health, LLC, Instituto Medico Familiar Inc., Instituto Medico Familiar del Este Inc., Salud 2011, Inc., MENR Medical Services Corp., Best Health Group, LLC, LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C., Integrity Medical Group, Corp. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Burge, Jason)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply: GRANTED. Plaintiffs are to file the tendered reply at ECF No. 21-1 as a separate docket entry by no later than November 30, 2023. Defendants shall have until December 4, 2023 to seek leave to file a surreply with the proposed brief tendered as an exhibit. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/28/2023. (idg)
November 27, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #20 Cross MOTION to Stay Pending Related Proceedings filed by LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Burge, Jason)
November 20, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Jason W. Burge on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/4/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Pleading)(Burge, Jason)
November 13, 2023 Filing 20 Cross MOTION to Stay Pending Related Proceedings filed by Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach on behalf of Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C. Responses due by 11/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo) Modified on 11/14/2023 to edit parties (mg).
November 13, 2023 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by CaremarkPCS Health, LLC and Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo) Modified on 11/14/2023 to edit parties. (mg).
November 10, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ryan Dodson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dodson, Michael)
November 10, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Burge on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burge, Jason)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/9/2023. (wm)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/9/2023. (wm)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Motion to Expedite at ECF No. 8 is DENIED. The Court sees no reason to depart from the time limits provided for in L. Civ. R. 7(b). The removing defendants' response to the motion to remand is due by 11/13/2023. Leave to file any reply and surreply must be requested in accordance with L. Civ. R. 7(c) and (d) and the request must include the proposed brief tendered as an exhibit. No extensions will be granted save for showing of good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1). Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/9/2023. (wm)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 7) (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 2, 2023 Filing 12 Motion to allow Michael Dodson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8432360) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/16/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 2, 2023 Filing 11 Motion to allow Jason Burge to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8432379) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/16/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 1, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #10 Motion to allow Jason Burge to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8432379), #9 Motion to allow Michael Dodson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8432360). ***FILED IN ERROR - Local counsel's signature should be in electronic format. Local counsel to re-file with correct electronic signature (s/).*** (idg)
November 1, 2023 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR - Local counsel's signature should be in electronic format. Local counsel to re-file with correct electronic signature (s/).*** Motion to allow Jason Burge to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8432379) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold) Modified to file in error on 11/2/2023 (idg).
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR - Local counsel's signature should be in electronic format. Local counsel to re-file with correct electronic signature (s/).*** Motion to allow Michael Dodson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8432360) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold) Modified to file in error on 11/2/2023 (idg).
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 7) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Notice (Other) at ECF No. 3 filed by CaremarkPCS Health, LLC, Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C. is NOTED. The Consent MOTION at ECF #5 requesting Order Hold the Deadline to Submit Motions to Dismiss or Otherwise Plead in Abeyance filed by LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C. is GRANTED. The defendants' deadline to answer the complaint or otherwise plead in this removed action is held in abeyance pending transfer of this action to In re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL No. 3080, or if plaintiffs oppose transfer- pending the resolution of plaintiffs' objection. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/23/2023.(wm)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 Consent MOTION requesting Order Hold the Deadline to Submit Motions to Dismiss or Otherwise Plead in Abeyance filed by Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach on behalf of CaremarkPCS Health, LLC, Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C. Responses due by 11/3/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo) Modified filers on 10/20/2023 (idg).
October 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vdm)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action by Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCaremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, LLC. (Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number SJ2023cv08437. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APRDC-8407307), filed by Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C. et al v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LDG Medical Services Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Medical Group, Corp.
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instituto Medico Familiar Inc.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instituto Medico Familiar del Este Inc.
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salud 2011, Inc.
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MENR Medical Services Corp.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRMD Health Provider LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centro Medico Salinas, Inc.
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Health Group, LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Best Health, LLC
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.M.D.C. Inc.
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grupo Medico de Cayey LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, LLC
Represented By: Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly Export S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMRX Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?