Paulson PRV Holdings LLC et al v. Ghaffar et al
Plaintiff: Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, Duo Condado JV Holdings LLC, Bahia Beach Holding Company LLC, AIP PR Holdings LLC, SJ Beach PR LLC and Regency Acquisition LLC
Defendant: Fahad Ghaffar, Thinking Ahead LLC, Glendaliz Acevedo-Martinez, GGSG LLC, Glen Acevedo, Amir Ghaffar, Coverisq LLC, Tygate Pte. Ltd., Nerissa Aponte, Saira Ghaffar, Farah Vayani and Syber Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01521
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Noted and granted #45 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/29/2023. (KC)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Noted and granted #44 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/29/2023. (KC)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Finding as moot #41 Motion for Extension of Time in light of the Order at Docket No. #46 . Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/29/2023. (KC)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Finding as moot #40 Motion for extension of time in light of the Order at Docket No. #46 . Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/29/2023. (KC)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting #10 Motion requesting Order. Plaintiffs shall file a RICO Case Statement by 12/19/2023. The deadline to file an Answer or otherwise plead is reset for all defendants for 1/18/2024. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/29/2023. (KC)
November 29, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Joinder (Re: Need to Join codefendant Fahad Gaffars Motion for Entry of RICO Case Statement Order) Re: #10 MOTION requesting Order for Rico Case Statement filed by Fahad Ghaffar filed by Thomas Trebilcock-Horan on behalf of Nerissa Aponte Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas)
November 29, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for Joinder filed by Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino on behalf of GGSG LLC Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)
November 28, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Rimma Ayzen on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar, Thinking Ahead LLC (Ayzen, Rimma)
November 28, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Sidorsky on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar, Thinking Ahead LLC (Sidorsky, Robert)
November 28, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 5, 2024 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Jorge Martinez-Luciano on behalf of Syber Group LLC, Farah Vayani Responses due by 12/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
November 27, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for extension of time until, Thursday, January 11th, to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Thomas Trebilcock-Horan on behalf of Nerissa Aponte Responses due by 12/11/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas)
November 27, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Trebilcock-Horan on behalf of Nerissa Aponte (Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas)
November 27, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Robert Sidorsky re: 37 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (rim)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting #36 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/27/2023. (KC)
November 27, 2023 Filing 36 Motion to allow Robert Sidorsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8458448) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 12/11/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 27, 2023 Filing 35 REPLY to Motion - Corrected Version - filed by Fahad Ghaffar Re: #10 MOTION requesting Order for Rico Case Statement filed by Fahad Ghaffar filed by Fahad Ghaffar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Arbitration Claim)(Branower, Daniel)
November 27, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Martin Russo re: 33 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (rim)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting #19 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/27/2023. (KC)
November 27, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Rimma Ayzen re: 29 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (rim)
November 27, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #31 Reply to Motion,. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (rim)
November 22, 2023 Filing 31 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password.*** REPLY to Motion filed by Fahad Ghaffar Re: #10 MOTION requesting Order for Rico Case Statement filed by Fahad Ghaffar filed by Fahad Ghaffar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Arbitration Claim)(Branower, Daniel) Modified on 11/27/2023 (rim).
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting #14 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/22/2023. (KC)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting #23 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/22/2023. (KC)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion for extension of time. Defendant shall file their Answer or otherwise plead by 12/22/2023. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/22/2023. (KC)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall file their Answer or otherwise plead by 12/22/2023. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/22/23. (KC)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granting #20 Motion for extension of time. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise plead by 12/15/2023. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/22/23. (KC)
November 21, 2023 Filing 25 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 12-22-2023 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, SJ Beach PR LLC, Duo Condado JV Holdings LLC, Regency Acquisition LLC, Bahia Beach Holding Company LLC, AIP PR Holdings LLC filed by Bamily Lopez-Ortiz on behalf of Coverisq LLC, Amir Ghaffar, Tygate Pte. Ltd. Responses due by 12/5/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
November 16, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin P Russo on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar, Thinking Ahead LLC (Russo, Martin)
November 16, 2023 Filing 23 Motion to allow Rimma Ayzen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8450937) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 11/30/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 16, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Branower on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar, Thinking Ahead LLC (Branower, Daniel)
November 15, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Special and Limited Appearance to Request Additional Time Within Which to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino on behalf of Glendaliz Acevedo-Martinez, GGSG LLC Responses due by 11/29/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel) Modified on 11/16/2023 to edit All Caps in DE title(ecc).
November 14, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time until 12/15/23 to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar, Thinking Ahead LLC Responses due by 11/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 Motion to allow Martin Russo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8447212) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 11/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Daniel Branower re: 17 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ab)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting #13 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 11/13/23. (KC)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco A. Feliu-Nigaglioni, I on behalf of Coverisq LLC, Amir Ghaffar, Tygate Pte. Ltd. (Feliu-Nigaglioni, Francisco)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bamily Lopez-Ortiz on behalf of Coverisq LLC, Amir Ghaffar, Tygate Pte. Ltd. (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 11/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Reply)(Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to allow Daniel Branower to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8443357) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 11/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Nerissa Aponte served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Syber Group LLC served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023; Farah Vayani served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #10 MOTION requesting Order for Rico Case Statement filed by Fahad Ghaffar filed by All Plaintiffs. (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION requesting Order for Rico Case Statement filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Fahad Ghaffar Responses due by 11/21/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Glendaliz Acevedo-Martinez served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023; Coverisq LLC served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023; Fahad Ghaffar served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023; Tygate Pte. Ltd. served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Returned - Glendaliz Acevedo Martinez, #2 Returned - Fahad Ghaffar, #3 Returned - Coverisq LLC) (rim)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon GGSG LLC served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023; Thinking Ahead LLC served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Glen Acevedo, Glendaliz Acevedo-Martinez, Nerissa Aponte, Coverisq LLC, GGSG LLC, Amir Ghaffar, Fahad Ghaffar, Saira Ghaffar, Syber Group LLC, Thinking Ahead LLC, Tygate Pte. Ltd., Farah Vayani. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Llach-Zuniga, Luis)
October 17, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rodriguez-Munoz, Julian)
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dominguez-Victoriano, Maria)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. (vdm)
October 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8409720.), filed by Duo Condado JV Holdings LLC, Paulson PRV Holdings LLC, Regency Acquisition LLC, Bahia Beach Holding Company LLC, AIP PR Holdings LLC, SJ Beach PR LLC. Service due by 1/14/2024, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Micheo-Marcial, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulson PRV Holdings LLC et al v. Ghaffar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulson PRV Holdings LLC
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duo Condado JV Holdings LLC
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahia Beach Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIP PR Holdings LLC
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJ Beach PR LLC
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regency Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fahad Ghaffar
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Daniel Branower
Represented By: Martin P Russo
Represented By: Rimma Ayzen
Represented By: Robert Sidorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thinking Ahead LLC
Represented By: Robert Sidorsky
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Daniel Branower
Represented By: Martin P Russo
Represented By: Rimma Ayzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendaliz Acevedo-Martinez
Represented By: Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGSG LLC
Represented By: Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Ghaffar
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Represented By: Francisco A. Feliu-Nigaglioni, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coverisq LLC
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Represented By: Francisco A. Feliu-Nigaglioni, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tygate Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Francisco A. Feliu-Nigaglioni, I
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nerissa Aponte
Represented By: Thomas Trebilcock-Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saira Ghaffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farah Vayani
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syber Group LLC
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?