In re: Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company
Petitioner: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
In Re: Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company
Trustee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Not Classified By Court: Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio, Ginkgo Tree, LLC, GN3 SIP Limited, GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P., GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P. and GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust
Interested Party: Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority, Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC and AmeriNational Community Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01540
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC re #64 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding - Informative Motion of Financial Oversight and Management Board Regarding Title VI Approval Hearing for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company and December 6-7, 2023, Omnibus Hearing (Adler, Adam)
December 14, 2023 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC re #62 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding attendance at (i) Omnibus Hearing on December 6-7, 2023, and (ii) PRIDCO Title VI Approval Hearing (Adler, Adam)
December 12, 2023 Filing 75 Transcript of Qualified Modification Approval Hearing held on 12/06/2023 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain and Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amy Walker. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at #www.prd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the USDC-PR and USBC-PR public terminals or purchased through #https://promesa.prd.uscourts.gov/content/transcript-order before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2024. (ct)
December 8, 2023 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC re #70 Notice (Other), (Adler, Adam)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER APPROVING QUALIFYING MODIFICATION FOR THE PUERTO RICO INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY PURSUANT TO SECTION 601(M)(1)(D) OF THE PUERTO RICO OVERSIGHT, MANAGEMENT, AND ECONOMIC STABILITY ACT. Re: #1 . Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/07/2023.(ct)
December 6, 2023 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain and Magistrate Judge Judith Gail Dein: Qualifying Modification Approval Hearing held on 12/6/2023 re: #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act filed by Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company. Related document: #63 MOTION Submitting Financial Oversight and Management Board's, as Administrative Supervisor, Exhibit List in Connection with the Hearing to Consider Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Public Finance Corporation Pursua filed by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Court Reporter Amy Walker.) (ct)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear PHV Benjamin Kaminetzky; granting #57 Motion to Appear PHV Stephanie Massman. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/05/2023. (ct)
December 4, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE - Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for the Hearings on December 6-7, 2023, at 9:30 A.M. AST by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico re #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
December 4, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Withdrawal of DRA Parties Objection to the Proposed Qualifying Modification of the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company by AmeriNational Community Services, LLC, Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC re #49 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
November 29, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing of Revised Proposed Order Approving Qualifying Modification for Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 29, 2023 Filing 67 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding MOTION TO INFORM APPERANCE OF CANTOR-KATZ COLLATERAL MONITOL LLC AT THE TITLE VI APPROVAL HEARING FOR THE PUERTO RICO INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Conde-Torres, Carmen)
November 29, 2023 Filing 66 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding U.S. BANKS APPEARANCE AT TITLE VI APPROVAL HEARING FOR THE PUERTO RICO INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY AND DECEMBER 6-7, 2023 OMNIBUS HEARING filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tulla, Eric)
November 29, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC (Conde-Torres, Carmen)
November 29, 2023 Filing 64 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding - Informative Motion of Financial Oversight and Management Board Regarding Title VI Approval Hearing for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company and December 6-7, 2023, Omnibus Hearing filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 29, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION Submitting Financial Oversight and Management Board's, as Administrative Supervisor, Exhibit List in Connection with the Hearing to Consider Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Public Finance Corporation Pursuant to Section 601 (M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 29, 2023 Filing 62 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding attendance at (i) Omnibus Hearing on December 6-7, 2023, and (ii) PRIDCO Title VI Approval Hearing filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Party Appearance Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Party Exhibit Cover Sheet (N/A), #3 Exhibit C - Party Witness Cover Sheet (N/A))(Martinez-Casado, Maria)
November 28, 2023 Filing 61 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Intention to be Heard at the Approval Hearing for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company and December 6-7, 2023, Omnibus Hearing filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio, GN3 SIP Limited, GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust, Ginkgo Tree, LLC, GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P., GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P. Responses due by 12/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
November 28, 2023 Filing 60 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion to Inform AmeriNational Community Services, LLCs Appearance at the Title VI Approval Hearing for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of AmeriNational Community Services, LLC Responses due by 12/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION Submitting Supplemental Declaration of Brian S. Rosen in Support of the Application of the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, by and through the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, as Administrative Supervisor, for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601 (M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 28, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION Submitting Declaration of Craig E. Johnson of Kroll Restructuring Administration, LLC Regarding the Solicitaion and Tabulation of Votes Cast on the Qualifying Modification Pursuant to PROMESA Title VI for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 27, 2023 Filing 57 Motion to allow Stephanie Massman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX102167) filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC Responses due by 12/11/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Torres, Carmen)
November 27, 2023 Filing 56 Motion to allow Benjamin Kaminetzky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 102168) filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC Responses due by 12/11/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Torres, Carmen) Modified on 12/5/2023 to correct receipt no. (ct).
November 22, 2023 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC re #50 Notice (Other), (Adler, Adam)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #46 Motion to allow Brian Resnick to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLCNOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/20/2023. (sc)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #45 Motion to allow Marc Tobak to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/20/2023. (SC)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR TITLE VI APPROVAL HEARING FOR THE PUERTO RICO INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY AND DECEMBER 6-7, 2023, OMNIBUS HEARING re #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act filed by Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PARTY APPEARANCE SHEET, #2 Exhibit B - PARTY EXHIBIT COVER SHEET, #3 Exhibit C - PARTY WITNESS COVER SHEET)(SC)
November 20, 2023 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC re #13 Notice (Other),, (Adler, Adam)
November 17, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE - Notice of Submission of Qualifying Modification Supplement and Related Documents for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico re #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 17, 2023 Filing 49 ***WITHDRAWN PER DE #69 *** MEMORANDUM in Opposition Objection to the Proposed Qualifying Modification of the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company filed by AmeriNational Community Services, LLC, Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC Re: #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act filed by Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company filed by AmeriNational Community Services, LLC, Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan) Modified on 12/5/2023 (ct).
November 17, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo J. Garcia-Sola on behalf of AmeriNational Community Services, LLC (Garcia-Sola, Arturo)
November 17, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of AmeriNational Community Services, LLC (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
November 17, 2023 Filing 46 Motion to allow Brian Resnick to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100061245) filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC Responses due by 12/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Torres, Carmen)
November 17, 2023 Filing 45 Motion to allow Marc Tobak to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100063270) filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC Responses due by 12/1/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Torres, Carmen)
November 14, 2023 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Adler, Adam)
November 10, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order Approving Qualifying Modification for Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company by Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 9, 2023 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC re #2 MOTION Submitting - Declaration of Brian S. Rosen In Support of the Application of the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, by and Through the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, as Administrative Supervisor, for, #3 MOTION requesting Order - Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Procedures and Establishing Schedule for Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act, #33 Certificate of Service,,, #13 Notice (Other),, (Adler, Adam)
November 9, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Katherine Marie Lynn on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Lynn, Katherine)
November 9, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Sara Maresa Posner on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Posner, Sara)
November 9, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Pieter H.B. Van Tol, III on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Van Tol, Pieter)
November 9, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ronald Joseph Silverman on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Silverman, Ronald)
November 7, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew P. Kremer on behalf of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority (Kremer, Matthew)
November 7, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Peter Friedman on behalf of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority (Friedman, Peter)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Motion to allow Matthew Kremer to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/3/2023. (sc)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion to allow Peter Friedman to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/3/2023. (sc)
November 3, 2023 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC re #2 MOTION Submitting - Declaration of Brian S. Rosen In Support of the Application of the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, by and Through the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, as Administrative Supervisor, for, #3 MOTION requesting Order - Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Procedures and Establishing Schedule for Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act, #13 Notice (Other),, (Adler, Adam)
November 3, 2023 Filing 32 Motion to allow Matthew Kremer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100076525) filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 11/17/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
November 3, 2023 Filing 31 Motion to allow Peter Friedman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7493239) filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 11/17/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion to allow Sara M. Posner to appear pro hac vice on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/1/2023. (sc)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to allow Ronald J. Silverman to appear pro hac vice on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/1/2023. (sc)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to allow Pieter Van Tol to appear pro hac vice on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/1/2023. (sc)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion to allow Katherine M. Lynn to appear pro hac vice on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/1/2023. (sc)
October 31, 2023 Filing 26 Motion to allow Sara M. Posner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100077148) filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association Responses due by 11/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tulla, Eric)
October 31, 2023 Filing 25 Motion to allow Ronald J. Silverman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100069984) filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association Responses due by 11/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tulla, Eric)
October 31, 2023 Filing 24 Motion to allow Pieter Van Tol to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100049960) filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association Responses due by 11/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tulla, Eric)
October 31, 2023 Filing 23 Motion to allow Katherine M. Lynn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX102746) filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association Responses due by 11/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tulla, Eric)
October 31, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Papers by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Tulla, Eric)
October 31, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE CONCERNING OMNIBUS HEARING AND APPROVAL HEARING REGARDING THE PUERTO RICO INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANYS TITLE VI QUALIFYING MODIFICATION APPLICATION. Related document: #1 . Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/31/2023. (sc) Modified on 11/9/2023 to add related document (ct).
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to allow Eric Kay to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio, GN3 SIP Limited, GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust, Ginkgo Tree, LLC, GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P., GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/31/2023. (sc)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to allow Susheel Kirpalani to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio, GN3 SIP Limited, GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust, Ginkgo Tree, LLC, GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P., GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/31/2023. (sc)
October 30, 2023 Filing 18 Motion to allow Eric Kay to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100049738) filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio, GN3 SIP Limited, GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust, Ginkgo Tree, LLC, GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P., GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P. Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 30, 2023 Filing 17 Motion to allow Susheel Kirpalani to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100049738) filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio, GN3 SIP Limited, GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust, Ginkgo Tree, LLC, GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P., GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P. Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio, Ginkgo Tree, LLC, GN3 SIP Limited, GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P., GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P., GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion to allow Brian S. Rosen to appear pro hac vice on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/30/2023. (sc)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to allow Libbie B. Osaben to appear pro hac vice on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto RicoNOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/30/2023. (sc)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing to Consider Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico re #10 Order on Motion requesting Order,, #3 MOTION requesting Order - Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Procedures and Establishing Schedule for Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, #1 APPLICATION for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to allow Ashley M. Weringa to appear pro hac vice on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/27/2023. (sc)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to allow Steve Y. Ma to appear pro hac vice on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL: In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. Both local and pro hac vice counsel shall sign all filings in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83A(f) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1(c). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/27/2023. (sc)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion requesting Order - Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Procedures and Establishing Schedule for Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company Proposed Approval Order due by 11/10/2023 at 5:00 PM (AST). Responses due by 11/17/2023 at 5:00 PM (AST). Replies due by 11/29/2023 at 5:00 PM (AST). Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/27/2023. (sc)
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 Motion to allow Ashley M. Weringa to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC8342039) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to allow Brian S. Rosen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100052859) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 Motion to allow Libbie B. Osaben to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100079774) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
October 27, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to allow Steve Y. Ma to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100061246) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
October 27, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. All attorneys appearing pro hac vice in Title VI cases must file a Pro Hac Vice Application. Those who have already been admitted in Title III cases, or in related adversary proceedings, are exempt from again paying the pro hac vice admission fee in the Title VI cases. However, attorneys not previously admitted pro hac vice in a Title III case, or in a related adversary proceeding, shall fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83(A)(f) in its entirety. By Order of the Court. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2023. (ct)
October 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (gr)
October 27, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION requesting Order - Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Procedures and Establishing Schedule for Approval of Qualifying Modification for the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION Submitting - Declaration of Brian S. Rosen In Support of the Application of the Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, by and Through the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, as Administrative Supervisor, for Approval of Qualifying Modification for PRIDCO Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION - Application of The Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company, by and Through the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, as Administrative Supervisor, for Approval of Qualifying Modification for Pridco Pursuant to Section 601(M)(1)(D) of the Puerto Rico Oversight, Management, and Economic Stability Act ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8425851.), filed by Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 10/27/2023 re: event type (ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Puerto Rico Industrial Development Company
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: Pieter H.B. Van Tol, III
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Silverman
Represented By: Katherine Marie Lynn
Represented By: Sara Maresa Posner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Crown Managed Accounts SPC - Crown/GT Segregated Portfolio
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ginkgo Tree, LLC
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GN3 SIP Limited
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd.
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests Of The Sali Multi-Series Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GoldenTree VI Master Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GTAM 110 Designated Activity Company and High Yield And Bank Loan Series Trust
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Represented By: Peter Friedman
Represented By: Matthew P. Kremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AmeriNational Community Services, LLC
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?