Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. v. Ortiz et al
Plaintiff: Organic Farms Vitamins Corp.
Defendant: Francis Ortiz, John Doe, Companies ABC, Insurance Companies XYZ and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2023cv01557
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Referring Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2023 Filing 22 JUDGMENT is entered DISMISSING this action WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 12/26/2023. (ao)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting: #19 "Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and To Cancel the Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Dkt. No. 16)." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 12/22/2023. (ao)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. In light of plaintiff Organic Farms Vitamins Corp.'s motion informing that the parties have settled this case (ECF No. 19), the preliminary injunction hearing is vacated as the request for injunctive relief has become moot. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 12/22/2023. (mcc)
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice as to Francis Ortiz, Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Injunction Hearing to be Cancelled filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. Responses due by 1/8/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding #17 Motion In Compliance: Noted. Plaintiff shall be ready at the preliminary injunction hearing to introduce evidence showing that the person by the name of Francis Ortiz served at El Senorial Shopping Center is the same Francis Ortiz that resides and/or works at 1804 Eduardo Conde Ave., Santurce, Puerto Rico 00912-3927. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 12/14/23. (Lopez, Marcos) Modified docket text on 12/14/2023 (idg).
December 14, 2023 SUMMONS Returned Executed See Image on Dkt. Entry #17 by Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. upon Francis Ortiz served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (arg)
December 13, 2023 Filing 17 Motion In Compliance as to #16 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. Responses due by 12/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Served Documents)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for December 27, 2023 at 09:00 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 12/08/2023. (mcc)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Seizure Order (ECF Nos. 2 and 7). Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 12/8/23. (Lopez, Marcos)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding #10 Motion requesting Order: Noted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 12/8/23. (Lopez, Marcos)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding #11 Motion submitting Related document: Noted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 11/21/2023. (jhi)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 11/21/2023. (jhi)
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. Responses due by 12/5/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation Document 1-3, #2 Exhibit Certified English Translation Document 1-4, #3 Exhibit Certified English Translation Document 1-6)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION requesting Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/4/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan (Docket No. 8), the #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Request for Extension of Time and #7 Motion Submitting Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause have been randomly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for disposition. Signed by Clerk on 11/08/2023. (ft)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING MOTION. The #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Request for Extension of Time filed by Organic Farms Vitamins Corp., #7 Motion Submitting Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause filed by Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. are hereby REFERRED to a US MAGISTRATE JUDGE for Disposition. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 11/8/2023.(mr)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Motion Submitting Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Memorandum of Law) filed by Organic Farms Vitamins Corp., MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/22/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO, Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause, #2 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Writ to Marshal)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ortiz Francis. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (vrg)
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Organic Farms Vitamins Corp..(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Request for Extension of Time filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. Responses due by 11/21/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Memorandum of Law) filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. Responses due by 11/21/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachment(s): #1 Memorandum of Law)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura) Modified Attachments added on 11/8/2023 (rim).
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN AND JANE DOE, COMPANY A ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8440079.), filed by Organic Farms Vitamins Corp.. Service due by 2/5/2024, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Category Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organic Farms Vitamins Corp. v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Farms Vitamins Corp.
Represented By: Laura Belendez-Ferrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companies ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?