TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. v. Helechal Gas Station, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp.
Defendant: Helechal Gas Station, Inc., Marilyn Ferai-Haifa, Mr. Teodoro Rivera-Robles, Neida Rosa Blanco-Rivera, Rivera-Blanco Conjugal Partnership and Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Blanco
Case Number: 3:2023cv01566
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Referring Judge: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION Reiterating Request for Preliminary Injunction re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/16/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion for TRO. The TRO is extended until resolution of the motion for preliminary injunction. State of Me. v. Fri, 483 F.2d 439 (1st Cir. 1973). Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/18/2023. (wm)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice and to Deem Submitted Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #51 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp., 54 Status Conference,,,,,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,,,,, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado on behalf of TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 12/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - TotalEnergies USPTO Trademark Registration Record, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - PR Property Registry Record)(Related document(s) #51 , 54 , #2 ) (De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to extend the Temporary Restraining Order's Expiration Date filed by Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado on behalf of TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 12/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY to opposition re #23 Motion to Dismiss as to Helechal Gas Station, Inc. filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Responses due by 12/26/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael) Modified title and added relationship on 12/13/2023 (idg).
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER noted #50 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 12/8/2023. (PGA)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler: Case called for Evidentiary Hearing but not held on 12/7/2023. Present on behalf of plaintiff were Attorneys Lee Sepulveda, Walter Lebron and Joseph De Jesus. On behalf of the defendants was Attorney Michael Corona. Housekeeping matters discussed. Attorney Lee Sepulveda informed the Court that they would not present additional evidence and that they would summit the matter with what was already on the docket without holding the hearing today. He also requested that the Court take judicial notice that the renewed contract between Total and Teodoro Rivera-Rivera has been recorded at the Public Registry. Attorney Corona requested time to respond to the plaintiffs most recent filing. The Court granted the request and set the following deadlines: Defendant shall file the reply to opposition to the plaintiffs motion to dismiss and the opposition to the preliminary injunction in one motion. Not more than 15 pages by 12/14/2023. Plaintiff shall seek leave to reply, no more than 5 pages. After that, the request for preliminary injunction will be deemed submitted. The Court asked the parties as to their compliance with the TRO. Plaintiff informed the Court that defendants were in breach of items #1, #3 and #5. The Court recessed to allow parties to agree on the way they will proceed to comply with the Courts order. After having discussed the matter, the parties informed the Court that as to item #3, parties agreed that representatives from Total Energies will be allowed to enter the premises to inspect all the equipment related to the tanks, storage, and disposal of fuel. As to item #1, all covers on the trademarks will be removed. As to item #5, defense counsel stated that they have provided evidence of payments on electricity and an invoice with a $0.00 balance and that the supply of water has always been under the control of the owner of the property. Defense counsel will confirm the specific time when the parties will visit the station on Tuesday, December 12, 2023. (Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in Courtroom 3, Hato Rey.) (cmd)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION Submitting Admissions regarding Expedited Discovery and for Proceedings during Preliminary Injunction Hearing re: 44 Order on Motion requesting Order filed by Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/21/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Helechal's Answer to Request for Admissions)(Related document(s) 44 ) (De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Helechal Gas Station, Inc. filed by Helechal Gas Station, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Motion In Compliance Tendering Certified Translations as to #11 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, filed by Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/20/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-6, #2 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-7, #3 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-8, #4 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-9, #5 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-10, #6 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-11, #7 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-12, #8 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-13, #9 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-14, #10 Exhibit Certified Translation of ECF No. 1-17)(Related document(s) #11 ) (De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER noted #48 INFORMATIVE motion regarding answers for requests of admissions filed by Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 12/6/2023. (hgp)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding answers for requests of admissions filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Responses due by 12/20/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER noted #46 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 12/5/2023. (PGA)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Stipulations, Exhibits, and List of Witnesses filed by Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/18/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - TotalEnergies Brand, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Helechal-Rivera Lease (03.11.2020), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Sales and Supply Agreement (10.5.2020), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 08.14.2023 Letter from Helechal to Rivera, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - 08.16.2023 Letter from Helechal to Rivera, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - 08.17.2023 Letter from TEMPR to Helechal, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - 08.17.2023 Letter from Helechal to TEMPR, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - 09.01.2023 Letter from TEMPR to Helechal)(De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER noted #42 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 12/4/2023. (PGA)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion requesting Order. Defendant Helechal is to respond to the request for admissions on or before December 6, 2023 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 12/4/2023. (PGA)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Emergency MOTION requesting Order Authorizing Expedited Discovery regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/18/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Request for Admissions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 12.1.2023 Email Exchange re: stipulation of facts and documents)(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding TRO AND ZOOM MEETING filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Responses due by 12/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Deem Request for Preliminary Injunction Sumbitted without Opposition re 14 Order,,,, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11.28.2023 Email from L.Sepulvado to M. Corona, #2 Exhibit 11.30.2023 Email from L Sepulvado to M. Corona, #3 Exhibit 11.30.2023 Reply from M. Corona, #4 Exhibit 11.30.2023 Surreply from L. Sepulvado)(Related document(s) 14 , #2 ) (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 APPROVED BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Signed by US District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (In Vault) (idg)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #38 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Extension of Expiration Date) filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. GRANTED. Extended up to 12/13/2023 as requested. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/30/2023.(wm)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Extension of Expiration Date) filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Motion In Compliance Regarding Bond in Compliance with Order as to #11 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, 36 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 12/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bond No. 30205970)(Related document(s) #11 , 36 ) (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Plaintiff has so far failed to give security or post bond as required by paragraph 6 of the temporary restraining order. Plaintiff shall comply on or before November 30, 2023. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including the denial of any request to extend the effectiveness of the temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/28/2023.(idg)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. The referral order at ECF No. #11 is supplemented as follows: Allegations of noncompliance with the temporary restraining order are to be submitted to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lopez-Soler for discussion in the preliminary injunction hearing and for inclusion in the resulting report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/28/2023.(idg)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #27 Motion for TRO: DENIED. The temporary restraining order at ECF No. #11 issued by this Court on November 15, 2023 is clear on its terms and is fully enforceable without supplementation. The Court again notes plaintiff's patent failure to comply with L. Civ. R. 65. Regardless, from the parties' filings, the Court deduces that the gas station in question has ceased operations that would violate paragraphs 1 and 2 of the temporary restraining order. Defendants are nonetheless reminded that they must give effect to the terms of the temporary restraining order in their entirety. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/28/2023. (idg)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. The Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 9:30 a.m. will be held in Hato Rey Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/28/2023. (hgp)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER finding as moot #18 Motion for TRO. See Docket Nos. 22 and 27. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/2023. (PGA)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER finding as moot #16 Motion Informing Calendar Conflict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/2023. (PGA)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER noted and approved #26 INFORMATIVE motion. Evidentiary Hearing is reset for December 7, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Available Courtroom before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. The parties are to exchange by December 1, 2023 stipulated facts, exhibits, and list of witnesses. A joint informative motion regarding stipulations, exhibits, and list of witnesses is to be filed by December 4, 2023. Additionally, the parties are to provide the Court two (2) courtesy binders with stipulated exhibits and exhibits for identification. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/2023. (PGA)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER noted #25 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/2023. (PGA)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER noted #24 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/2023. (PGA)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Expand Scope of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Second INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc., TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp., Marilyn Ferai-Haifa. Responses due by 12/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael) Modified on 11/27/2023 to add filers (ab).
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Docket 22 and 24 filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email exchange)(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motion In Compliance with order docket no. 22 filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Responses due by 12/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Helechal Gas Station, Inc. filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Responses due by 12/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Total Energies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp., #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Helechal Gas Station, Inc. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer TODAY on Helechal's request for the continuance of the evidentiary hearing and to submit an informative motion on those efforts and any agreement reached by TODAY at 6:00 p.m. Total's request for the expansion of the TRO must be submitted (separately from the matter of the continuance of the hearing for a preliminary injunction) for the consideration of the presiding District Judge. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/23. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER noted #17 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/23. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER noted #15 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/23. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER noted #15 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/22/23. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/6/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Responses due by 12/5/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Michael S. Corona-Munoz on behalf of Helechal Gas Station, Inc. Responses due by 12/5/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corona-Munoz, Michael)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Service of Process, Motion In Compliance as to 14 Order,,,, filed by Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/4/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Summons Helechal Gas Station Inc., #2 Exhibit Executed Summons Teodoro Rivera, #3 Exhibit Executed Summons Neida Blanco, #4 Exhibit Executed Summons Marilyn Haifa, #5 Exhibit 11.09.2023 Email to M. Haifa, #6 Exhibit 11.15.2023 Email to M. Haifa re TRO, #7 Exhibit 11.16.2023 Fax to M. Corona, #8 Exhibit 11.16.2023 Email from TEMPR to M. Haifa re TRO, #9 Exhibit 11.18.2023 Email from TEMPR to M. Haifa re TRO, #10 Exhibit 11.18.2023 Email to M. Corona)(Related document(s) 14 ) (De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion regarding scheduling matters. Helechal Gas Station, Inc. and Marilyn Ferai-Haifa are to respond to TEMPR's motion for preliminary injunction at Docket No. 2 by November 27, 2023. The parties are to meet on November 28, 2023 to stipulate facts, exhibits, and exchange list of witnesses. A joint informative motion regarding stipulations, exhibits, and list of witnesses is to be filed by November 28, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. Additionally, the parties are to provide the Court two (2) courtesy binders with stipulated exhibits and exhibits for identification. Plaintiffs are ordered to personally serve Helechal Gas Station, Inc. and Marilyn Ferai-Haifa WITH COPY OF THIS ORDER by November 17, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiffs will file an informative motion regarding service by November 20, 2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/16/2023. (PGA)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion regarding scheduling matters. Helechal Gas Station, Inc. and Marilyn Ferai-Haifa are to respond to TEMPR's motion for preliminary injunction at Docket No. 2 by November 27, 2023. The parties are to meet on November 28, 2023 to stipulate facts, exhibits, and exchange list of witnesses. A joint informative motion regarding stipulations, exhibits, and list of witnesses is to be filed by November 28, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. Additionally, the parties are to provide the Court two (2) courtesy binders with stipulated exhibits and exhibits for identification. Plaintiffs are ordered to personally serve Helechal Gas Station, Inc. and Marilyn Ferai-Haifa by November 17, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiffs will file an informative motion regarding service by November 20, 2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/16/2023. (PGA)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Evidentiary Hearing re #2 is set for November 29, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Hato Rey Courtroom 5 before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/16/2023. (PGA)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and for TRO at ECF No. 2 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. TEMPR's request for preliminary injunction is hereby REFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler for the setting of a hearing as soon as practicable and the issuance of a report and recommendation. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. Likewise, TEMPR's motion regarding scheduling matters, at ECF No. 5, is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for disposition. The motion for leave to file "in excess of page limit" at ECF No. 3 is GRANTED. However, subsequent filings shall comply with the Local Civil Rule's limitations. The motion for an extension of time to file certified translations at ECF No. 4 is GRANTED. Certified translations due by 12/13/2023. This order shall become effective as of its time and date of issuance and shall expire on November 29, 2023 at 11:59 p.m., without prejudice to it being extended for good cause. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/15/2023.(wm)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Neida Rosa Blanco-Rivera, Marilyn Ferai-Haifa, Helechal Gas Station, Inc., Teodoro Rivera-Robles. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado on behalf of All Plaintiffs (De Jesus-Maldonado, Joseph)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vrg)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter P. Lebron-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lebron-Ramirez, Walter)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Summons, Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet, filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Helechal Gas Station Inc., #4 Summons Marilyn Ferai Haifa, #5 Summons Teodoro Rivera and Conjugal Partnership, #6 Summons Neida Blanco and Conjugal Partnership, #7 Exhibit Report (AO 120))(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee) Modified on 11/13/2023 to edit docket title text as to correct event and remove duplicate wording. (mg).
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Why Plaintiff's Urgent Motion for Termporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Issued and Fixing Deadline to Answer Complaint as to Marilyn Ferai-Haifa, Helechal Gas Station, Inc. filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Page Limit filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8443434.), filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp.. Service due by 2/7/2024, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TotalEnergies Logo, #2 Exhibit TotalEnergies Wordmark, #3 Exhibit TotalEnergies Service Stations, #4 Exhibit TotalEnergies USPTO Trademark Registration, #5 Exhibit Total Energies Sports Sponsorship, #6 Exhibit Lease between TEMPR and Rivera, #7 Exhibit Sublease between TEMPR and Helechal, #8 Exhibit Notification to Helechal of Underlying Lease, #9 Exhibit Supply Agreement between TEMPR and Helechal, #10 Exhibit Illegal Lease between Helechal and Rivera, #11 Exhibit 08.14.2023 Letter from Helechal to Rivera, #12 Exhibit 08.17.2023 Letter from TEMPR to Helechal, #13 Exhibit 08.17.2023 Letter from Helechal to TEMPR, #14 Exhibit 09.01.2023 Letter from TEMPR to Helechal, #15 Exhibit TotalEnergies Trademark Infringement, #16 Exhibit Notice of Termination, #17 Exhibit 10.31.2023 Lease Deed between TEMPR and Rivera)(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. v. Helechal Gas Station, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado
Represented By: Walter P. Lebron-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helechal Gas Station, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Corona-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Ferai-Haifa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Teodoro Rivera-Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neida Rosa Blanco-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivera-Blanco Conjugal Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?