Bancredito Holding Corporation v. Driven Administrative Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bancredito Holding Corporation
Defendant: Maria Dominguez, DMRA Law LLC, Frances Diaz, Ana Faria and Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation
Receiver: Driven Administrative Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01036
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino on behalf of Ana Faria (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel) Modified on 3/22/2024 to add motion and edit title text. (mg).
March 21, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 4, 2024 to File Answer filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation, Driven Administrative Services, LLC Responses due by 4/4/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Ignacio Garcia-Franco appointed to represent Plaintiff: Frances Diaz (Pro-se) re 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Clerk on March 8, 2024. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Frances Diaz and Counsel Ignacio Garcia-Franco. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice in Spanish). (mg)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall take notice and appoint pro bono counsel. Co-Defendant Frances Diaz's Answer to Complaint due by 3/22/2024. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/7/2024. (LTE)
March 1, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bancredito Holding Corporation upon Ana Faria served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 3/4/2024 to add service dates. (mg).
February 23, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Frances Diaz, pro se. Responses due by 3/8/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: ***SELECTED PARTIES*** #1 Financial Affidavit in Support)(rim)
February 21, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for extension of time of 30 days to Plead or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by Frances Diaz, Pro Se. Responses due by 3/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/21/2024. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/21/2024. (LTE)
February 20, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo J. Garcia-Sola on behalf of Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Garcia-Sola, Arturo)
February 20, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lizzie M. Portela-Fernandez on behalf of Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Portela-Fernandez, Lizzie)
February 20, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan A. Marques-Diaz on behalf of Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Marques-Diaz, Juan)
February 20, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 21, 2024 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation, Driven Administrative Services, LLC Responses due by 3/5/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER noted #6 Motion Submitting Related Document. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/7/2024. (LTE)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/7/2024. (LTE)
February 6, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bancredito Holding Corporation. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
February 6, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Driven Administrative Services, LLC by Bancredito Holding Corporation upon (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
February 6, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Frances Diaz by Bancredito Holding Corporation upon (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. In view of the Order of Recusal by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 10), this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Signed by Clerk on 01/25/2024. (gr)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL: The undersigned recuses himself from presiding over this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 455(a). The matter is referred to the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to another district judge. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/25/2024. (mrr)
January 24, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to DMRA Law LLC, Frances Diaz, Maria Dominguez, Driven Administrative Services, LLC, Ana Faria. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vrg)
January 24, 2024 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 MOTION to Restrict Document . Motions terminated: #2 MOTION to Restrict Document. ***FILED IN ERROR - Motion to restrict contains the exhibit being restricted.*** (rim)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation (Estrella, Alberto)
January 23, 2024 Filing 6 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION Submitting Exhibit 1 to Verified Complaint Exhibit 1 to Verified Complaint filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation, Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation, DMRA Law LLC, Frances Diaz, Maria Dominguez, Driven Administrative Services, LLC, Ana Faria Responses due by 2/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 23, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Restrict Document Exhibit 1 to Verified Complaint filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 2/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 23, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 23, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Bancredito Holding Corporation. Service due by 4/22/2024, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Ana Faria, #4 Summons Driven Administrative Services LLC, #5 Summons Frances Diaz, #6 Summons DMRA, #7 Summons Maria Dominguez)(Quinones, Eddalee)
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR - Motion to restrict contains the exhibit being restricted. Counsel to re-file*** **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Eddalee Quinones on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Quinones, Eddalee) Modified on 1/24/2024 (rim).
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR - As requested by filer. Wrong PDF.*** COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8524696.), filed by Bancredito Holding Corporation. Service due by 4/22/2024, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Ana Faria, #4 Summons DMRA Law LLC, #5 Summons Mara A. Domnguez, #6 Summons Driven Administrative Services, #7 Summons Frances Diaz)(Quinones, Eddalee) Modified to file in error on 1/23/2024 (idg).
January 23, 2024 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #1 Complaint. ***FILED IN ERROR - As requested by filer. Wrong PDF.*** (idg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bancredito Holding Corporation v. Driven Administrative Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bancredito Holding Corporation
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Represented By: Eddalee Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Driven Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Juan A. Marques-Diaz
Represented By: Lizzie M. Portela-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMRA Law LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Diaz
Represented By: Ignacio Garcia-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Faria
Represented By: Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?