Bancredito Holding Corporation v. Driven Administrative Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bancredito Holding Corporation
Defendant: Driven Administrative Services, LLC and Bancredito International Bank & Trust Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv01039
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying as moot Docket No. #32 Motion to Dismiss, in light of the Amended Complaint. Driven Administrative Services, LLC, shall answer or otherwise plead on or before April 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on March 15, 2024. (ASE)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Verified Complaint) against Bancredito International Bank & Trust Corporation, Driven Administrative Services, LLC, filed by Bancredito Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Estrella, Alberto)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Consent MOTION for extension of time. Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 3/14/2024. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/29/2024. (ari)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Consent MOTION for extension of time filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 3/14/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement byDriven Administrative Services, LLC. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to dismiss as to Bancredito Holding Corporation filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Bancredito International Bank & Trust Corporation, Driven Administrative Services, LLC Responses due by 3/7/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Liquidation Plan, #3 Exhibit C Receivership Order, #4 Exhibit D Certified Translation of Judgment from Court of Appeals, #5 Exhibit E Certified Translation of Resolution by the Supreme Court)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER noted #29 MOTION for Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 and #30 MOTION for Disclosure of Corporate Affiliation Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/22/2024. (ari)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Disclosure of Corporate Affiliation Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 3/7/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 3/7/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Lizzie M. Portela-Fernandez on behalf of Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Portela-Fernandez, Lizzie)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo J. Garcia-Sola on behalf of Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Garcia-Sola, Arturo) Modified on 2/8/2024 to remove restriction as per CVR's Chambers request (ecc).
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan A. Marques-Diaz on behalf of Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Marques-Diaz, Juan)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; finding as moot #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The preliminary injunction hearing set for 2/9/2024 at 9:00 am is vacated. The attorneys for Defendant Driven Administrative Services LLC (Driven) shall file their notices of appearance in this case. Driven is granted until 2/22/2024 to answer the complaint or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/07/2024. (CVR)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Vacate Feb 9 PI Hearing and Related Filing Deadline filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 2/21/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order ***SEE IMAGE ON D.E. #15 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bancredito Holding Corporation upon Bancredito International Bank & Trust Corporation served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (ab)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order ***SEE IMAGE ON D.E #16 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bancredito Holding Corporation upon Driven Administrative Services, LLC served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (ab)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Status Report is noted and the request for a Status Conference is denied. (Docket No. 21). The preliminary injunction hearing will remain as set. However, after Defendants appear represented by counsel, the parties are encouraged to engage in good faith negotiations to reach an agreement as to the artwork and avoid the preliminary injunction hearing. In which case they shall jointly inform the court by motion. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 01/31/2024. (CVR)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STATUS REPORT and Request for Status Conference by Plaintiff in Advance of February 9, 2024 Hearing by Bancredito Holding Corporation. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Weber on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation (Weber, Richard)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbe David Lowell on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation (Lowell, Abbe)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ireland on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation (Ireland, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bancredito Holding Corporation re #1 Complaint, to Driven Administrative Services, LLC (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bancredito Holding Corporation re #1 Complaint, to Bancredito International Bank & Trust (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/). Counsel to re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 1/31/2024 (ab).
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Pro hac vice counsel, who has not made an appearance in this case, has contacted the undersigned's chambers on two occasions. Counsel and their staff shall refrain from calling the undersigneds chambers. A motion is the only appropriate mechanism to contact the Court. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 01/30/2024. (Velez-Rive, Camille)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Abbe Lowell, Elizabeth Ireland and Richard Weber re: 11 Order on Motion to Appear PHV,, : The Court has granted your pro hac vice applications. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ab)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #9 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 01/24/2024. (CVR)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to allow Richard Weber to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8527230) filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 2/7/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to allow Elizabeth Ireland to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8527198) filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 2/7/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to allow Abbe Lowell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8527173) filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 2/7/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The request for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 2/9/2024 at 9:00 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 4 before Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 1/24/2024.(ari)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bancredito International Bank & Trust Corporation, Driven Administrative Services, LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. (vrg)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits: Text of Proposed Order re: Temporary Restraining Order filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 2/6/2024. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 1/24/2024 to edit docket text (ab).
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Bancredito Holding Corporation Re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bancredito Holding Corporation filed by Bancredito Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zapata Decl., #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B - Weber Decl., #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit B-4, #8 Exhibit B-5)(Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 1/24/2024 to correct title of d.e.#2 (ab).
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Bancredito Holding Corporation Responses due by 2/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 1/24/2024 to edit docket text and event (ab).
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8525606.), filed by Bancredito Holding Corporation. Service due by 4/22/2024, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons Summons - Driven Administrative Services, LLC, #5 Summons Summons - Bancrdito International Bank & Trust)(Estrella, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bancredito Holding Corporation v. Driven Administrative Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bancredito Holding Corporation
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Represented By: Abbe David Lowell
Represented By: Elizabeth Ireland
Represented By: Richard Weber
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driven Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Juan A. Marques-Diaz
Represented By: Lizzie M. Portela-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bancredito International Bank & Trust Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?