Llanos-Torres v. The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Llanos-Torres
Defendant: The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc. and The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator
Case Number: 3:2024cv01058
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting: #20 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents and Extension of Time to File Certified English Translations of Same." Certified English translations due by 5/15/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 4/1/2024. (ao)
March 31, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Document in spanish and for an extention of time, MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Luis Vivaldi-Oliver on behalf of Evelyn Llanos-Torres Responses due by 4/15/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivaldi-Oliver, Luis)
March 31, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Evelyn Llanos-Torres Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on ERISA Preemption Grounds and for Lack of Proper Party Defendant filed by The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator filed by Evelyn Llanos-Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Witness Report, #2 Exhibit Plan Information, #3 Exhibit Letter from The Hartford, #4 Exhibit Letter from The Hartford, #5 Exhibit Letter from The Hartford, #6 Exhibit Mrs. Llanos' Sworn Statement)(Vivaldi-Oliver, Luis)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2024 at 11:00 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Joint Initial Scheduling Memorandum due by 4/19/2024. The filing of a Motion to Dismiss will not stay discovery. Defendant shall file an Answer by 4/12/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 3/21/2024. (ao)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting: #16 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss." Response due by 3/30/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 3/14/2024. (ao) Modified on 3/15/2024 to correct pleading allowed. (arg)
March 14, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until MARCH 30, 2024 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Luis Vivaldi-Oliver on behalf of Evelyn Llanos-Torres Responses due by 4/1/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivaldi-Oliver, Luis)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER noting: #13 "Motion Submitting Certified English Translation." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 3/7/2024. (ao)
February 29, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on ERISA Preemption Grounds and for Lack of Proper Party Defendant filed by Alberto Tabales-Maldonado on behalf of The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator Responses due by 3/14/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STD Insured Benefit Plan, #2 Exhibit Schedule of Benefits)(Tabales-Maldonado, Alberto)
February 29, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, filed by Alberto Tabales-Maldonado on behalf of The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator Responses due by 3/14/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certified Translation Complaint and Summons)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Tabales-Maldonado, Alberto)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying: #8 "Motion for Default Judgment." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 2/20/2024. (ao)
February 15, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Plaintiff Requesting Default Judgment filed by All Defendants Re: #8 MOTION for Default Judgment against Home Depot Puerto Rico Inc.requested by as to against Home Depot Puerto Rico Inc.requested by Evelyn Llanos-Torres filed by Evelyn Llanos-Torres filed by All Defendants. (Tabales-Maldonado, Alberto)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part: #3 "Motion for Extension of Time until March 8, 2024 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Responsive pleading due by 2/29/2024. Defendant is warned that unless an extension of time is granted by the Court, he must comply with all deadlines. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 2/15/2024. (ao)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting: #2 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Document and For Extension of Time Until March 8, 2024, to File the Certified English Translation of Same." Certified English translation due by 3/8/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 2/15/2024. (ao)
February 14, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment against Home Depot Puerto Rico Inc.requested by as to against Home Depot Puerto Rico Inc.requested by Evelyn Llanos-Torres filed by Luis Vivaldi-Oliver on behalf of Evelyn Llanos-Torres Responses due by 2/28/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivaldi-Oliver, Luis)
February 14, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Luis Vivaldi-Oliver on behalf of Evelyn Llanos-Torres (Vivaldi-Oliver, Luis) Modified on 2/15/2024 to terminate motion, correct event and edit text title. (arg)
February 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (vrg)
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Lourdes C. Hernandez-Venegas on behalf of The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator (Hernandez-Venegas, Lourdes) Modified on 2/8/2024 to correct event, terminate motion and edit text title. (arg)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement byThe Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator.. (Tabales-Maldonado, Alberto)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 8, 2024 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Alberto Tabales-Maldonado on behalf of The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator Responses due by 2/21/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tabales-Maldonado, Alberto)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for extension of time until March 8, 2024 to File Certified English Translation filed by Alberto Tabales-Maldonado on behalf of The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator Responses due by 2/21/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tabales-Maldonado, Alberto)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, case number CA2024CV00172. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APRDC-8545928), filed by The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc., The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint and Summons)(Tabales-Maldonado, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Llanos-Torres v. The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Llanos-Torres
Represented By: Luis Vivaldi-Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Lourdes C. Hernandez-Venegas
Represented By: Alberto Tabales-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot USA, Inc. Disability Plan Administrator
Represented By: Lourdes C. Hernandez-Venegas
Represented By: Alberto Tabales-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?