Roldan-Cruz v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Sylvia Roldan-Cruz
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Police Department, Insurance Company XYZ, Company ABC, John & Jane Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv01101
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gina R Mendez-Miro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Docket 6 Motion to Dismiss. On or before May 9, 2024, Plaintiff shall file her response to the Motion to Dismiss. Response/Opposition due by 5/9/2024. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 4/17/2024. (GMN)
April 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 9, 2024 to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puerto Rico Police Department, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Sylvia Roldan-Cruz Responses due by 4/23/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
March 26, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Police Department Responses due by 4/9/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose)
March 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Police Department (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Roldan-Cruz upon Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 3/8/2024, answer due 4/1/2024; Puerto Rico Police Department served on 3/8/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Police Department. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro. (ad)
March 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8580418.), filed by Sylvia Roldan-Cruz. Service due by 6/3/2024, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rivera-Rios, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roldan-Cruz v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Roldan-Cruz
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Police Department
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?