Ruiz-Romero v. USA
Plaintiff: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2024cv01114
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 24-1331 for #7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero. (mcm)
April 5, 2024 Filing 8 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal [Docket Entries 6 & 7] s/c: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero Urb. Lago Horizonte Zafiro 2025 Coto Laurel, PR 00780. (mcm)
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ecc)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. According to the information provided by Plaintiff, he is not unable to pay this Court's filing fees. Among others, Plaintiff reported monthly average expenses of $300.00 for "recreation, entertainment..."; $200.00 for "laundry and dry cleaning" and $300.00 for clothing. In addition, the Court notes that Plaintiff is a serial pro-se filer with 25 prior cases filed before this Court. In several of this prior cases, the Court has found that he was not unable to pay this Court's filing fees. See Civ. No. 20-1510 (ADC) and Civ. No. 18-2018 (PAD). Plaintiff is granted until March 29, 2024 to pay the fees and costs required to proceed in this District Court. See https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/court-fees-rates. Failure to comply with this Order may entail sanctions including the dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 03/14/2024. (CVR) (mcm).
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #4 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to the docket of Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Signed by Clerk on 03/14/2024. (ft)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The undersigned recuses himself from this case. See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/13/2024. (FAR)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened (24-1114) and assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice, Standing Order No. 10 - Consent by Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing in Civil Cases and Consent Form sent to Pro Se by mail.) (vrg)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, Pro Se. Service due by 6/10/2024, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons). (vrg)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, Pro Se. Responses due by 3/25/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (vrg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz-Romero v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?