Ruiz-Romero v. Toro-Velez et al
Plaintiff: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero
Defendant: Lissette Toro-Velez and Pablo Colon-Santiago
Case Number: 3:2024cv01115
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 24-1346 for #7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero. (mcm)
April 9, 2024 Filing 8 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal [Docket Entries 4, 5 & 7] s/c: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero Urb. Lago Horizonte Zafiro 2025 Coto Laurel, PR 00780 (mcm)
March 27, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion for Recusal, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, pro se. (idg)
March 26, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice, Standing Order No. 10 - Consent by Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing in Civil Cases and Consent Form sent to Pro Se by mail.) (idg)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. According to the information provided by plaintiff, he is not unable to pay this Court's filing fees. Among other expenses, plaintiff reported monthly average expenses of $300.00 for "recreation, entertainment..."; $100.00 for "laundry and dry cleaning" and $300.00 for clothing. In prior cases involving this same pro se plaintiff, the Court has imposed a payment plan commensurate with plaintiff's stated income. See Civ. No. 20-1510 (ADC) and Civ. No. 18-2018 (PAD). In the interests of justice, plaintiff is hereby authorized to pay the applicable filing fee for civil actions in monthly installments of $81.00, due the first Friday of every month, beginning on April 5, 2024. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/22/2024. (wm) (mcm).
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Motion of Recusal at ECF No. 3 is DENIED. Plaintiff's subjective disagreements with the Court's past rulings is not a basis for recusal. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/22/2024. (wm) (mcm).
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Recusal filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, pro se. Responses due by 3/25/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, pro se. Service due by 6/10/2024, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(idg)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, pro se.(idg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz-Romero v. Toro-Velez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lissette Toro-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Colon-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?