Rivera-Pomales et al v. Delgado et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales, Aranzasu Adorno-Rivera and Jessica Jaksich Delgado
Defendant: Reymundo Delgado, Jessica Jaksich-Delgado, ABC Insurance Company and XYZ Corporations
Case Number: 3:2024cv01134
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion to dismiss by May 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/17/2024. (mrr)
May 10, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION for extension of time until May 24, 2024 to Oppose Motion to Dismiss filed by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/24/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Boscio, Jose) Modified event type on 5/13/2024 (rim).
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER holding in abeyance #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs shall respond to this motion by May 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 4/29/2024. (mrr)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: In view of the parties' agreement with respect to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Further Status Conference set for 4/26/2024 at 9:00AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan is hereby VACATED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Finding as moot #12 Motion for Hearing. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noted and Moot #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order at Docket No. 19 . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granted #18 Motion to Withdraw Document "Motion for Preliminary Injunction" at Docket No. #3 filed by Aranzasu Adorno-Rivera, Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales. The motion shall so be withdrawn. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
April 25, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw Document re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aranzasu Adorno-Rivera, Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales filed by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/9/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Partial Settlement Agreement)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Morales-Boscio, Jose)
April 24, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/8/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Oharriz, Edgardo)
April 15, 2024 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Status Conference held on 4/15/2024. Present were attorney Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of the plaintiffs and attorney Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz on behalf of the defendants. Attorney Hernandez informed the Court that prior to the status conference he had discussions with attorney Morales with respect to this case. Based on those discussions, attorney Hernandez believes that the plaintiffs are open to the possibility of a settlement. Attorney Hernandez requested the defense consider a stipulation and informed that he will be sending defense counsel a stipulation draft. The parties also discussed timeframes, possible testimony and evidence that might be presented if a preliminary injunction were to be held. Further Status Conference set for 4/26/2024 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Hearing access credentials are available in the following URL link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/video-teleconference-vtc-hearing-links (Court Reporter ZoomGov.) (Hearing held in VTC.) (aa)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall plead or otherwise defend by April 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 4/15/2024. (nat)
April 9, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time until April 24,2024 to File Answer by Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz on behalf of All Defendants. Responses due by 4/23/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Oharriz, Edgardo) Modified docket event type, text title and add response deadline on 4/10/2024 (rim).
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Expecting the defendants to answer the complaint by Wednesday, April 10, 2024, the Court will then hold a Status Conference on Monday, April 15, 2024 at 2:00 PM via VTC before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan, to discuss the details of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing given the extreme scarcity of available courtrooms. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 4/3/2024. Hearing access credentials are available in the following URL link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/video-teleconference-vtc-hearing-links. (aa)
March 22, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing Urgent filed by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/5/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Boscio, Jose)
March 22, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs upon Jessica Jaksich-Delgado served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024. (Morales-Boscio, Jose)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs upon Reymundo Delgado served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024. (Morales-Boscio, Jose)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 8), the #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction has been randomly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for hearing, if necessary, and Report and Recommendation. Signed by Clerk on 03/20/2024. (ft)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING MOTION re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1)(B), this motion is referred to a U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE to hold a hearing if necessary and issue a Report and Recommendation on disposition of the matters contained therein. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 3/20/2024. (mrr)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Reymundo Delgado, Jessica Jaksich Delgado. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vrg)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE Cover Sheet JS-44 and Category Sheet by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet) (Morales-Boscio, Jose)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING, Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a).Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 3/21/2024. (vrg)
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 ***WITDRAWN AS PER ORDER 19*** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of Aranzasu Adorno-Rivera, Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales Responses due by 4/2/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Boscio, Jose) Modified on 4/28/2024 (rim).
March 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re: #1 Complaint, filed by Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales filed by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of Aranzasu Adorno-Rivera, Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Reymundo Delgado, #2 Summons Summons Jessica Jaksich)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Morales-Boscio, Jose) Modified docket text title and remove response deadline on 3/20/2024 (rim).
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Reymundo Delgado, Jessica Jaksich Delgado ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8599076.), filed by Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales. Service due by 6/17/2024, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsworn Statement Rivera Pomales, #2 Exhibit Unsworn Statement Adorno Rivera, #3 Exhibit Facebook Message, #4 Exhibit Face Book Message)(Morales-Boscio, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Pomales et al v. Delgado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Luis Rivera-Pomales
Represented By: Jose A. Morales-Boscio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aranzasu Adorno-Rivera
Represented By: Jose A. Morales-Boscio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Jaksich Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reymundo Delgado
Represented By: Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Jaksich-Delgado
Represented By: Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Represented By: Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Represented By: Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?