Efron v. UBS Financial Services Incorporated
Plaintiff: David Efron
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2024cv01168
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Referring Judge: Gina R Mendez-Miro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement byUBS Financial Services Incorporated. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
May 29, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss as to UBS Financial Services Incorporated filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of UBS Financial Services Incorporated Responses due by 6/12/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit - Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
May 23, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Zakrajsek on behalf of UBS Financial Services Incorporated (Zakrajsek, Michael)
May 23, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Manning on behalf of UBS Financial Services Incorporated (Manning, Christopher)
May 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Christopher N. Manning re: 13 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (mg)
May 22, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Michael T. Zakrajsek re: 12 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (mg)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 5/20/2024. (GMN)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 5/20/2024. (GMN)
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 Motion to allow Christopher N Manning to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8678350) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of UBS Financial Services Incorporated Responses due by 6/3/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 Motion to allow Michael T Zakrajsek to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8678288) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of UBS Financial Services Incorporated Responses due by 6/3/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 6 for Extension of Time to Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answer deadline due by 5/29/2024. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 5/1/2024. (GMN)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. In view of the Order of Recusal by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro. Signed by Clerk on 05/01/2024. (gr)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Upon review of the Notice of Appearance at docket #6 , the Court has identified that the Counsel of Record for Defendant is McConnell Valdes LLC, a law firm where the undersigned was formerly employed. Accordingly, the undersigned disqualifies herself from presiding over this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). See also 22-mc-00692 at docket 1. The matter is referred to the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to another United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 5/1/2024. (mr) Modified on 5/1/2024 to correct NOA docket # (mr).
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Myrgia M. Palacios-Cabrera on behalf of UBS Financial Services Incorporated (Palacios-Cabrera, Myrgia)
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by David Efron filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of UBS Financial Services Incorporated Responses due by 5/10/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
April 11, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Efron upon UBS Financial Services Incorporated served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UBS Financial Services Incorporated. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (vrg)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UBS Financial Services Incorporated ( Filing fee $405 receipt number BPRDC-8619382.), filed by David Efron. Service due by 7/5/2024, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Efron v. UBS Financial Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Efron
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Thomas Zakrajsek
Represented By: Myrgia M. Palacios-Cabrera
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Christopher N. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?