Sabanera Dorado Residents Association, Inc. v. Lai et al
Plaintiff: SABANERA DORADO RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Defendant: Xu Lai, Wei Li, Li/Lai Conjugal Partnership and Conjugal Partnership Li-Lai
Case Number: 3:2024cv01195
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 9 JUDGMENT dismissing the case WITH PREJUDICE with each party bearing its own fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Clerk on 5/29/2024. (glr)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. NOTED. The case is hereby dismissed with prejudice as per the parties' request. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/29/2024.(wm)
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 Joint NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Conjugal Partnership Li-Lai, Xu Lai, Wei Li, Sabanera Dorado Residents Association, Inc. (Feldstein-Del Valle, Joseph) Modified filers on 5/24/2024 (idg).
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Zarel J. Soto-Acaba on behalf of All Defendants (Soto-Acaba, Zarel)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translations due by May 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/30/2024. (wm)
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel A. Pietrantoni on behalf of Sabanera Dorado Residents Association, Inc. (Pietrantoni, Manuel)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vrg)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and extension of time to file certified english translations filed by Joseph G. Feldstein-Del Valle on behalf of Xu Lai, Wei Li, Li/Lai Conjugal Partnership Responses due by 5/10/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Feldstein-Del Valle, Joseph)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, Bayamn Superior Part, case number BY2024CV01620. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APRDC-8648665), filed by Li/Lai Conjugal Partnership, Wei Li, Xu Lai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint and Attachments, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Sabanera's Opposition to Defendants' MTD, #5 Exhibit Complete State Court Docket, #6 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Feldstein-Del Valle, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabanera Dorado Residents Association, Inc. v. Lai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABANERA DORADO RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Manuel A. Pietrantoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xu Lai
Represented By: Joseph G. Feldstein-Del Valle
Represented By: Zarel J. Soto-Acaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Li
Represented By: Joseph G. Feldstein-Del Valle
Represented By: Zarel J. Soto-Acaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li/Lai Conjugal Partnership
Represented By: Joseph G. Feldstein-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Li-Lai
Represented By: Joseph G. Feldstein-Del Valle
Represented By: Zarel J. Soto-Acaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?